Amazon.com, Inc. et al v. Digital Home Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC and Amazon Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Digital Home Solutions LLC, Joti Applee Dhillon and Does 1-50
Case Number: 1:2023cv05175
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the time in which the Moving Defendants may answer, move, counterclaim, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs' Complaint shall be extended through and including January 17, 2024. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/6/23. (ces)
December 6, 2023 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order on Consent Motion to Extend Defendants' Deadline to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint re: #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint MOTION to Stay. (Forrest, Michael)
December 5, 2023 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Stay or MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Amazon Technologies, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. (Forrest, Michael) . Added MOTION to Stay on 12/6/2023 (ces).
November 30, 2023 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon Technologies, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. Joti Applee Dhillon served on 11/15/2023, answer due 12/6/2023. (MacNaughton, Bonnie)
November 30, 2023 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon Technologies, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. Digital Home Solutions LLC served on 11/15/2023, answer due 12/6/2023. (MacNaughton, Bonnie)
November 28, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
November 28, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorneys David Nordlinger and Jaime Drozd as to Amazon Technologies, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. re #11 Order. (mlb)
November 28, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorney Jaime Drozd as to Amazon Technologies, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. re Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb)
November 28, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Jaime Drozd Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13053843). Attorney Jaime Drozd added appearing on behalf of Amazon Technologies, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Bonnie MacNaughton and GRANTING #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Jaime Drozd. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/28/23. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
November 28, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Bonnie MacNaughton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13052173). Attorney Bonnie E. MacNaughton added appearing on behalf of Amazon Technologies, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
November 27, 2023 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Jaime Drozd Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13053843).by Amazon Technologies, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Kunkes, Craig) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Bonnie MacNaughton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13052173).by Amazon Technologies, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Kunkes, Craig) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eleanor L. Ross for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:23-cv-5175-ELR. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on this 21st day of November, 2023. (pdt)
November 20, 2023 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Jaime Drozd. Clerk to follow-up by 11/30/2023. (djs)
November 20, 2023 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to David Nordlinger. Clerk to follow-up by 11/30/2023. (djs)
November 20, 2023 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Bonnie E. MacNaughton. Clerk to follow-up by 11/30/2023. (djs)
November 14, 2023 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon Technologies, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Forrest, Michael)
November 13, 2023 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jbu)
November 9, 2023 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Joti Applee Dhillon, Digital Home Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Dhillon)(jbu)
November 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon Technologies, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-13021595) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jbu) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon.com, Inc. et al v. Digital Home Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Bonnie E. MacNaughton
Represented By: Craig G. Kunkes
Represented By: Michael David Forrest
Represented By: Jaime Drozd
Represented By: David Nordlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By: Bonnie E. MacNaughton
Represented By: Craig G. Kunkes
Represented By: Michael David Forrest
Represented By: David Nordlinger
Represented By: Jaime Drozd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Bonnie E. MacNaughton
Represented By: Craig G. Kunkes
Represented By: Michael David Forrest
Represented By: David Nordlinger
Represented By: Jaime Drozd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Home Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joti Applee Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?