Merrin-Cravens Co., Inc. v. Sunbelt Produce Distributors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Merrin-Cravens Co., Inc.
Defendant: Sunbelt Produce Distributors, Inc., Bernard Chapman Syme, Catherine Syme and Karin Sherman
Intervenor Plaintiff: Hollar & Greene Produce Co., Inc., and Wiers Farm, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv05270
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order: Plaintiffs dismissal is hereby APPROVED and this matter is now TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/27/2023. (rsg)
November 27, 2023 Civil Case Terminated. (rsg)
November 24, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Merrin-Cravens Co., Inc. (Moulton, Jeremy)
November 21, 2023 Filing 10 Joinder in Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order without Notice by Hollar & Greene Produce Co., Inc.,, Wiers Farm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Don Critcher, Hollar & Greene Produce, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Like Wiers, Wiers Farm, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Temporary Restraining Order) (Maxim, Kevin) Modified on 11/22/2023 to edit docket text (ddm).
November 21, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Intervene by Hollar & Greene Produce Co., Inc.,, Wiers Farm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" - Proposed Complaint-in-Intervention, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Motion for Leave to Intervene)(Maxim, Kevin)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hollar & Greene Produce Co., Inc.,, Wiers Farm, Inc.. (Maxim, Kevin)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. A hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for November 29, 2023 at 2:30 P.M. (Courtroom 1907, Richard B. Russell Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 75 Ted Turner Drive, S.W., Atlanta, Georgia 30303). Plaintiff shall forthwith serve Defendants, or its resident agent, or its counsel, with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/20/2023. (ddm)
November 20, 2023 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Hearing held on Plaintiff's motion for TRO. Order to follow granting motion and setting preliminary injunction hearing for November 29, 2023 at 2:30 PM. (Court Reporter Viola Zborowski)(ddm)
November 17, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2023 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
November 17, 2023 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED, to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (dob)
November 16, 2023 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Karin Sherman, Sunbelt Produce Distributors, Inc., Bernard Chapman Syme, Catherine Syme. (dob)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:23-5270-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/16/2023. (dob)
November 16, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merrin-Cravens Co., Inc.. (dob)
November 16, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED with Brief In Support by Merrin-Cravens Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit in Support, #3 Certification of Counsel, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(dob)
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Merrin-Cravens Co., Inc.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC13036461) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrin-Cravens Co., Inc. v. Sunbelt Produce Distributors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrin-Cravens Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Alexander Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbelt Produce Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Chapman Syme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Syme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karin Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Hollar & Greene Produce Co., Inc.,
Represented By: Kevin Allen Maxim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Wiers Farm, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Allen Maxim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?