Drawdy v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Drawdy
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc., Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Altec, Inc. and Stuart C. Irby Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv05064
Filed: November 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Submission of #16 MOTION to Continue Defendant Georgia Transmission Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (bgt)
December 22, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #40 APPLICATION for Admission of William Neal Matthews Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William Neal Mathews added appearing on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
December 21, 2023 Filing 40 APPLICATION for Admission of William Neal Matthews Pro Hac Vice.by Honeywell International, Inc., Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C.. (Brantley, Terry) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 20, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE by Stuart C. Irby Company Defendant Stuart C. Irby Company's Joinder in Defendants Honeywell Internationa, Inc. And Salisbury Electrical Safety, L.L.C. Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Wetzel, Michael) Modified capitalized text on 12/21/2023 (nmb).
December 19, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #35 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason Randall Cashio Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13105405). Attorney Jason Randall Cashio added appearing on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
December 19, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #38 APPLICATION for Admission of Katie D. Bell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13105457). Attorney Katie D. Bell added appearing on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
December 19, 2023 RETURN of #36 APPLICATION for Admission of William Neal Matthews Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13105444) to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Applicant is required to list the highest state court to which he is admitted on his application. Listing all Louisiana State Courts is not sufficient. Please correct and resubmit. (rvb)
December 18, 2023 Filing 38 APPLICATION for Admission of Katie D. Bell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13105457).by Honeywell International, Inc., Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C.. (Brantley, Terry) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 18, 2023 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Altec, Inc.. (Michel, Carol)
December 18, 2023 Filing 36 APPLICATION for Admission of William Neal Matthews Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13105444).by Honeywell International, Inc., Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C.. (Brantley, Terry) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 18, 2023 Filing 35 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason Randall Cashio Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13105405).by Honeywell International, Inc., Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C.. (Brantley, Terry) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 15, 2023 Filing 34 RESPONSE re #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Honeywell International, Inc., Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - GTC Answer, #3 Exhibit 3 - GTC MSJ)(Brantley, Terry)
December 15, 2023 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Altec, Inc..(Michel, Carol) Modified capitalized text on 12/18/2023 (nmb).
December 11, 2023 Filing 32 RESPONSE re #16 MOTION to Continue Defendant Georgia Transmission Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Georgia Transmission Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (GTC's Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories), #2 Exhibit B (GTC's Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production), #3 Exhibit C (Rule 5.2 Certificate - GTC's Discovery Requests to Plaintiff), #4 Exhibit D (Affidavit of Kevin Luke), #5 Exhibit E (11/16/23 Email from John Grinnan), #6 Exhibit F (Georgia Mutual Aid Reimbursement Agreement), #7 Exhibit G (Member Transmission Services Agreement))(Peterson, Hugh)
December 11, 2023 Clerk's Notation re #17 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
December 11, 2023 Clerk's Notation re #24 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #21 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #22 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #28 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
December 7, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #31 APPLICATION for Admission of Randal Roe Cangelosi Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13078855). Attorney Randal Cangelosi added appearing on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #31 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Randal Roe Cangelosi. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/7/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
December 6, 2023 Filing 31 APPLICATION for Admission of Randal Roe Cangelosi Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13078855).by Honeywell International, Inc., Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C.. (Brantley, Terry) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #29 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Vance A. Gibbs. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/6/23. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
December 6, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #29 APPLICATION for Admission of Vance A. Gibbs Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13072937). Attorney Vance Gibbs added appearing on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #26 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 6/5/2024. Dispositive Motions shall be filed no later than 7/5/2024. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/5/2023. (tas)
December 5, 2023 Filing 29 APPLICATION for Admission of Vance A. Gibbs Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13072937).by Honeywell International, Inc., Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C.. (Brantley, Terry) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 5, 2023 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stuart C. Irby Company. (Wetzel, Michael)
December 4, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Jacob Drawdy. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1-Georgia's Answer, #3 Exhibit 2-Affidavit of Kevin Luke, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Findley, J.)
