Liberty One Funding Trust et al v. Achenbach et al
Plaintiff: Liberty One Funding Trust and Liberty Two Funding Trust
Defendant: Brian Achenbach, Nancy Belser, Andrew Costanza, Andrew Darrow, David Darrow, Jonathan Darrow, Jay Grimm, Jr., Robert Krakovitz, Moshe Malka, Leon Malnik, Barry Septimus and Phyllis Sifen
Case Number: 1:2023cv05483
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal - Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Victoria G. Mazzola re #33 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (kng)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #31 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Victoria G. Mazzola. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/23/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
January 23, 2024 Filing 32 First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment, Stay of Arbitration, and Other Relief against All Defendants filed by Liberty One Funding Trust, Liberty Two Funding Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-G to Liberty One Filing Trust Amended Complaint 1.24.23)(Lucas, Catherine) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 22, 2024 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #31 APPLICATION for Admission of Victoria G. Mazzola Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13169212). Attorney Victoria G. Mazzola added appearing on behalf of Brian Achenbach, Nancy Belser, Andrew Costanza, Andrew Darrow, David Darrow, Jonathan Darrow, Jay Grimm, Jr., Robert Krakovitz, Moshe Malka, Leon Malnik, Barry Septimus, Phyllis Sifen. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr)
January 19, 2024 Filing 31 APPLICATION for Admission of Victoria G. Mazzola Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13169212).by Brian Achenbach, Nancy Belser, Andrew Costanza, Andrew Darrow, David Darrow, Jonathan Darrow, Jay Grimm, Jr, Robert Krakovitz, Moshe Malka, Leon Malnik, Barry Septimus, Phyllis Sifen. (Le Jeune, Danielle) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 16, 2024 Filing 30 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Brian Achenbach, Nancy Belser, Andrew Costanza, Andrew Darrow, David Darrow, Jonathan Darrow, Jay Grimm, Jr, Robert Krakovitz, Moshe Malka, Leon Malnik, Barry Septimus, Phyllis Sifen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Consolidate Actions)(Olczak, Saskia) Modified to remove double wording on 1/17/2024 (kng).
January 16, 2024 Submission of #30 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpk)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) denying as moot the parties' #9 Motion for Extension of Time in the light of the Court's December 26 Order (Dkt. 29). Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/27/2023. (jpk)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING #28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Deadlines. Any motion to remand by the Liberty Plaintiffs will be filed by 1/17/2024. Any response and reply will be due in accordance with the Court's Local Rules. The removing Defendants' responsive pleading (whether an answer or amotion to dismiss) to the Liberty Plaintiffs' removed complaint will be due the later of either 1/24/2024, or 14 days after entry of an order denying a motion to remand, or 21 days after the filing of an amended complaint. (See Order for further directives). Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/26/2023. (tas)
December 21, 2023 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Deadlines by Brian Achenbach, Nancy Belser, Andrew Costanza, Andrew Darrow, David Darrow, Jonathan Darrow, Jay Grimm, Jr, Robert Krakovitz, Moshe Malka, Leon Malnik, Barry Septimus, Phyllis Sifen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time)(Olczak, Saskia) Modified to remove double wording on 12/22/2023 (kng).
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Miller. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/18/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 15, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #26 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael J. Miller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13095779). Attorney Michael J. Miller added appearing on behalf of Brian Achenbach, Nancy Belser, Andrew Costanza, Andrew Darrow, David Darrow, Jonathan Darrow, Jay Grimm, Jr., Robert Krakovitz, Moshe Malka, Leon Malnik, Barry Septimus, Phyllis Sifen. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
December 14, 2023 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael J. Miller Pro Hac Vice.by Brian Achenbach, Nancy Belser, Andrew Costanza, Andrew Darrow, David Darrow, Jonathan Darrow, Jay Grimm, Jr, Robert Krakovitz, Moshe Malka, Leon Malnik, Barry Septimus, Phyllis Sifen. (Le Jeune, Danielle) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory J. Star. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/14/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Chase Howard. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/14/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 14, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #22 APPLICATION for Admission of Chase Howard Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13095961).. Attorney Chase Howard added appearing on behalf of Brian Achenbach, Nancy Belser, Andrew Costanza, Andrew Darrow, David Darrow, Jonathan Darrow, Jay Grimm, Jr., Robert Krakovitz, Moshe Malka, Leon Malnik, Barry Septimus, Phyllis Sifen. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
December 14, 2023 RETURN of #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael J. Miller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13095779). to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Application is filed under the wrong name. (djs)
December 14, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #23 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory J Star Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13096003).. Attorney Gregory J. Star added appearing on behalf of Brian Achenbach, Nancy Belser, Andrew Costanza, Andrew Darrow, David Darrow, Jonathan Darrow, Jay Grimm, Jr., Robert Krakovitz, Moshe Malka, Leon Malnik, Barry Septimus, Phyllis Sifen. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
