Henry et al v. Neal et al
Plaintiff: Aja N. Henry and James A. Henry
Defendant: Joyce Neal, DeKalb County Corp., Marshal Sgt. L. Huang, Judge Joyce Neal, ALLY Bank and South Dekalb Towing & Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00145
Filed: January 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Geraghty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2024 Submission of #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and #14 MOTION to Stay Initial Pretrial and Discovery Obligations Pending Resolution of His Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
February 27, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by ALLY Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2022-06-29 James Henry's Answer)(Carter, Avery)
February 27, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Avery Carter on behalf of ALLY Bank (Carter, Avery)
February 23, 2024 Submission of #10 MOTION for Injunction to Stay Defendant Ally Notice to Sell Private Property to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
February 20, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Joyce Neal. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Dobras, Rebecca)
February 20, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Joyce Neal. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certified Copy of Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - Certified Copy of Docket)(Dobras, Rebecca)
February 8, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Initial Pretrial and Discovery Obligations Pending Resolution of His Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Brief In Support by L. Huang. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Dobras, Rebecca)
February 8, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by L. Huang. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Certified Copy of Order, #3 Exhibit B - Certified Copy of Docket)(Dobras, Rebecca)
February 7, 2024 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by James A. Henry, Aja N. Henry. ALLY Bank served on 2/6/2024, answer due 2/27/2024. (ane)
February 5, 2024 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to South Dekalb Towing & Transport, Inc. (ane)
February 5, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Injunction to Stay Defendant Ally Notice to Sell Private Property by Aja N. Henry, James A. Henry. (ane)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 2/5/2024. (ane)
February 5, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Aja N. Henry, James A. Henry re #9 Order. (ane)
January 31, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALLY Bank, DeKalb County Corp., L. Huang, Joyce Neal, South Dekalb Towing & Transport, Inc. filed by Aja N. Henry, James A. Henry.(ane) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 31, 2024 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Aja N. Henry, James A. Henry. L. Huang served on 1/18/2024, answer due 2/8/2024. (ane)
January 31, 2024 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Aja N. Henry, James A. Henry. Judge Joyce Neal served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (ane)
January 31, 2024 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Aja N. Henry, James A. Henry. Joyce Neal served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (ane)
January 18, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ALLY Bank. (ane)
January 12, 2024 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT to Add ALLY Bank filed by Aja N. Henry, James A. Henry.(jbu) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 11, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to L. Huang, Joyce Neal, Judge Joyce Neal. (kng)
January 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Aja N. Henry, James A. Henry. (Filing fee $405, receipt number 100008913) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(kng) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry et al v. Neal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aja N. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeKalb County Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshal Sgt. L. Huang
Represented By: Rebecca Jean Dobras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Joyce Neal
Represented By: Rebecca Jean Dobras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLY Bank
Represented By: Avery Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Dekalb Towing & Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?