The State of Georgia v. Clark
Plaintiff: The State of Georgia
Defendant: Jeffrey Bossert Clark
Petitioner: David Andrew Christenson
Amicus Curiae: Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials
Case Number: 1:2023cv03721
Filed: August 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal - Suit against Federal Officer
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2023 Filing 65 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM for proceedings held on 09/18/2023 (Evidentiary Hrg) before Judge Steve C. Judge, re: #58 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter: Penny Coudriet. (MacDougald, Harry) Modified on 10/18/2023 to update text (pjm).
October 18, 2023 Set Deadline re: #58 Notice of Appeal: Financial Arrangements due on 11/1/2023. (pjm)
October 16, 2023 Filing 64 USCA Acknowledgment of #58 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeffrey Bossert Clark. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 23-13368-B. (pjm)
October 13, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD for The State of Georgia regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED Documentary EXHIBITS pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D. Re: #62 Exhibits. (dnb)
October 10, 2023 Filing 61 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, USCA Appeal Fees, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #58 Notice of Appeal. (pjm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2023: #1 Corrected NOA Packet) (pjm).
October 10, 2023 Filing 60 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to USCA- 11th Circuit re: #58 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeffrey Bossert Clark. (pjm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2023: #1 Corrected USCA Transmittal Letter) (pjm).
October 9, 2023 Filing 59 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal with Brief In Support by Jeffrey Bossert Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript of Removal Hearing, State of GA v. Meadows)(MacDougald, Harry)
October 9, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #55 Order,,,, by Jeffrey Bossert Clark. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AGANDC-12936395. Transcript Order Form due on 10/23/2023 (MacDougald, Harry)
October 5, 2023 Filing 62 Plaintiff's/State's EXHIBITS admitted and retained at the #50 Evidentiary Hearing, have been received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in the custody of the Records Clerks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(dnb)
September 29, 2023 Filing 57 Case electronically remanded to Superior Court of Fulton County, Georgia. (Envelope #13275353 has been submitted successfully.) (rsg)
September 29, 2023 Filing 56 Remand Letter to Superior Court of Fulton County. (rsg)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DECLINING to assume jurisdiction over the State's criminal prosecution of Clark under Section 1455 and REMANDS the case to Fulton County Superior Court. The Court moreover DENIES Clark's attempt to remove the SGJP under Section 1446. The Court makes clear this Order determines only that, as a federal court with limited jurisdiction, it lacks any basis for jurisdiction over Clark's criminal prosecution and the SGJP. The Court's conclusion is not to suggest any opinion about the State's case against Clark. The Court makes no ruling on the merits of the charges against Clark or any defense that he may offer. Clark maintains the presumption of innocence and bears no burden of proving that he did not commit the crimes charged against him. The burden of proof beyond a reasonable doubt remains with the State. This Order's sole determination is that there is no federal jurisdiction over the criminal case. The outcome of this case will be for a Fulton County judge and trier of fact to ultimately decide. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/29/23. (rsg)
September 29, 2023 Civil Case Terminated. (rsg)
September 19, 2023 Filing 54 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jeffrey Bossert Clark. (MacDougald, Harry)
September 18, 2023 Filing 53 AMENDED NOTICE Of Conflicts for the week of September 18, 2023 as to attorney Catherine S. Bernard.(rsg)
September 18, 2023 Filing 51 Exhibit List The State of Georgia's. (rsg)
September 18, 2023 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Evidentiary Hearing held on 9/18/2023 regarding Defendant's #1 Notice of Removal. Counsel presented oral argument. Plaintiff's witness Joseph Hunt sworn and testified. Plaintiff's exhibits 1 and 2 admitted. Closing arguments heard. The matter was taken under advisement by the Court with ruling to follow via written order. Exhibits retained to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter Penny Coudriet)(rsg)
September 18, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE by Jeffrey Bossert Clark Waiver of Presence for Removal Hearing (Bernard, Catherine)
September 16, 2023 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT of Edwin Meese, III with Exhibits by Jeffrey Bossert Clark. (MacDougald, Harry)
September 15, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE Of Conflicts for the week of September 18, 2023 as to attorney Catherine S. Bernard. (rsg)
September 15, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE Of Filing Brief of Amici Curiae In Support Of Remanding These Cases To State Court by Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials. (rsg)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File as Amici Curiae in Support of Remand. The Clerk is DIRECTED to refile Doc. No. [13-1] as a new docket entry on CM/ECF. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/15/23. (rsg)
September 15, 2023 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by The State of Georgia of Subpoena upon Joseph Harold Hunt (Attachments: #1 Subpoena upon Joseph Harold Hunt)(Wooten, John)
September 15, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Daysha D'Anya Young on behalf of The State of Georgia (Young, Daysha)
September 14, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE Of Filing by Jeffrey Bossert Clark re #41 Pretrial Memorandum, #42 Affidavit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit)(MacDougald, Harry)
September 14, 2023 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Bossert Clark in re #41 Pretrial Memorandum by Jeffrey Bossert Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(MacDougald, Harry) Modified on 9/15/2023 to edit docket text (ddm).
