Cascio et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Debra Cascio and Dan Cascio
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv03127
Filed: July 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order RETURN of #8 APPLICATION for Admission of William L. Bross Pro Hac Vice to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Local counsel's address in ECF is in San Fransisco. The information in ECF must match the information within the PHV application. (rvb)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of William L. Bross Pro Hac Vice.by Dan Cascio, Debra Cascio. (Garrison, W.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order RETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of William L. Bross Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12783791) to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Local counsel must maintain an office within the Northern District of Georgia. Local counsel's office is in Alabama. (rvb)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of William L. Bross Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12783791).by Dan Cascio, Debra Cascio. (Garrison, W.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to William L Bross, IV. Clerk to follow-up by 8/4/2023. (rvb)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Francois M. Blaudeau. Clerk to follow-up by 8/4/2023. (rvb)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Evan T. Rosemore. Clerk to follow-up by 8/4/2023. (rvb)
July 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson. (tht)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (tht)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Dan Cascio and Debra Cascio. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12744121) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tht) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cascio et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Cascio
Represented By: Evan T. Rosemore
Represented By: Francois M. Blaudeau
Represented By: W. Lewis Garrison, Jr.
Represented By: William L Bross, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Cascio
Represented By: Evan T. Rosemore
Represented By: Francois M. Blaudeau
Represented By: W. Lewis Garrison, Jr.
Represented By: William L Bross, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?