Onaxis Franchising Group, LLC v. Harod et al
Plaintiff: Onaxis Franchising Group, LLC
Defendant: Eitan Harod and Harod Ventures, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv04835
Filed: October 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Submission of #16 MOTION to Disregard One or Both Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #14 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim and #13 MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
December 15, 2023 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark H. Cohen: Telephone Conference held on 12/15/2023. A telephone conference was conducted at the request of the Court to discuss a scheduling conflict. The hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction scheduled for December 21, 2023 at 1:30 p.m will not be rescheduled. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Wynette Blathers)(tmf)
December 14, 2023 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE PROCEEDING : Scheduling Conference set for 12/15/2023 at 4:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1905 before Judge Mark H. Cohen. Connection Instructions: Please call 1-888-684-8852, Access Code: 2921179#, As participant push #, Security Code: #1215. You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (lme)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Hearing. Motion Hearing regarding #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 12/21/2023 at 01:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1905 before Judge Mark H. Cohen. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/13/2023. (dob)
December 12, 2023 Filing 26 Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed) with Brief In Support by Onaxis Franchising Group, LLC. (Caiola, Anne)
December 12, 2023 Submission of #13 MOTION to Dismiss and #14 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To State a Claim to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
December 8, 2023 Filing 25 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 12/25/2023, 12/26/2023, 12/27/2023, 12/28/2023, 12/29/2023, 12/30/2023,12/31/2023, 1/1/2024,1/2/2024,1/3/2024,1/4/2023,1/5/2024, 2/13/2024, 2/14/2024, 2/15/2024, 2/16/2024, 2/17/2024, 2/18,2024, 2/19/2024, 2/20/2024, 3/29/2024, 3/30/2024, 3/31/2024,4/1/2024, 4/2/2024, 4/3/2024, 4/4/2024, 4/5/2024, 4/6/2024, 4/7/2024, 4/8/2024, 4/9/2024, by Anne Peirce Caiola. (Caiola, Anne)
December 7, 2023 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended to Include Missing Exhibits filed by Eitan Harod, Harod Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - California Code 310.114.1 - Offering Circular, #3 Exhibit B - Legatt Declaration)(Wallace, Kelly)
December 6, 2023 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Eitan Harod, Harod Ventures, LLC. (Wallace, Kelly)
December 6, 2023 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eitan Harod, Harod Ventures, LLC. (Wallace, Kelly)
November 29, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Disregard One or Both Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eitan Harod, Harod Ventures, LLC. (Wallace, Kelly)
November 28, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE for Leave of Absence for R. Michael Ghilezan for the dates of 12/7/2023 and 12/8/2023 (Ghilezan, Rares) Modified on 11/29/2023 to add leave dates (jpa).
November 22, 2023 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Onaxis Franchising Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anne P. Caiola, Esq.)(Caiola, Anne)
November 22, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Onaxis Franchising Group, LLC. (Caiola, Anne)
November 22, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Onaxis Franchising Group, LLC. (Caiola, Anne)
November 15, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Disregard One or Both Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #13 MOTION to Dismiss by Onaxis Franchising Group, LLC. (Caiola, Anne)
November 9, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Eitan Harod, Harod Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Ghilezan, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Eitan Harod)(Wallace, Kelly)
November 9, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Eitan Harod, Harod Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Eitan Harod)(Wallace, Kelly)
November 9, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Eitan Harod, Harod Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Ghilezan, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Eitan Harod)(Wallace, Kelly)
November 9, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Ghilezan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13020255). Attorney Rares Michael Ghilezan added appearing on behalf of Eitan Harod, Harod Ventures, LLC. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER Granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Ghilezan by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 11/9/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme)
November 8, 2023 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Ghilezan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13020255).by Eitan Harod, Harod Ventures, LLC. (Wallace, Kelly) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE the Plaintiff's #10 Emergency Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/30/23. (jpa)
October 30, 2023 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Onaxis Franchising Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - Enclosure Letter with Service of Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Proofs of Service)(Caiola, Anne)
October 30, 2023 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Onaxis Franchising Group, LLC. Harod Ventures, LLC served on 10/26/2023, answer due 11/16/2023. (Caiola, Anne)
October 30, 2023 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Onaxis Franchising Group, LLC. Eitan Harod served on 10/26/2023, answer due 11/16/2023. (Caiola, Anne)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/25/23. (jpa)
October 24, 2023 Filing 6 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 10/30/2023-11/03/2023, by Lindsay Mitchell Henner. (Henner, Lindsay)
October 24, 2023 Filing 5 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 10/30/2023-11/03/2023, by Anne Peirce Caiola. (Caiola, Anne)
October 23, 2023 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Eitan Harod and Harod Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Harod LLC)(jpa)
October 23, 2023 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jpa) Modified on 10/23/2023 (ane).
October 23, 2023 Submission of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (jpa)
October 21, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Onaxis Franchising Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(jpa) Modified on 10/23/2023 to correct date filed(ane).
October 21, 2023 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Temporary restraining order, preliminary and permanent injunctive relief and damages filed by Onaxis Franchising Group, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12977525) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 10/23/2023 to correct date filed (ane).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onaxis Franchising Group, LLC v. Harod et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onaxis Franchising Group, LLC
Represented By: Anne Peirce Caiola
Represented By: Lindsay Mitchell Henner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eitan Harod
Represented By: Rares Michael Ghilezan
Represented By: Kelly O. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harod Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Rares Michael Ghilezan
Represented By: Kelly O. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?