September 14, 2023 Filing 41 REPLY in Support of Removal filed by Jeffrey Bossert Clark. (MacDougald, Harry) Modified on 9/15/2023 to edit docket text (ddm).
September 14, 2023 Filing 40 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Appearance by Daysha D'Anya Young on behalf of The State of Georgia. (Young, Daysha) Modified on 9/14/2023 to note wrong PDF was attached and attorney has been directed to refile pleading (ddm).
September 13, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Bernick on behalf of The State of Georgia (Bernick, Alex)
September 13, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Ney on behalf of The State of Georgia (Ney, Adam)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM for counsel on September 18, 2023 at 9:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/13/23. (rsg)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying Mr. Christenson's #35 MOTION for Reconsideration re #23 Order on Motion to Intervene. Mr. Christenson made no showing of necessity for reconsideration. Furthermore, Mr. Christenson has a lengthy history of submitting motions to intervene and various correspondence related to high-profile cases before the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals. Accordingly, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to not docket any future filings by Mr. Christenson in the case sub judice. The Clerk shall instead hold said matters in abatement in a miscellaneous case file. Mr. Christenson is hereby warned that any future filings in cases in which he is not a named party that are deemed frivolous by the presiding judge may lead to sanctions. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/13/23. (rsg)
September 13, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to David Andrew Christenson re #36 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. (rsg)
September 12, 2023 Submission of #13 MOTION for Leave to File Brief by Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
September 11, 2023 Filing 35 Pro Se MOTION for Reconsideration of #23 Order filed by David Andrew Christenson. (ddm)
September 11, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Scott Bernard on behalf of Jeffrey Bossert Clark (Bernard, Catherine)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ADMINSTRATIVE ORDER NO. 23-04: IN RE USE OF CELLULAR TELEPHONES AND ELECTRONIC DEVICES ON THE 19TH FLOOR OF THE RICHARD B. RUSSELL BUILDING ON SEPTEMBER 18 AND SEPTEMBER 20, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 9/11/2023. (bgt)
September 10, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE Of Filing by Jeffrey Bossert Clark re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Supplement to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Entering Special Purpose Grand Jury's Final Report Into Court record)(MacDougald, Harry)
September 8, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE Of Filing Deposition of Kenneth Klukowski Taken on December 15, 2021 by The State of Georgia (Attachments: #1 Kenneth Klukowski Deposition)(Wooten, John)
September 8, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE Of Filing Deposition of Jeffrey Rosen Taken on August 7, 2021 by The State of Georgia (Attachments: #1 Jeffrey Rosen Deposition)(Wooten, John)
September 8, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE Of Filing Deposition of Richard Donoghue Taken on August 6, 2021 by The State of Georgia (Attachments: #1 Richard Donoghue Deposition)(Wooten, John)
September 8, 2023 Filing 28 RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by The State of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Draft Letter, #2 Exhibit Excerpt - Donoghue SJC Transcript, #3 Exhibit Clark 12.28.20 email, #4 Exhibit Donoghue 12.28.20 email, #5 Exhibit Holder Memo 5.11.09, #6 Exhibit Excerpt - Rosen SJC Transcript, #7 Exhibit Excerpt - Klukowski J6 Transcript, #8 Exhibit Excerpt - JM and CFR)(Wakeford, Francis)
September 1, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by John Earl Floyd on behalf of The State of Georgia (Floyd, John)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Notice of Removal. The State is hereby ORDERED to submit its response to Clark's Notice of Removal by Friday, September 8, 2023. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/31/23. (rsg)
August 30, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Notice of Removal re: #15 Order,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, by The State of Georgia. (Wakeford, Francis)
August 30, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Green Cross on behalf of The State of Georgia (Cross, Anna)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying Mr. Christenson's #22 Motion to Intervene. Other than the timeliness of his motion, Mr. Christenson has not shown that he has any basis, under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, to intervene as of right or otherwise. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/29/23. (rsg)
August 29, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to David Andrew Christenson re #23 Order on Motion to Intervene. (rsg)
August 25, 2023 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph Meyer Pro Hac Vice.by Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials. (Morgan, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 25, 2023 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel Volchok Pro Hac Vice.by Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials. (Morgan, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 25, 2023 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Seth Waxman Pro Hac Vice.by Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials. (Morgan, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 25, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE Of Filing Correction to Application for Admission of Joseph Meyer Pro Hac Vice by Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials re Return of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, (Morgan, John)
