TJM Columbus, LLC et al v. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TJM Columbus, LLC doing business as Crowne Plaza- Columbus North and TJM Syracuse, LLC doing business as Crowne Plaza Syracuse
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC and Six Continents Hotels, Inc. doing business as Intercontinental Hotels Group
Case Number: 1:2024cv00055
Filed: January 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Victoria M Calvert
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2024 Submission of #23 MOTION for Leave to File SurReply in Opposition to Motion to Remand, to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (vs)
February 7, 2024 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Support re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Coleman, Ronald)
February 1, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File SurReply in Opposition to Motion to Remand by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - SurReply in Opposition to Motion to Remand)(Coleman, Ronald)
January 26, 2024 Submission of #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court , to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (vs)
January 25, 2024 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by TJM Columbus, LLC, TJM Syracuse, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand)(Gibson, MaryBeth)
January 24, 2024 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TJM Columbus, LLC, TJM Syracuse, LLC. (Gibson, MaryBeth)
January 22, 2024 Filing 20 RESPONSE re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Memorandum in Support filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Barsness, Paul)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Morgan Shae Birch. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 1/16/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dnb)
January 16, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Morgan Birch re #19 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (dnb)
January 12, 2024 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Morgan Shae Birch Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13148357). Attorney Morgan Birch added appearing on behalf of TJM Columbus, LLC. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr)
January 11, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief - Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #2 Affidavit - Declaration of Jenny Tidwell)(Coleman, Ronald)
January 11, 2024 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Morgan Shae Birch Pro Hac Vice.by TJM Columbus, LLC, TJM Syracuse, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for PHV Application of Morgan Shae Birch)(Gibson, MaryBeth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 11, 2024 RETURN of #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Morgan Shae Birch Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13148357) to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Application states the subject case is in the Gainesville division, but the case is filed in the Atlanta Division. Please correct and resubmit. (esr)
January 10, 2024 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Morgan Shae Birch Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13148357).by TJM Columbus, LLC, TJM Syracuse, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for PHV Application of Morgan Shae Birch)(Gibson, MaryBeth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 8, 2024 Filing 15 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Morgan Birch. Clerk to follow-up by 1/18/2024. (djs)
January 8, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by TJM Columbus, LLC, TJM Syracuse, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Remand)(Gibson, MaryBeth)
January 8, 2024 Submission of #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #5 MOTION to Stay, #6 MOTION for Protective Order to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (kng)
January 4, 2024 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. filed by TJM Columbus, LLC, TJM Syracuse, LLC. (Filed originally in Superior Court of DeKalb County on 12/6/2023).(kng) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 4, 2024 Filing 13 REPLY in Support of Defendants' #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Filed originally in Superior Court of DeKalb County on 12/1/2023). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(kng)
January 4, 2024 Filing 12 Consolidated REPLY in Support of Defendants' #5 MOTION to Stay Discovery and #6 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Filed originally in Superior Court of DeKalb County on 12/1/2023). (kng)
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 TJM's Opposition to Defendants' #6 MOTION for Protective Order filed by TJM Columbus, LLC, TJM Syracuse, LLC. (Filed originally in Superior Court of DeKalb County on 11/8/2023). (kng)
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 TJM's Opposition to Defendants' re #5 MOTION to Stay filed by TJM Columbus, LLC, TJM Syracuse, LLC. (Filed originally in Superior Court of DeKalb County on 10/13/2023). (kng)
January 4, 2024 Filing 9 TJM's Memorandum of Law Opposing Defendant's #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TJM Columbus, LLC, TJM Syracuse, LLC. (Filed originally in Superior Court of DeKalb County on 10/13/2023). (kng)
January 4, 2024 Filing 7 TJM's Response to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts re #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TJM Columbus, LLC, TJM Syracuse, LLC. (Filed originally in Superior Court of DeKalb County on 10/13/2023). (kng)
January 4, 2024 Filing 6 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Filed originally in Superior Court of DeKalb County on 10/9/2023). (kng)
January 4, 2024 Filing 5 Defendant's MOTION to Stay with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Filed originally in Superior Court of DeKalb County on 9/14/2023). (kng)
January 4, 2024 Filing 4 Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Their #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Filed originally in Superior Court of DeKalb County on 9/14/2023). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(kng)
January 4, 2024 Filing 3 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief in Support by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Filed originally in Superior Court of DeKalb County on 9/14/2023). (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Memorandum of Fact and Law in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment)(kng) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
January 4, 2024 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. Discovery ends on 6/3/2024. (Filed originally in Superior Court of DeKalb County on 5/5/2023).(kng) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 4, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13136286) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 TJM First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 part 1 - State Court Action pleadings, #4 Exhibit 2 part 2 - State Court Action pleadings, #5 Exhibit 2 part 3 - State Court Action pleadings, #6 Exhibit 3 Notice to State Court of Removal of Am)(kng) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TJM Columbus, LLC et al v. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TJM Columbus, LLC doing business as Crowne Plaza- Columbus North
Represented By: Justin E. Proper
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Represented By: Morgan Birch
Represented By: N. Nickolas Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TJM Syracuse, LLC doing business as Crowne Plaza Syracuse
Represented By: Justin E. Proper
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Represented By: Morgan Birch
Represented By: N. Nickolas Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Paul Raymond Barsness
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Continents Hotels, Inc. doing business as Intercontinental Hotels Group
Represented By: Paul Raymond Barsness
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?