Caudle v. Department of Justice=DOJ et al
Plaintiff: Allen Okechukwu Caudle
Defendant: Department of Justice=DOJ, Department Of Defense=DOD, National Reconnaissance Office=NRO, Drug Enforcement Administration=DEA, Defense Counter Intelligence and Security Agency=DCSA and National Geospatial Intelligence Agency=NGA
Case Number: 1:2024cv00166
Filed: January 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Seal Case by Allen Okechukwu Caudle. (tas)
February 28, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for an Emergency Ruling, Mediation, Arbitration, Alternative Dispute Resolution, and or Hearing by Allen Okechukwu Caudle. (tas)
February 28, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Enforce all Parties to Mediate by Allen Okechukwu Caudle. (tas)
February 28, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Allow Email Communications by Allen Okechukwu Caudle. (tas)
February 28, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION Requesting the Court Allows the Plaintiff and the Defendant to Attemp to Resolve the Matter Using Video Conferences by Allen Okechukwu Caudle. (tas)
February 28, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Service by US Marshals by Allen Okechukwu Caudle. (tas)
February 28, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION that Defendant be Ordered to Comply with the Plaintiff's Requests for Records and Discoveries by Allen Okechukwu Caudle. (tas)
February 28, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION Requesting that Defendants Comply to his Requests for Default Judgment by Allen Okechukwu Caudle. (tas)
February 28, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to National Geospatial Intelligence Agency by Allen Okechukwu Caudle. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(tas)
February 28, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to National Reconnaissance Office by Allen Okechukwu Caudle. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(tas)
February 28, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Drug Enforcement Administration by Allen Okechukwu Caudle. (tas)
February 28, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Drug Enforcement Administration by Allen Okechukwu Caudle. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(tas)
February 28, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Allen Okechukwu Caudle. (tas)
February 28, 2024 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Drug Enforcement Administration=DEA, National Geospatial Intelligence Agency=NGA, National Reconnaissance Office=NRO with Jury Demand filed by Allen Okechukwu Caudle.(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 20, 2024 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Not Deliverable as Addressed. Mail sent to Allen Okechukwu Caudle re #4 Order. (tas)
February 20, 2024 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Allen Okechukwu Caudle re #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (tas)
January 19, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Allen Okechukwu Caudle re #4 Order. (tas)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 1/18/2024. (tas)
January 16, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Allen Okechukwu Caudle re #2 Order. (bgt)
January 12, 2024 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with request for TRO and Injunctive Relief with Jury Demand filed by Allen Okechukwu Caudle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bgt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this action to the presiding District Judge for a frivolity determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and to terminate the referral to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 1/12/2024. (bgt)
January 12, 2024 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (ces)
January 12, 2024 Case Reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg and Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. Judge Eleanor L. Ross no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:24-cv-00166-SDG-RDC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (ces)
January 12, 2024 Notification of Docket Correction: Case was assigned to Judge Ross and Judge Anand in error. Pro se previous filer with Judge Grimberg and Magistrate Judge Canon (aar)
January 12, 2024 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (ces)
January 11, 2024 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Allen Okechukwu Caudle. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with emergency request for INJ & TRO, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ces)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caudle v. Department of Justice=DOJ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Okechukwu Caudle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice=DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department Of Defense=DOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Reconnaissance Office=NRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration=DEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Counter Intelligence and Security Agency=DCSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Geospatial Intelligence Agency=NGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?