August 25, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE Of Filing Correction to Application for Admission of Daniel Volchok Pro Hac Vice by Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials re Return of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, (Morgan, John)
August 25, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE Of Filing Correction to Application for Admission of Seth Waxman Pro Hac Vice by Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials re Return of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, (Morgan, John)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Fred Wertheimer. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/25/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
August 25, 2023 RETURN of #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph Meyer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12837325) to attorney for correction. Reason for Return: The font size and margins on your application are not in compliance with this Court's Local Rules. Please use the PHV application on this Court's website. After you complete the application, select submit and print to PDF. (rvb)
August 25, 2023 RETURN of #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel Volchok Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12837322) to attorney for correction. Reason for Return: The font size and margins on your application are not in compliance with this Court's Local Rules. Please use the PHV application on this Court's website. After you complete the application, select submit and print to PDF. (rvb)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting #21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Meyer. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/25/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting #20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Volchok. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/25/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
August 25, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #20 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel Volchok Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12837322). Attorney Daniel Volchok added appearing on behalf of Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
August 25, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph Meyer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12837325). Attorney Joseph Michael Meyer added appearing on behalf of Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
August 25, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Seth Waxman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12837311). Attorney Seth P. Waxman added appearing on behalf of Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
August 25, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Fred Wertheimer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12837346). Attorney Fred Wertheimer added appearing on behalf of Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Seth Waxman. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/25/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
August 25, 2023 RETURN of #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Seth Waxman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12837311) to attorney for correction. Reason for Return: The font size and margins on your application are not in compliance with this Court's Local Rules. Please use the PHV application on this Court's website. After you complete the application, select submit and print to PDF. (rvb)
August 24, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Intervene by David Andrew Christenson. (rsg)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Jeffrey Bossert Clark. The Court concludes the face of the Notice of Removal #1 and its attachments do not clearly indicate that summary remand of this matter is required. No opinion is being made at this time about whether removal will be permitted or if any of Clark's federal defenses are meritorious. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1455(b)(5), the Court ORDERS that the Parties participate in an evidentiary hearing concerning the Notice of Removal of the Indictment against Jeffrey Bossert Clark on Monday, September 18, 2023, at 9:30 A.M. at the Richard B. Russell Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 75 Ted Turner Drive, S.W., Atlanta, Georgia, in Courtroom 1907. The Fulton County District Attorneys Office may submit a written response to Clark's Notice of Removal no later than Tuesday September 5, 2023.Any response submitted must not exceed 25 pages in length. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/24/2023. (pdw)
August 23, 2023 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Fred Wertheimer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12837346).by Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials. (Morgan, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. Modified on 8/24/2023 to remove all caps from docket text (rvb).
August 23, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Brief by Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Morgan, John) Modified on 8/24/2023 to remove all caps from docket text (rvb).
August 23, 2023 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph Meyer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12837325).by Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials. (Morgan, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. Modified on 8/24/2023 to remove all caps from docket text (rvb).
August 23, 2023 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel Volchok Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12837322).by Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials. (Morgan, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. Modified on 8/24/2023 to remove all caps from docket text (rvb).
August 23, 2023 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Seth Waxman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12837311).by Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials. (Morgan, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. Modified on 8/24/2023 to remove all caps from docket text (rvb).