December 14, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Chase Howard re #24 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (kng)
December 13, 2023 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory J Star Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13096003).by Brian Achenbach, Nancy Belser, Andrew Costanza, Andrew Darrow, David Darrow, Jonathan Darrow, Jay Grimm, Jr, Robert Krakovitz, Moshe Malka, Leon Malnik, Barry Septimus, Phyllis Sifen. (Le Jeune, Danielle) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 13, 2023 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission of Chase Howard Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13095961).by Brian Achenbach, Nancy Belser, Andrew Costanza, Andrew Darrow, David Darrow, Jonathan Darrow, Jay Grimm, Jr, Robert Krakovitz, Moshe Malka, Leon Malnik, Barry Septimus, Phyllis Sifen. (Le Jeune, Danielle) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 13, 2023 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael J. Miller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13095779).by Brian Achenbach, Nancy Belser, Andrew Costanza, Andrew Darrow, David Darrow, Jonathan Darrow, Jay Grimm, Jr, Robert Krakovitz, Moshe Malka, Leon Malnik, Barry Septimus, Phyllis Sifen. (Le Jeune, Danielle) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thorn Rosenthal. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/12/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Margaret Ann Barone. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/12/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lauren B. Perlgut. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/12/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joel L. Kurtzberg. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/12/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 12, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Lauren B. Perlgut re #18 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (kng)
December 12, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Margaret Ann Barone re #19 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (kng)
December 12, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Thorn Rosenthal re #20 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (kng)
December 12, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Joel L. Kurtzberg re #17 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (kng)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael L. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:23-cv-05483-MLB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/11/2023. (jkb)
December 11, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Thorn Rosenthal Pro Hac Vice(Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13079627). Attorney Thorn Rosenthal added appearing on behalf of Liberty One Funding Trust, Liberty Two Funding Trust. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
December 11, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to attorneys re #15 Order Reassigning Case. (jkb)
December 8, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Lauren B. Perlgut Pro Hac Vice(Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13079563). Attorney Lauren Perlgut added appearing on behalf of Liberty One Funding Trust, Liberty Two Funding Trust. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
December 8, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Joel L. Kurtzberg Pro Hac Vice(Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13079492). Attorney Joel Kurtzberg added appearing on behalf of Liberty One Funding Trust, Liberty Two Funding Trust. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
December 8, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Margaret Ann Barone Pro Hac Vice(Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13079590). Attorney Margaret Barone added appearing on behalf of Liberty One Funding Trust, Liberty Two Funding Trust. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
December 7, 2023 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Thorn Rosenthal Pro Hac Vice.by Liberty One Funding Trust, Liberty Two Funding Trust. (Weiss, Terry) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 7, 2023 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Margaret Ann Barone Pro Hac Vice.by Liberty One Funding Trust, Liberty Two Funding Trust. (Weiss, Terry) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Lauren B. Perlgut Pro Hac Vice.by Liberty One Funding Trust, Liberty Two Funding Trust. (Weiss, Terry) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Joel L. Kurtzberg Pro Hac Vice.by Liberty One Funding Trust, Liberty Two Funding Trust. (Weiss, Terry) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty One Funding Trust, Liberty Two Funding Trust identifying Corporate Parent Horizon Trade and Finance (Ireland) Limited, Corporate Parent Horizon Trade & Finance (Ireland) Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent HTF EXC, LLC, Corporate Parent BlueMountain Guadalupe Peak Fund L/P, Corporate Parent BlueMountain Logan Opportunities Master Fund L.P. for Liberty One Funding Trust, Liberty Two Funding Trust. (Lucas, Catherine)
December 7, 2023 ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR--- APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Lauren B. Perlgut Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13079563). Attorney Lauren Perlgut added appearing on behalf of Liberty One Funding Trust, Liberty Two Funding Trust. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs) Modified on 12/7/2023 (djs).
December 7, 2023 ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR---APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Joel L. Kurtzberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13079492). Attorney Joel Kurtzberg added appearing on behalf of Liberty One Funding Trust, Liberty Two Funding Trust. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs) Modified on 12/7/2023 (djs).
