Niang v. PhatMojo, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Abdoulaye Niang
Defendant: PhatMojo, LLC and Roy and Charcle, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv05446
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Geraghty
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by PhatMojo, LLC, Roy and Charcle, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #2 Exhibit Attachment 1 - Declaration of Garrett Fletcher)(Crain, Michael)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dorothy M. Weber. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 1/24/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ane)
January 24, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dorothy M. Weber re #19 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (ane)
January 19, 2024 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Dorothy M. Weber Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13166428). Attorney Dorothy M. Weber added appearing on behalf of PhatMojo, LLC, Roy and Charcle, LLC. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr)
January 18, 2024 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Dorothy M. Weber Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13166428).by PhatMojo, LLC, Roy and Charcle, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Crain, Michael) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Order Granting Limited Exception to Local Counsel Requirement under LR 83.1(B)(4). Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 1/17/2024. (sap)
January 16, 2024 Submission of #16 MOTION for Order Granting Limited Exception to Local Counsel Requirement under LR 83.1(B)(4) to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
December 20, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Order Granting Limited Exception to Local Counsel Requirement under LR 83.1(B)(4) by PhatMojo, LLC, Roy and Charcle, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Limited Exception to Local Counsel Requirement under LR 83.1(B)(4))(Crain, Michael)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint through and including 1/29/2024. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 12/18/2023. (ane)
December 15, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Cash V. Morris on behalf of PhatMojo, LLC, Roy and Charcle, LLC (Morris, Cash)
December 15, 2023 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by PhatMojo, LLC, Roy and Charcle, LLC. (Crain, Michael)
December 15, 2023 Filing 12 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Owen Crain on behalf of PhatMojo, LLC, Roy and Charcle, LLC (Crain, Michael) Modified on 12/18/2023 incorrect document attached (ane).
December 15, 2023 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by PhatMojo, LLC, Roy and Charcle, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint)(Crain, Michael)
December 15, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Owen Crain on behalf of PhatMojo, LLC, Roy and Charcle, LLC (Crain, Michael)
December 14, 2023 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Abdoulaye Niang. (Hawkins, James)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 12/8/2023. (sap)
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Abdoulaye Niang. PhatMojo, LLC served on 12/1/2023, answer due 12/22/2023. (Hawkins, James)
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Abdoulaye Niang. Roy and Charcle, LLC served on 12/1/2023, answer due 12/22/2023. (Hawkins, James)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (ane)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Hawkins, James)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Roy and Charcle, LLC. (dnb)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to PhatMojo, LLC. (dnb)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Abdoulaye Niang. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-13058314) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dnb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 29, 2023 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (dnb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niang v. PhatMojo, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdoulaye Niang
Represented By: Cary Ichter
Represented By: James W. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PhatMojo, LLC
Represented By: Dorothy M. Weber
Represented By: Cash V. Morris
Represented By: Michael Owen Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy and Charcle, LLC
Represented By: Dorothy M. Weber
Represented By: Cash V. Morris
Represented By: Michael Owen Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?