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying Clark's Emergency Motion to Stay of the State's criminal proceedings (Doc. No. #2 ), inclusive of the alternative motion for an administrative stay. The Court specifically finds that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1455(b)(3), the Fulton County proceedings remain ongoing at this time as there has been no triggering of a stay under 28 U.S.C. 1455(b)(5). Moreover, the Court denies Clark's request to enter an administrative stay because Clark did not cite any authority for the Court to enter a temporary administrative stay (Doc. No. #2 , 78), various abstention doctrines and principals of federalism counsel against a federal court entering a stay of a state court's judicial proceedings (see Doc. No. #8 , 9-12), and Section 1455's statutory framework indicates the Fulton County proceedings should presently continue despite the notice of removal. Finally, at this time, the Court declines to comment further on Clark's arguments relating to the purported civil removal of the Special Grand Jury Proceedings or the consequences of such determination under 28 U.S.C. 1446. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/23/23. (rsg)
August 23, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Stay filed by The State of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fulton County Superior Court's Order Denying Motion to Quash)(Wakeford, Francis)
August 23, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Wooten on behalf of The State of Georgia (Wooten, John)
August 23, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis McDonald Wakeford, IV on behalf of The State of Georgia (Wakeford, Francis)
August 22, 2023 Filing 5 Amended Certificate of Service re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 MOTION to Stay filed by Jeffrey Bossert Clark. (MacDougald, Harry) Modified on 8/23/2023 to edit docket text (ddm).
August 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit C to Notice of Removal #1 filed by Jeffrey Bossert Clark. (MacDougald, Harry) Modified on 8/23/2023 to edit docket text (ddm).
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Fulton County District Attorneys' Office, who is prosecuting the underlying State criminal case, to respond to Defendant Jeffery Clark's Emergency Motion to Stay the State Criminal Proceeding #2 by 3 p.m. tomorrow, Wednesday August 23, 2023. This response may not exceed 25 pages. No reply will be permitted. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 08/22/2023. (ddm)
August 21, 2023 Filing 2 Emergency MOTON to Confirm Applicability of Automatic Stay Under 28 U.S.C. 1446(D) or the Triggering of the Stay in 28 U.S.C. 1455(B)(5) or Both - or in the Alternative for an Administrative Stay by Jeffrey Bossert Clark. (bgt)
August 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with CRIMINAL INDICTMENT filed by Jeffrey Bossert Clark. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12831134) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit A-6, #7 Exhibit A-7, #8 Exhibit A-8, #9 Exhibit A-9, #10 Declaration of Harry W. MacDougald, #11 Exhibit B-001, #12 Exhibit B-002, #13 Exhibit B-003, #14 Exhibit B-004, #15 Exhibit B-005, #16 Exhibit B-006, #17 Exhibit B-007, #18 Exhibit B-008, #19 Exhibit B-009, #20 Exhibit B-010, #21 Exhibit B-011, #22 Exhibit B-012, #23 Exhibit B-013, #24 Exhibit B-014, #25 Exhibit B-015, #26 Exhibit B-016, #27 Exhibit B-017, #28 Exhibit B-018, #29 Exhibit B-019, #30 Exhibit B-020, #31 Exhibit B-021, #32 Exhibit B-022, #33 Exhibit B-023, #34 Exhibit B-024, #35 Exhibit B-025, #36 Exhibit B-026, #37 Exhibit B-027, #38 Exhibit B-028, #39 Exhibit B-029, #40 Exhibit B-030, #41 Exhibit B-031, #42 Exhibit B-032, #43 Exhibit B-033, #44 Exhibit B-034, #45 