Janco FS3, LLC v. Pitcock
Plaintiff: Janco FS3, LLC
Defendant: Jason Pitcock
Case Number: 1:2023cv05469
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Filing 19 Initial Disclosures by Janco FS3, LLC.(Wolfe, Larry)
January 22, 2024 Filing 18 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Jason Pitcock. (Alpert, Robert)
January 22, 2024 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Pursuant to Local Rule 5.4(A) by Jason Pitcock.(Alpert, Robert)
January 22, 2024 Filing 16 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 2/5/2024 - 2/9/2024, 2/26/2024 - 3/1/2024, 3/4/2024 - 3/8/2024, 4/1/2024 - 4/5/2024, by Robert Philip Alpert. (Alpert, Robert)
January 22, 2024 Submission of #10 MOTION to Dismiss , to District Judge William M. Ray II. (sll)
January 19, 2024 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jason Pitcock. (Alpert, Robert)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING THE PRODUCTION AND EXCHANGE OF CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION: See document for specifics. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/10/2024. (tmf)
January 8, 2024 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY (Per Local Rule 5.4) by Jason Pitcock.(Alpert, Robert)
January 8, 2024 Notification of Docket Correction re #12 MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulation and Order Governing the Production and Exchange of Confidential and Highly Confidential Information with Brief In Support by Jason Pitcock. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulation and Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order - Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Hance, Douglas) Modified on 1/8/2024 to edit text and relief(tmf).
January 5, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulation and Order Governing the Production and Exchange of Confidential and Highly Confidential Information with Brief In Support by Jason Pitcock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulation and Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Hance, Douglas) Modified on 1/8/2024 to edit text and relief(tmf).
January 5, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Janco FS3, LLC. (Wolfe, Larry)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief - Having considered Attorney L. David Wolfes Motion for Attorney Leave of Absence [Doc. 8], the Motion is GRANTED. Attorney L. David Wolfe is granted leave from January 15, 2024, through and including February 21, 2024. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/2/24. (sll)
December 22, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Jason Pitcock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Pitcock_s Motion to Dismiss)(Hance, Douglas)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that paragraphs 38 and 39 of the Complaint and the Severance and Release Agreement submitted to the Court in connection with Jason Pitcock's Notice of Filing Provisionally Sealed Content (ECF No. #) and Motion for Leave to File Confidential Agreement Under Seal (ECF No. #) shall be shielded from public view and shall not be filed on the Courts public docket. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/19/2023. (tmf)
December 7, 2023 Notification of Docket Correction re #8 MOTION for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): Monday, January 15, 2024, through and including Wednesday, February 21, 2024, by Larry David Wolfe. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Larry) Modified on 12/7/2023 to edit event (tmf).
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): Monday, January 15, 2024, through and including Wednesday, February 21, 2024, by Larry David Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Larry) Modified on 12/7/2023 to edit event(tmf).
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Having considered Defendant's Emergency Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, and for good cause shown, the Court hereby orders that the Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint in this case shall be extended through and including December 22, 2023. Also, on the Court's own initiative, sua sponte, the Court shortens the time with which the Defendant has to file his response, answers, and produce responsive documents to outstanding discovery requests to no later than January 8, 2024. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/5/2023. (tmf)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #5 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Janco FS3, LLC. (Wolfe, Larry)
December 5, 2023 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Jason Pitcock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brief in Supp. of Motion & Ex. 1 Decl. of R. Alpert, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hance, Douglas)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jason Pitcock. (Hance, Douglas)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #2 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Jason Pitcock. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hance, Douglas)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing The second exhibit to the Complaint, titled Severance and Release Agreement, and paragraphs 38 and 39 to the Complaint contain confidential information. by Jason Pitcock re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Complaint and exhibits (containing provisionally sealed content))(Hance, Douglas) Modified on 12/19/2023 to edit red text(tmf).
November 30, 2023 Submission of #1 Notice of Removal, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (lower court complaint contains a request for def to be temporary, preliminary and permanently enjoined and restrained for 12 mos) (tmf) Modified on 11/30/2023 to edit text(tmf).
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT that has request for a temporary, preliminary and permanently enjoined restraining for 12 mos filed by Jason Pitcock. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-13060437) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Complaint and exhibits (provisionally sealed), #2 Exhibit 2- Eastern District of MI Filings, #3 Exhibit 3- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit 4- All State Court Filings, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janco FS3, LLC v. Pitcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janco FS3, LLC
Represented By: Larry David Wolfe
Represented By: Mark Van Spix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Pitcock
Represented By: Douglas Hance
Represented By: Eliza Del Carmen
Represented By: Robert Philip Alpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?