Hayes v. McCalla Raymer Liebert Pierce LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sylvia Hayes
Defendant: McCalla Raymer Liebert Pierce LLC, Jay Bray CEO doing business as Mr. Cooper, Nationstar/Mr. Cooper, Housing and Urban Development and Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Case Number: 1:2023cv05484
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Submission of #10 Order on Motion to Stay to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
January 10, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #9 Notice (Other) Nationstar's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Notice to Remand filed by Jay Bray, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Turner, Casondra)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Motion to Stay #8 is GRANTED as unopposed. In the event that any Defendant files an answer before the District Court enters a final ruling on the pending Motion to Dismiss #7 , the commencement of discovery will be STAYED for thirty (30) days after the date of the order ruling on the Motion to Dismiss #7 . Further, the deadlines for the parties to participate in a Rule 26(f) conference, file a Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, and serve initial disclosures are also STAYED pending a final order on the Motion to Dismiss #7 . In the event that any Defendant files an answer or the Motion to Dismiss #7 is denied, the parties shall participate in a Rule 26(f) conference within fourteen (14) days after the District Court issues a final ruling on the Motion to Dismiss, and the parties shall file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan and serve initial disclosures within thirty (30) days after the District Court issues a final ruling on the Motion to Dismiss #7 . Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a CIP within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 1/8/24. (ces)
January 8, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sylvia Hayes re #10 Order. (ces)
January 3, 2024 Submission of #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and #8 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Discovery to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (mlb)
December 28, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE to Remand Case to Gwinnett County by Sylvia Hayes (ces)
December 7, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Discovery with Brief In Support by Jay Bray, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Casondra)
December 7, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Jay Bray, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Turner, Casondra)
December 7, 2023 Clerk's Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jay Bray, Nationstar/Mr. Cooper identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc. (formerly known as WMIH Corp.), Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate KKR Wand Investors Corporation for Jay Bray, Nationstar/Mr. Cooper. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiff's requests for an "immediate hearing" and "immediate injunction" as set forth within the Complaint. #2 . The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to substitute Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper" for "Nationstar/Mr. Cooper" as a Party Defendant in this matter. Next, upon review of the Complaint, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to change the nature of this case and cause of action to reflect the Fair Debt Collection Practice Act and DIRECTS the Clerk to refer this case to a Magistrate Judge pursuant to Standing Order 18-01. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/5/23. (ces)
December 5, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (ces)
December 5, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sylvia Hayes re #6 Order. (ces)
December 5, 2023 Submission of #6 Order, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (ces)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jay Bray, Nationstar/Mr. Cooper identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc. (formerly known as WMIH Corp.), Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate KKR Wand Investors Corporation for Jay Bray, Nationstar/Mr. Cooper. (Turner, Casondra)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Amended Exhibit A re #1 Notice of Removal by Jay Bray, Nationstar/Mr. Cooper (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Turner, Casondra) Modified to correct text on 12/5/2023 (ces).
December 1, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sylvia Hayes re #3 Order. (ces)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/30/23. (ces)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, MOTION for Permanent Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTEDby Sylvia Hayes. (ces)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Nationstar/Mr. Cooper. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-13063044) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ces) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 30, 2023 Submission of #2 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, MOTION for Permanent Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (ces)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. McCalla Raymer Liebert Pierce LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCalla Raymer Liebert Pierce LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Bray CEO doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Casondra Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar/Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Casondra Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Casondra Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?