Exhibit B-035, #46 Exhibit B-036, #47 Exhibit B-037, #48 Exhibit B-038, #49 Exhibit B-039, #50 Exhibit B-040, #51 Exhibit B-041, #52 Exhibit B-042, #53 Exhibit B-043, #54 Exhibit B-044, #55 Exhibit B-045, #56 Exhibit B-046, #57 Exhibit B-047, #58 Exhibit B-048, #59 Exhibit B-049, #60 Exhibit B-050, #61 Exhibit B-051, #62 Exhibit B-052, #63 Exhibit B-053, #64 Exhibit B-054, #65 Exhibit B-055, #67 Exhibit B-056, #68 Exhibit B-057, #69 Exhibit B-058, #70 Exhibit B-059, #71 Exhibit B-060, #72 Exhibit B-061, #73 Exhibit B-062, #74 Exhibit B-063, #75 Exhibit B-064, #76 Exhibit B-065, #77 Exhibit B-066, #78 Exhibit B-067, #79 Exhibit B-068, #80 Exhibit B-069, #81 Exhibit B-070, #82 Exhibit B-071, #83 Exhibit B-072, #84 Exhibit B-073, #85 Exhibit B-074, #86 Exhibit B-075, #87 Exhibit B-076, #88 Exhibit B-077, #89 Exhibit B-078, #90 Exhibit B-079, #91 Exhibit B-080, #92 Exhibit B-081, #93 Exhibit B-082, #94 Exhibit B-083, #95 Exhibit B-084, #96 Exhibit B-085, #97 Exhibit B-086, #98 Exhibit B-087, #99 Exhibit B-088, #100 Exhibit B-089, #101 Exhibit B-090, #102 Exhibit B-091, #103 Exhibit B-092, #104 Exhibit B-093, #105 Exhibit B-094, #106 Exhibit B-095, #107 Exhibit B-096, #108 Exhibit B-097, #109 Exhibit B-098, #110 Exhibit B-099, #111 Exhibit B-100, #112 Exhibit B-101, #113 Exhibit B-102, #114 Exhibit B-103, #115 Exhibit B-104, #116 Exhibit B-105, #117 Exhibit B-106, #118 Exhibit B-107, #119 Exhibit B-108, #120 Exhibit B-109, #121 Exhibit B-110, #122 Exhibit B-111, #123 Exhibit B-112, #124 Exhibit B-113, #125 Exhibit B-114, #126 Exhibit B-115, #127 Exhibit B-116, #128 Exhibit B-117, #129 Exhibit B-118, #130 Exhibit B-119, #131 Exhibit B-120, #132 Exhibit B-121, #133 Exhibit B-122, #134 Exhibit B-123, #135 Exhibit B-124, #136 Exhibit B-125, #137 Exhibit B-126, #138 Exhibit B-127, #139 Exhibit B-128, #140 Exhibit B-129, #141 Exhibit B-130, #142 Exhibit B-131, #143 Exhibit B-132, #144 Exhibit B-133, #145 Exhibit B-134, #146 Exhibit B-135, #147 Exhibit B-136, #148 Exhibit B-137, #149 Exhibit B-138, #150 Exhibit B-139, #151 Exhibit B-140, #152 Exhibit B-141, #153 Exhibit B-142, #154 Exhibit B-143, #155 Exhibit B-144, #156 Exhibit B-145, #158 Exhibit B-146, #159 Exhibit B-147, #160 Exhibit B-148, #161 Exhibit B-149, #162 Exhibit B-150, #163 Exhibit B-151, #164 Exhibit B-152, #165 Exhibit B-153, #166 Exhibit B-154, #167 Exhibit B-155, #168 Exhibit B-156, #169 Exhibit B-157, #170 Exhibit B-158, #171 Exhibit B-159, #172 Exhibit B-160, #173 Exhibit B-161, #174 Exhibit B-162, #175 Exhibit B-163, #176 Exhibit B-164, #177 Exhibit B-165, #178 Exhibit B-166, #179 Exhibit B-167, #180 Exhibit B-168, #181 Exhibit B-169, #182 Exhibit B-170, #183 Exhibit B-171, #184 Exhibit B-172, #185 Exhibit B-173, #186 Exhibit B-174, #187 Civil Cover Sheet) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (bgt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The State of Georgia v. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Georgia
Represented By: Fani T. Willis
Represented By: Nathan J. Wade
Represented By: Alex Bernick
Represented By: Adam Ney
Represented By: Anna Green Cross
Represented By: Daysha D'Anya Young
Represented By: Francis McDonald Wakeford, IV
Represented By: John Earl Floyd
Represented By: John William Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Bossert Clark
Represented By: Harry W. MacDougald
Represented By: Catherine Scott Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Former Judges, Prosecutors, and State and Federal Executive Officials
Represented By: Daniel Volchok
Represented By: John Thomas Morgan, III
Represented By: Fred Wertheimer
Represented By: Joseph Michael Meyer
Represented By: Seth P. Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Andrew Christenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?