December 4, 2023 Filing 26 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Brantley, Terry)
December 4, 2023 Filing 25 Initial Disclosures by Georgia Transmission Corporation.(Peterson, Hugh)
December 4, 2023 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Georgia Transmission Corporation. (Peterson, Hugh)
December 4, 2023 Filing 23 Amended Initial Disclosures by Honeywell International, Inc., Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C..(Brantley, Terry)
December 4, 2023 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Morning Pride Manufacturing, LLC for Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C.. (Brantley, Terry)
December 4, 2023 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Brantley, Terry)
December 4, 2023 Filing 20 Initial Disclosures by Honeywell International, Inc., Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C..(Brantley, Terry)
December 4, 2023 Filing 19 Initial Disclosures by Stuart C. Irby Company.(Wetzel, Michael)
December 1, 2023 Filing 18 Initial Disclosures by Altec, Inc..(Michel, Carol)
December 1, 2023 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Altec, Inc.. (Michel, Carol)
November 27, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Continue Defendant Georgia Transmission Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment by Jacob Drawdy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of John Grinnan, #2 Exhibit 2-Georgia's Responses to RFP, #3 Exhibit 3-Correspondence dated November 16, 2023, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Findley, J.)
November 27, 2023 Submission of #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kurt B. Arnold, granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kala Flittner Sellers, granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John G. Grinnan, Jr., and granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Kyle Findley. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/27/23. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
November 22, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan Kyle Findley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13041283). Attorney J. Kyle Findley added appearing on behalf of Jacob Drawdy. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
November 21, 2023 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan Kyle Findley Pro Hac Vice.by Jacob Drawdy. (Pratt, Bradley) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 21, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of John G. Grinnan, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13041325). Attorney John G. Grinnan, Jr. added appearing on behalf of Jacob Drawdy. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
November 21, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Kurt B. Arnold Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13041311). Attorney Kurt B. Arnold added appearing on behalf of Jacob Drawdy. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
November 21, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Kala Flittner Sellers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13041320). Attorney Kala Flittner Sellers added appearing on behalf of Jacob Drawdy. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
November 21, 2023 RETURN of #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan Kyle Findley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13041283) to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Wrong attorney name and information. Please correct and resubmit. (cpp)
November 20, 2023 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of John G. Grinnan, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13041325).by Jacob Drawdy. (Pratt, Bradley) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Kala Flittner Sellers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13041320).by Jacob Drawdy. (Pratt, Bradley) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 20, 2023 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Kurt B. Arnold Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13041311).by Jacob Drawdy. (Pratt, Bradley) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 20, 2023 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan Kyle Findley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13041283).by Jacob Drawdy. (Pratt, Bradley) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 15, 2023 Filing 10 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to John G. Grinnan, Jr.. Clerk to follow-up by 11/27/2023. (cpp)
November 15, 2023 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to J. Kyle Findley. Clerk to follow-up by 11/27/2023. (cpp)
November 15, 2023 Filing 8 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Kurt Arnold. Clerk to follow-up by 11/27/2023. (cpp)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/6/23. (jkl)
November 2, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief in Support by Georgia Transmission Corporation. Originally filed with State Court of Dekalb County on 10/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Theories of Recovery and Material Facts, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(tht) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
November 2, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Altec, Inc. Originally filed with State Court of Dekalb County on 8/30/2023. (tht) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 2, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Georgia Transmission Corporation. Originally filed with State Court of Dekalb County on 6/30/2023 (tht) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 2, 2023 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Honeywell International, Inc., Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C. Originally filed with State Court of Dekalb County on 5/26/2023. (tht) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 2, 2023 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Stuart C. Irby Company. Discovery ends on 4/1/2024. Originally filed with State Court of Dekalb County on 5/26/2023.(tht) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 2, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Honeywell International, Inc. and Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-13007310) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Complaint, #5 Exhibit Interrogatory Responses, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(tht) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drawdy v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Drawdy
Represented By: Bradley W. Pratt
Represented By: Christopher Lambden
Represented By: Frank T. Bayuk
Represented By: John G. Grinnan, Jr.
Represented By: Kurt Arnold
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold
Represented By: J. Kyle Findley
Represented By: Kala Flittner Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Terry O. Brantley
Represented By: Graham Wade Davis
Represented By: Jason Randall Cashio
Represented By: Katie D. Bell
Represented By: Randal Cangelosi
Represented By: Vance A. Gibbs
Represented By: William Neal Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salisbury Electrical Safety L.L.C.
Represented By: Graham Wade Davis
Represented By: Terry O. Brantley
Represented By: William Neal Mathews
Represented By: Jason Randall Cashio
Represented By: Randal Cangelosi
Represented By: Vance A. Gibbs
Represented By: Katie D. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Transmission Corporation
Represented By: Brittany Temple
Represented By: Hugh Peterson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altec, Inc.
Represented By: Shivam Kumar
Represented By: Carol Patrick Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart C. Irby Company
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?