December 7, 2023 RETURN of #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Joel L. Kurtzberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13079492). to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Local counsel must e-file application (djs)
December 7, 2023 RETURN of #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Thorn Rosenthal Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13079627). to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Local counsel must e-file application (djs)
December 7, 2023 RETURN of #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Lauren B. Perlgut Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13079563). to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Local counsel must e-file application (djs)
December 7, 2023 RETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Margaret Ann Barone Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13079590). to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Local counsel must e-file application (djs)
December 6, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' to Answer or File Responses to Plantiffs' Complaint re: #1 Notice of Removal,,, by Brian Achenbach, Nancy Belser, Andrew Costanza, Andrew Darrow, David Darrow, Jonathan Darrow, Jay Grimm, Jr, Robert Krakovitz, Moshe Malka, Leon Malnik, Barry Septimus, Phyllis Sifen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Olczak, Saskia)
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Thorn Rosenthal Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13079627).by Liberty One Funding Trust, Liberty Two Funding Trust. (Lucas, Catherine) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 6, 2023 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Margaret Ann Barone Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13079590).by Liberty One Funding Trust, Liberty Two Funding Trust. (Lucas, Catherine) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 6, 2023 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Lauren B. Perlgut Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13079563).by Liberty One Funding Trust, Liberty Two Funding Trust. (Lucas, Catherine) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 6, 2023 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Joel L. Kurtzberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13079492).by Liberty One Funding Trust, Liberty Two Funding Trust. (Lucas, Catherine) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Joel Kurtzberg. Clerk to follow-up by 12/11/2023. (djs)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Thorn Rosenthal. Clerk to follow-up by 12/11/2023. (djs)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Lauren Perlgut. Clerk to follow-up by 12/11/2023. (djs)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Jay Grimm, Jr., Robert Krakovitz, Phyllis Sifen, Brian Achenbach, Jonathan Darrow, Leon Malnik, Barry Septimus, Nancy Belser, Andrew Costanza, Andrew Darrow, David Darrow, Moshe Malka. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-13062351) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Motion to Stay, #3 Exhibit C - Docket, #4 Exhibit D - Summons, #5 Exhibit E - Motion to Seal Exhibits to Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - Motion to Seal Exhibits to Motion to Stay, #7 Exhibit G - Corporate Disclosure Statement, #8 Exhibit H - Order Granting Motion to Seal, #9 Exhibit I - Acknowledgement, #10 Exhibit J - Horizon Certificate of Incorporation, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(pdt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty One Funding Trust et al v. Achenbach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty One Funding Trust
Represented By: Catherine Grumbles Lucas
Represented By: Joel Kurtzberg
Represented By: Lauren Perlgut
Represented By: Terry Robert Weiss
Represented By: Thorn Rosenthal
Represented By: Margaret Barone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Two Funding Trust
Represented By: Joel Kurtzberg
Represented By: Catherine Grumbles Lucas
Represented By: Terry Robert Weiss
Represented By: Lauren Perlgut
Represented By: Thorn Rosenthal
Represented By: Margaret Barone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Achenbach
Represented By: Danielle Corin Le Jeune
Represented By: Saskia Olczak
Represented By: Chase A. Howard
Represented By: Gregory J. Star
Represented By: Michael J. Miller
Represented By: Victoria G. Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Belser
Represented By: Danielle Corin Le Jeune
Represented By: Saskia Olczak
Represented By: Chase A. Howard
Represented By: Gregory J. Star
Represented By: Michael J. Miller
Represented By: Victoria G. Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Costanza
Represented By: Danielle Corin Le Jeune
Represented By: Saskia Olczak
Represented By: Chase A. Howard
Represented By: Gregory J. Star
Represented By: Michael J. Miller
Represented By: Victoria G. Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Darrow
Represented By: Danielle Corin Le Jeune
Represented By: Saskia Olczak
Represented By: Chase A. Howard
Represented By: Gregory J. Star
Represented By: Michael J. Miller
Represented By: Victoria G. Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Darrow
Represented By: Danielle Corin Le Jeune
Represented By: Saskia Olczak
Represented By: Chase A. Howard
Represented By: Gregory J. Star
Represented By: Michael J. Miller
Represented By: Victoria G. Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Darrow
Represented By: Danielle Corin Le Jeune
Represented By: Saskia Olczak
Represented By: Chase A. Howard
Represented By: Gregory J. Star
Represented By: Michael J. Miller
Represented By: Victoria G. Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Grimm, Jr.
Represented By: Danielle Corin Le Jeune
Represented By: Saskia Olczak
Represented By: Chase A. Howard
Represented By: Gregory J. Star
Represented By: Michael J. Miller
Represented By: Victoria G. Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Krakovitz
Represented By: Danielle Corin Le Jeune
Represented By: Saskia Olczak
Represented By: Chase A. Howard
Represented By: Gregory J. Star
Represented By: Michael J. Miller
Represented By: Victoria G. Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moshe Malka
Represented By: Danielle Corin Le Jeune
Represented By: Saskia Olczak
Represented By: Chase A. Howard
Represented By: Gregory J. Star
Represented By: Michael J. Miller
Represented By: Victoria G. Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Malnik
Represented By: Danielle Corin Le Jeune
Represented By: Saskia Olczak
Represented By: Chase A. Howard
Represented By: Gregory J. Star
Represented By: Michael J. Miller
Represented By: Victoria G. Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Septimus
Represented By: Danielle Corin Le Jeune
Represented By: Saskia Olczak
Represented By: Chase A. Howard
Represented By: Gregory J. Star
Represented By: Michael J. Miller
Represented By: Victoria G. Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Sifen
Represented By: Danielle Corin Le Jeune
Represented By: Saskia Olczak
Represented By: Chase A. Howard
Represented By: Gregory J. Star
Represented By: Michael J. Miller
Represented By: Victoria G. Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?