JTH Tax, LLC v. Shaw et al
Plaintiff: JTH Tax, LLC doing business as Liberty Tax Service
Defendant: Innovative Financial Strategies, LLC indiivdually and doing business as Accounting and Taxes formerly known as Kapdas Holdings, LLC, Kimberly P. Shaw individually and doing business as Accounting and Taxes, Douglas Shaw individually and doing business as Accounting and Taxes, KAPDAS Tax Services, LLC individually and doing business as Accounting and Taxes and Kapdas Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv02060
Filed: May 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2023 Filing 20 First Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Innovative Financial Strategies, LLC, KAPDAS Tax Services, LLC, Douglas Shaw, Kimberly P. Shaw. (Jones, Chandra)
June 29, 2023 Filing 19 Amended Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by JTH Tax, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NEXTPOINT FINANCIAL INC, Corporate Parent FRANCHISE GROUP INC, Corporate Parent FRANCHISE GROUP INTERMEDIATE LLC, Corporate Parent FRANCHISE GROUP NEW HOLDCO LLC, Corporate Parent LT HOLDCO, LLC, Corporate Parent NPI HOLDCO, LLC, Corporate Parent LT Intermediate Holdco, LLC for JTH Tax, LLC. (Corbitt, Canon)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Having considered the parties' #17 Consent Motion to Extend the Deadline for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Two Motions to Dismiss #13 & #14 and for good cause shown, SAID MOTION IS GRANTED AND IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time within which Plaintiff may respond to Defendants' two Motions to Dismiss is extended until and including July 19, 2023. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/23/23. (jra)
June 23, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction & #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 7/19/2023 (jra)
June 23, 2023 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Two Motions to Dismiss re: #13 First MOTION to Dismiss , #14 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by JTH Tax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion to Extend the Deadline for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Two Motions to Dismiss)(Corbitt, Canon)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to file their Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements using the form required by Local Rule 3.3 within 14 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/21/2023. (jra)
June 20, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Innovative Financial Strategies, LLC, KAPDAS Tax Services, LLC, Douglas Shaw, Kimberly P. Shaw. Discovery ends on 11/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Jones, Chandra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 20, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Innovative Financial Strategies, LLC, KAPDAS Tax Services, LLC, Douglas Shaw, Kimberly P. Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Jones, Chandra)
June 20, 2023 Filing 13 Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by Innovative Financial Strategies, LLC, KAPDAS Tax Services, LLC, Douglas Shaw, Kimberly P. Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Jones, Chandra)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Innovative Financial Strategies, LLC Answer due 6/20/2023; KAPDAS Tax Services, LLC Answer due 6/20/2023; Douglas Shaw Answer due 6/20/2023; Kimberly P. Shaw Answer due 6/20/2023. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/31/2023. (jra)
May 31, 2023 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by JTH Tax, LLC. Kimberly Shaw served 5/14/23. (Corbitt, Canon)
May 31, 2023 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Innovative Financial Strategies, LLC, KAPDAS Tax Services, LLC, Douglas Shaw, Kimberly P. Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time)(Jones, Chandra)
May 18, 2023 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by JTH Tax, LLC. KAPDAS Tax Services, LLC served on 5/14/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. (Corbitt, Canon)
May 18, 2023 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by JTH Tax, LLC. Douglas Shaw served on 5/14/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. (Corbitt, Canon)
May 18, 2023 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by JTH Tax, LLC. Kimberly P. Shaw served on 5/14/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. (Corbitt, Canon)
May 18, 2023 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of James Ludlow Messenger Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12607743).by JTH Tax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corbitt, Canon) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 18, 2023 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to James L. Messenger. Clerk to follow-up by 5/30/2023. (kkh)
May 18, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of James Ludlow Messenger Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12607743) Attorney James L. Messenger added appearing on behalf of JTH Tax, LLC (djs)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission of James Ludlow Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/18/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
May 12, 2023 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by JTH Tax, LLC identifying Other Affiliate LT Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Other Corporate Affiliate NextPoint Financial, Inc., Other Affiliate LT Holdco, LLC, Other Affiliate NPI Holdco, LLC, Other Affiliate Franchise Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Franchise Group Intermediate LLC, Other Affiliate Franchise Group New Holdco, LLC for JTH Tax, LLC. (Corbitt, Canon)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/11/2023. (bnp)
May 8, 2023 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Innovative Financial Strategies, LLC, KAPDAS Tax Services, LLC, Douglas Shaw, Kimberly P. Shaw. (jra)
May 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by JTH Tax, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12583996) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JTH Tax, LLC v. Shaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Financial Strategies, LLC indiivdually and doing business as Accounting and Taxes formerly known as Kapdas Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Chandra T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly P. Shaw individually and doing business as Accounting and Taxes
Represented By: Chandra T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Shaw individually and doing business as Accounting and Taxes
Represented By: Chandra T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAPDAS Tax Services, LLC individually and doing business as Accounting and Taxes
Represented By: Chandra T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kapdas Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Chandra T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH Tax, LLC doing business as Liberty Tax Service
Represented By: Canon T. Corbitt
Represented By: James L. Messenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?