Bucks County Employees Retirement System v. Norfolk Southern Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Bucks County Employees Retirement System
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires and Mark R. George
Petitioner: AkademikerPension and Ironworkers Locals 40, 361 & 417 Union Annuity, Pension and Topping Out Funds
Case Number: 1:2023cv04175
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #69 Application of Vanessa Marie Milan for Admission Pro Hac Vice. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/10/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (by email) re #68 APPLICATION for Admission of Austin Warner Manning Pro Hac Vice. (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12924273). (slc)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (by email) re #69 APPLICATION of Vanessa Marie Milan for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12924275). (slc)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #68 Application of Austin Warner Manning for Admission Pro Hac Vice. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/10/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #70 Application of Johnston de Forest Whitman, Jr. for Admission Pro Hac Vice. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/10/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (by email) re #73 APPLICATION of Joseph F. Murray for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12924336). (slc)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #73 Application of Joseph F. Murray for Admission Pro Hac Vice. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/10/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE Of Filing Amended Joint Stipulation Appointing the Ironworkers Funds and AkademikerPension as Lead Plaintiff and Approving Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP as Lead Counsel AND Conditional Request for Status Conference by AkademikerPension, Bucks County Employees Retirement System, Ironworkers Locals 40, 361 & 417 Union Annuity, Pension and Topping Out Funds (Attachments: #1 Amended Joint Stipulation, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplan, Michael)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/5/2023. (tas)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #70 APPLICATION for Admission of Johnston de Forest Whitman, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12924278). Attorney Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. added appearing on behalf of AkademikerPension. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #73 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph F. Murray Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12924336). Attorney Joseph F. Murray added appearing on behalf of Bucks County Employees Retirement System, Ironworkers Locals 40, 361 & 417 Union Annuity, Pension and Topping Out Funds. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #69 APPLICATION for Admission of Vanessa Marie Milan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12924275). Attorney Vanessa Milan added appearing on behalf of AkademikerPension. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #68 APPLICATION for Admission of Austin Warner Manning Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12924273). Attorney Austin Manning added appearing on behalf of AkademikerPension. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #67 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathan Alexander Hasiuk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12924267). Attorney Nathan A. Hasiuk added appearing on behalf of AkademikerPension. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #62 Application of Michael G. Bongiorno for Admission Pro Hac Vice. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/04/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (by email) re #63 APPLICATION for Admission of Tamar Kaplan-Marans Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12920780). (slc)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (by email) re #62 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael G. Bongiorno Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12920700). (slc)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #67 Application of Nathan Alexander Hasiuk for Admission Pro Hac Vice. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/04/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (by email) re #67 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathan Alexander Hasiuk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12924267). (slc)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #63 Application of Tamar Kaplan-Marans for Admission Pro Hac Vice. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/04/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing by email re #59 APPLICATION for Admission of Jack A. Gephart, Pro Hac Vice; (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12915606). (slc)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing by email re #58 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason C. Davis Pro Hac Vic;e (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12915596). (slc)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #63 APPLICATION for Admission of Tamar Kaplan-Marans Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12920780). Attorney Tamar Kaplan-Marans added appearing on behalf of Mark R. George, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing by email re #57 APPLICATION for Admission of Ashley M. Price, Pro Hac Vice; (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12915574). (slc)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #62 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael G. Bongiorno Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12920700). Attorney Michael G. Bongiorno added appearing on behalf of Mark R. George, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph F. Murray Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12924336).by Bucks County Employees Retirement System, Ironworkers Locals 40, 361 & 417 Union Annuity, Pension and Topping Out Funds. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herman, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Herman on behalf of Bucks County Employees Retirement System (Herman, John)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Anthony Vickery on behalf of Bucks County Employees Retirement System (Vickery, Steven)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 APPLICATION for Admission of Johnston de Forest Whitman, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12924278).by AkademikerPension. (Caplan, Michael) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 APPLICATION for Admission of Vanessa Marie Milan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12924275).by AkademikerPension. (Caplan, Michael) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 APPLICATION for Admission of Austin Warner Manning Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12924273).by AkademikerPension. (Caplan, Michael) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathan Alexander Hasiuk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12924267).by AkademikerPension. (Caplan, Michael) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Blaine Roberts on behalf of AkademikerPension (Roberts, Cameron)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Michael A. Caplan replacing attorney George Faulkner. (Caplan, Michael)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Hilary H. Adams replacing attorney R. Leland Evans and Scott Alan Fenton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Consent)(Adams, Hilary)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #58 Application of Jason C. Davis for Admission Pro Hac Vice. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/02/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #59 Application of Jack A. Gephart for Admission Pro Hac Vice. APPROVAL by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/02/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #57 Application of Ashley M. Price for Admission Pro Hac Vice. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/02/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 APPLICATION for Admission of Tamar Kaplan-Marans Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12920780).by Mark R. George, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires. (Adams, Hilary) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael G. Bongiorno Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12920700).by Mark R. George, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires. (Adams, Hilary) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Hilary H. Adams on behalf of Mark R. George, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires (Adams, Hilary)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #58 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason C. Davis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12915596). Attorney Jason C. Davis added appearing on behalf of Ironworkers Locals 40, 361 & 417 Union Annuity, Pension and Topping Out Funds. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #59 APPLICATION for Admission of Jack A. Gephart Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12915606). Attorney Jack Abbey Gephart added appearing on behalf of Ironworkers Locals 40, 361 & 417 Union Annuity, Pension and Topping Out Funds. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #57 APPLICATION for Admission of Ashley M. Price Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12915574). Attorney Ashley M. Price added appearing on behalf of Ironworkers Locals 40, 361 & 417 Union Annuity, Pension and Topping Out Funds. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mark R. George, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires. (Adams, Hilary)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 APPLICATION for Admission of Jack A. Gephart Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12915606).by Ironworkers Locals 40, 361 & 417 Union Annuity, Pension and Topping Out Funds. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herman, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason C. Davis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12915596).by Ironworkers Locals 40, 361 & 417 Union Annuity, Pension and Topping Out Funds. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herman, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 APPLICATION for Admission of Ashley M. Price Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12915574).by Ironworkers Locals 40, 361 & 417 Union Annuity, Pension and Topping Out Funds. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herman, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Anthony Vickery on behalf of Ironworkers Locals 40, 361 & 417 Union Annuity, Pension and Topping Out Funds (Vickery, Steven)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Herman on behalf of Ironworkers Locals 40, 361 & 417 Union Annuity, Pension and Topping Out Funds (Herman, John)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Mark David Landes. Clerk to follow-up by 10/2/2023. (rvb)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to George Faulkner. Clerk to follow-up by 10/2/2023. (rvb)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Scott Alan Fenton. Clerk to follow-up by 10/2/2023. (rvb)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to R. Leland Evans. Clerk to follow-up by 10/2/2023. (rvb)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Joseph F. Murray. Clerk to follow-up by 10/2/2023. (rvb)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 07/05/2023. (tht)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00982. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 OPINION AND ORDER granting #23 Motion to Change Venue. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/15/2023. (kk2) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Case transferred to Northern District of Georgia at Atlanta. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (kk2) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Motion Hearing held on 8/17/2023 re #23 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Alan H. Shaw, Mark R. George, James A. Squires, Norfolk Southern Corporation. (Court Reporter: Allison Kimmel) (jr) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTATION ORDER granting #44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nathan A. Hasiuk as co-counsel. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/10/2023. (mas) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order PHV Filing fee received: $ 200.00, receipt number 200003842 (daf) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Notice of Deficiency re: The filing fee was not submitted with the motion. The fee can be paid #online. Please scroll down to the event called, Pay Fees Via Pay.gov to pay the required fee. Related Document: #44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Nathan A. Hasiuk filed by AkademikerPension. Deficiency Deadline by 8/22/2023. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE PAID) of Nathan A. Hasiuk by Movant AkademikerPension. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Landes, Mark) Modified text on 8/9/2023 (daf). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #23 MOTION to Change Venue : Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom 203 - Columbus before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #23 MOTION to Change Venue Declaration of Tamar Kaplan-Maran in Support of Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Defendants Mark R. George, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2022 Annual Report, #2 Exhibit NS Corporate Officers) (Evans, R) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Change Venue Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Defendants Mark R. George, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires. (Evans, R) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTATION ORDER granting #39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Change Venue. Replies due by 6/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/21/23. (jr) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 Reply (non motion) New date requested 6/30/2023. Filed by Defendants Mark R. George, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires. (Evans, R) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Reply IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER AS TO WHY VENUE IS PROPER IN THE EASTERN DIVISION by Plaintiff Bucks County Employees Retirement System. (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiff Bucks County Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley M. Price in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from Norfolk Southern's 2022 Annual Report) (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Response DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER AS TO WHY VENUSE IS PROPER IN THE EASTERN DIVISION by Defendant Norfolk Southern Corporation. (Evans, R) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTATION ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ashley M. Price and Jack A. Gephart. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/5/2023. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTATION ORDER: Plaintiff moved to extend its time to file a response in opposition to Defendants' Motion to Change Venue. (Doc. #31 ). For good cause show, the Motion is GRANTED (Doc. #31 ). Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Change Venue on or before June 9, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/1/23. (jr) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9448471) of Ashley M. Price and Jack A. Gephart by Plaintiff Bucks County Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Price, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Gephart) (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTATION ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason C. Davis. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/1/2023. (vb) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by Plaintiff Bucks County Employees Retirement System. (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Bucks County Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason C. Davis, #2 Exhibit 1 to Davis Declaration - OLAC Home Page, #3 Exhibit 2 to Davis Declaration - Success Group Website Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 3 to Davis Declaration - Columbus Dispatch Article, #5 Exhibit 4 to Davis Declaration - Westlaw Docket Database, #6 Exhibit 5 to Davis Declaration - ABC Article, #7 Exhibit 6 to Davis Declaration - Ohio Cap. Journal Article, #8 Exhibit 7 to Davis Declaration - WKYC Article) (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Ironworkers Funds and AkademikerPension by Movant AkademikerPension. (Landes, Mark) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9438942) of Jason C. Davis by Plaintiff Bucks County Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is DIRECTED to show cause w/in seven (7) days why venue is proper in the Eastern Division and explain why its claims should be adjudicated by this Court and not by a federal judge in Dayton. Show Cause Response due by 5/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/24/2023. (kk2) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Movant Ironworkers Locals 40, 361 & 417 Union Annuity, Pension and Topping Out Funds. (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff by Movant Ironworkers Locals 40, 361 & 417 Union Annuity, Pension and Topping Out Funds. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Joseph F. Murray in Support, #3 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #4 Exhibit B - Certification, #5 Exhibit C - Estimate of losses) (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff by Movant AkademikerPension. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of George H. Faulkner, #3 Exhibits A-E, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Faulkner, George) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendants Mark R. George, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires. (Evans, R) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTATION ORDER granting #21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants' time to respond to the complaint is extended until after a Lead Plaintiff has been appointed and an operative complaint has been filed or so designated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/12/23. (jr) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, New date requested 6/9/2023. Filed by Defendants Mark R. George, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires. (Evans, R) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTATION ORDER granting #19 Motion to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The parties are DIRECTED to request a Rule 16 conference when appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/9/2023. (kk2) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Defendants Mark R. George, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires. (Evans, R) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2023 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTATION ORDER granting #15 and #16 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael G. Bongiorno and Tamar Kaplan-Marans as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 04/12/2023. (tla) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9364513) of Tamar Kaplan-Marans by Defendants Mark R. George, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires. (Evans, R) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9364485) of Michael G. Bongiorno by Defendants Mark R. George, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires. (Evans, R) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Norfolk Southern Corporation. (Evans, R) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by R Leland Evans for Defendants Mark R. George, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires (Evans, R) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to James A. Squires on 3/16/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Norfolk Southern Corporation on 3/16/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Mark R. George on 3/16/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Alan H. Shaw on 3/16/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorneys Samuel H. Rudman, Richard Gonnello, and Brian E. Cochran. (tla) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires, and Mark R. George. (tla) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Bucks County Employees Retirement System. (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Mark R. George (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to James A. Squires (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Alan H. Shaw (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Norfolk Southern Corporation (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws against Mark R. George, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Alan H. Shaw, James A. Squires ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9324380), filed by Bucks County Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 9/15/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bucks County Employees Retirement System v. Norfolk Southern Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bucks County Employees Retirement System
Represented By: Jack Abbey Gephart
Represented By: Ashley M. Price
Represented By: Joseph F. Murray
Represented By: John C. Herman
Represented By: Steven Anthony Vickery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: R. Leland Evans
Represented By: Scott Alan Fenton
Represented By: Hilary H. Adams
Represented By: Tamar Kaplan-Marans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan H. Shaw
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: R. Leland Evans
Represented By: Scott Alan Fenton
Represented By: Hilary H. Adams
Represented By: Tamar Kaplan-Marans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Squires
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: R. Leland Evans
Represented By: Scott Alan Fenton
Represented By: Hilary H. Adams
Represented By: Tamar Kaplan-Marans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark R. George
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: R. Leland Evans
Represented By: Hilary H. Adams
Represented By: Scott Alan Fenton
Represented By: Tamar Kaplan-Marans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AkademikerPension
Represented By: Nathan A. Hasiuk
Represented By: Cameron Blaine Roberts
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Represented By: Austin Manning
Represented By: George Faulkner
Represented By: Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr.
Represented By: Mark David Landes
Represented By: Vanessa Milan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ironworkers Locals 40, 361 & 417 Union Annuity, Pension and Topping Out Funds
Represented By: Jason C. Davis
Represented By: Joseph F. Murray
Represented By: John C. Herman
Represented By: Steven Anthony Vickery
Represented By: Ashley M. Price
Represented By: Jack Abbey Gephart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?