Doe v. VGW Malta Ltd et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: VGW Malta Ltd and VGW LuckyLand, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv03226
Filed: July 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Submission of #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Strike Class Claims MOTION to Stay proceedings, #11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Superior Court of Fulton County, Georgia to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Strike Class Claims MOTION to Stay proceedings filed by VGW LuckyLand, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd. (Sullivan, Michael)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to submit a Reply in Support re: #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Strike Class Claims MOTION to Stay proceedings. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/8/2023. (dmb)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION for Order Directing Plaintiff to Move for Leave to Proceed Anonymously in this Action filed by John Doe. (Williams, Barry)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to submit a Reply in Support re: #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Strike Class Claims MOTION to Stay proceedings by VGW LuckyLand, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time)(Sullivan, Michael)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Order Directing Plaintiff to Move for Leave to Proceed Anonymously in this Action by VGW LuckyLand, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd. (Sullivan, Michael)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Superior Court of Fulton County, Georgia filed by VGW LuckyLand, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Michael Thunder)(Sullivan, Michael)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER text of proposed order re: #13 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Barry)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Strike Class Claims MOTION to Stay proceedings filed by John Doe. (Williams, Barry)
August 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order Motion to Remand re: #11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Superior Court of Fulton County, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Barry)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Superior Court of Fulton County, Georgia with Brief In Support by John Doe. (Williams, Barry)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Extension of Time File Response re: #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Strike Class Claims MOTION to Stay proceedings . The Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs shall have until 08/24/2023 to respond. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/10/2023. (jkb)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time File Response re: #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Strike Class Claims MOTION to Stay proceedings by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motton for Extension)(Williams, Barry)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Behnam Dayanim. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/01/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkb)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory D. Beaman. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/01/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkb)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Behnam Dayanim re #8 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jkb)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Gregory D. Beaman re #7 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jkb)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory D. Beaman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12777705). Attorney Gregory D. Beaman added appearing on behalf of VGW LuckyLand, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Behnam Dayanim Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12777673). Attorney Behnam Dayanim added appearing on behalf of VGW LuckyLand, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory D. Beaman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12777705).by VGW LuckyLand, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd. (Sullivan, Michael) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Behnam Dayanim Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12777673).by VGW LuckyLand, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd. (Sullivan, Michael) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Claims and Stay Proceedings, or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss VGW Malta Ltd. with Brief In Support by VGW LuckyLand, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of their Motion to Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Claims and Stay Proceedings, or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss VGW Malta Ltd., #2 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Thunder, #3 Exhibit A - Luckyland Slot Terms, #4 Exhibit B - Chumba Casino Terms)(Sullivan, Michael) . Added MOTION to Strike, MOTION to Stay on 7/28/2023 (jkb). Modified on 7/28/2023 (jkb).
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by TWT. (jeh)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by VGW LuclcyLand, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd identifying Corporate Parent VGW Holdings Ltd. for VGW LuclcyLand, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd. (Sullivan, Michael)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE Of Filing CERTIFICATE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VGW LuclcyLand, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Sullivan, Michael)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by VGW Malta Ltd, VGW LuclcyLand, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12759570) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Thunder, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Summons, #3 Exhibit A-2 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit A-3 - Case Initiation Form, #5 Exhibit A-4 - Service Record, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (pdt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. VGW Malta Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Barry L Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW Malta Ltd
Represented By: Michael A. Sullivan
Represented By: Nicole Antoinette Archambault
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim
Represented By: Gregory D. Beaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW LuckyLand, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Sullivan
Represented By: Nicole Antoinette Archambault
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim
Represented By: Gregory D. Beaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?