Logan et al v. Macon Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jamaar Dewayne Logan, Alphonzo Logan and Dewayne Logan
Defendant: Macon Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center, LLC
Garnishee: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Ironshore Insurance Services, LLC and Ironshore Indemnity Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv05380
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER re: #14 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery is open and shall close on 4/29/2024. Dispositive motions due by 5/29/2024. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/2/2024. (nmb)
December 29, 2023 Filing 14 First JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Ironshore Indemnity Inc., Ironshore Insurance Services, LLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Alphonzo Logan, Dewayne Logan, Jamaar Dewayne Logan. (Schiller, Ronald)
December 11, 2023 Filing 13 TRAVERSE by Alphonzo Logan, Dewayne Logan, Jamaar Dewayne Logan. (Downs, William)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/4/23. (jkl)
December 4, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Ronald Paltin Schiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13065406). Attorney Ronald P. Schiller added appearing on behalf of Ironshore Indemnity Inc., Ironshore Insurance Services, LLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
December 4, 2023 Notification of Docket Correction: Case assigned to Judge Boulee but entered under Judge Totenberg in error (aar)
December 4, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas Nelson Brown Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13065458). Attorney Thomas N. Brown added appearing on behalf of Ironshore Indemnity Inc., Ironshore Insurance Services, LLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
December 4, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Nathan Klebanoff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13065222). Attorney Matthew N. Klebanoff added appearing on behalf of Ironshore Indemnity Inc., Ironshore Insurance Services, LLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Nathan Klebanoff, #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Robert Carlson, #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ronald Paltin Schiller and #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Nelson Brown. SO ORDERED by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/4/23. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
December 4, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Robert Carlson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13065372). Attorney Michael R. Carlson added appearing on behalf of Ironshore Indemnity Inc., Ironshore Insurance Services, LLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas Nelson Brown Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13065458).by Ironshore Indemnity Inc., Ironshore Insurance Services, LLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Bingham, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Ronald Paltin Schiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13065406).by Ironshore Indemnity Inc., Ironshore Insurance Services, LLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Bingham, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Robert Carlson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13065372).by Ironshore Indemnity Inc., Ironshore Insurance Services, LLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Bingham, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Nathan Klebanoff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13065222).by Ironshore Indemnity Inc., Ironshore Insurance Services, LLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Bingham, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ironshore Indemnity Inc., Ironshore Insurance Services, LLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Ironshore Holdings (US) Inc. for Ironshore Insurance Services, LLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Savrin, Philip)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Ironshore Indemnity Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Policy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-General Release)(Savrin, Philip) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Ironshore Insurance Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Policy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-General Release)(Savrin, Philip) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 4/29/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Policy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-General Release)(Savrin, Philip) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Ronald P. Schiller. Clerk to follow-up by 12/8/2023. (cpp)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Michael R. Carlson. Clerk to follow-up by 12/8/2023. (cpp)
November 22, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge J. P. Boulee. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:23-cv-5380-JPB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (aar)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with SUMMONS OF GARNISHMENT. filed by Ironshore Indemnity Inc., Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Ironshore Insurance Services, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-13048525) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(jbu) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logan et al v. Macon Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamaar Dewayne Logan
Represented By: Benjamin Foss Baker
Represented By: William W. Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alphonzo Logan
Represented By: Benjamin Foss Baker
Represented By: William W. Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Logan
Represented By: Benjamin Foss Baker
Represented By: William W. Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macon Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael R. Carlson
Represented By: Philip Wade Savrin
Represented By: Ronald P. Schiller
Represented By: William Shawn Bingham
Represented By: Matthew N. Klebanoff
Represented By: Thomas N. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Ironshore Insurance Services, LLC
Represented By: Ronald P. Schiller
Represented By: William Shawn Bingham
Represented By: Michael R. Carlson
Represented By: Philip Wade Savrin
Represented By: Matthew N. Klebanoff
Represented By: Thomas N. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Ironshore Indemnity Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Carlson
Represented By: Philip Wade Savrin
Represented By: Ronald P. Schiller
Represented By: William Shawn Bingham
Represented By: Matthew N. Klebanoff
Represented By: Thomas N. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?