Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Lehigh Development, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Lehigh Development, LLC, Brendan Walsh, Christopher Patafio and Michele Patafio
Case Number: 1:2023cv05384
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on January 11, 2024. (jkl)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge J. P. Boulee for all further proceedings. Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:23-cv-05384-JPB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/10/2024. (jkb)
January 8, 2024 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lehigh Development, LLC, Brendan Walsh. (Knott, Ethan)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry) denying as moot #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer filed on 1/5/2024. Ordered by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/8/2024. (jeh)
January 5, 2024 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Lehigh Development, LLC, Brendan Walsh.(Knott, Ethan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 3, 2024 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Lehigh Development, LLC, Brendan Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knott, Ethan)
January 3, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan M. Knott on behalf of Lehigh Development, LLC, Brendan Walsh (Knott, Ethan)
January 3, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Shattuck Ely on behalf of Lehigh Development, LLC, Brendan Walsh (Ely, Shattuck)
January 2, 2024 Clerk's Notation re #14 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
January 1, 2024 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons by Christopher Patafio, Michele Patafio. (Stack, Donald)
January 1, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Christopher Patafio, Michele Patafio. Discovery ends on 5/30/2024.(Stack, Donald) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 22, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Declaratory Judgment , as to Michelle Patafio. (Mast, Gregory)
December 22, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Declaratory Judgment , as to Lehigh Development, LLC. (Mast, Gregory)
December 22, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Declaratory Judgment , as to Christopher Patafio. (Mast, Gregory)
December 11, 2023 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brendan Walsh. (jkb)
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Michele Patafio. (jkb)
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Christopher Patafio. (jkb)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Lehigh Development, LLC. (jkb)
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company for Brendan Walsh (Mast, Gregory)
December 8, 2023 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company Christopher Patafio (Mast, Gregory)
December 8, 2023 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company for Michelle Patafio (Mast, Gregory)
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company for Lehigh Development (Mast, Gregory)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-13049119) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(tht) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Lehigh Development, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory L. Mast
Represented By: Megan Ashley Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehigh Development, LLC
Represented By: Ethan M. Knott
Represented By: Shattuck Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan Walsh
Represented By: Ethan M. Knott
Represented By: Shattuck Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Patafio
Represented By: George Lott
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Patafio
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: George Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?