Pureo Natural Products LLC et al v. Locn Products LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pureo Natural Products LLC and Trendz Beauty Academy LLC
Defendant: Locn Products LLC, Cut Creaters Salon Suites, LLC, Danielle Townes, Omar Townes and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2023cv03917
Filed: August 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2023 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories for Plaintiff Pureo Natural by Danielle Townes.(dmb)
October 25, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cut Creaters Salon Suites, LLC, Danielle Townes, Omar Townes re #23 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, and #22 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (dmb)
October 24, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by Omar Townes. (dmb)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 10/24/2023. (dmb)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Katrina M. Quicker terminated. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 10/24/2023. (dmb)
October 24, 2023 Submission of #15 MOTION to Dismiss, to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (dmb)
October 23, 2023 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Pureo Natural Products LLC, Trendz Beauty Academy LLC.(Pak, Byung)
October 20, 2023 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Danielle Townes. (dmb)
October 20, 2023 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan by Pureo Natural Products LLC, Trendz Beauty Academy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Byung)
October 20, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw Katrina M. Quicker as Attorney with Brief In Support by Cut Creaters Salon Suites, LLC, Omar Townes. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quicker, Katrina)
October 5, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pureo Natural Products LLC, Trendz Beauty Academy LLC. (Pak, Byung)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Cut Creaters Salon Suites and Omar Townes Answer due 10/25/2023. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 10/3/2023. (dmb)
September 22, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Until October 25, 2023, with Brief In Support by Cut Creaters Salon Suites, LLC, Omar Townes. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quicker, Katrina)
September 21, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Danielle Townes. (dmb)
September 11, 2023 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Pureo Natural Products LLC, Trendz Beauty Academy LLC. Omar Townes served on 9/4/2023, answer due 9/25/2023. (Pak, Byung)
September 11, 2023 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Pureo Natural Products LLC, Trendz Beauty Academy LLC. Danielle Townes served on 9/4/2023, answer due 9/25/2023. (Pak, Byung)
September 11, 2023 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Pureo Natural Products LLC, Trendz Beauty Academy LLC. Cut Creaters Salon Suites, LLC served on 9/4/2023, answer due 9/25/2023. (Pak, Byung)
September 11, 2023 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Pureo Natural Products LLC, Trendz Beauty Academy LLC. Locn Products LLC served on 9/4/2023, answer due 9/25/2023. (Pak, Byung)
September 8, 2023 Filing 9 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (dmb)
September 7, 2023 Filing 8 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 9/11-9/15, 9/25-9/27, 11/9, 11/10, 11/20-11/24, by Byung J. Pak. (Pak, Byung)
September 6, 2023 Filing 7 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Lee, Robert)
September 5, 2023 Clerk's Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Chief U.S. District Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
September 1, 2023 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (tht)
August 31, 2023 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Omar Townes. (tht)
August 31, 2023 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Danielle Townes. (tht)
August 31, 2023 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cut Creaters Salon Suites, LLC. (tht)
August 31, 2023 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Locn Products LLC. (tht)
August 31, 2023 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pureo Natural Products LLC and Trendz Beauty Academy LLC. (tht)
August 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Pureo Natural Products LLC and Trendz Beauty Academy LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12856328) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(tht) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pureo Natural Products LLC et al v. Locn Products LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pureo Natural Products LLC
Represented By: Byung J. Pak
Represented By: Katie Humphries Hall
Represented By: Robert L. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trendz Beauty Academy LLC
Represented By: Byung J. Pak
Represented By: Katie Humphries Hall
Represented By: Robert L. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Locn Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cut Creaters Salon Suites, LLC
Represented By: Katrina M. Quicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Townes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Townes
Represented By: Katrina M. Quicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?