State of Georgia et al v. Wyndham Vacation (Resorts) Ownership, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: State of Georgia, Donna Marie Smith and Ernest Welch Smith
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation (Resorts) Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Club, Wyndham Vacation Management, Inc., Margaritaville Vacation Club by Wyndham, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts Puerto Rico, LLC, Travel + Leisure, Clubs & Rental, LLC, Michael Manzella and Sujaily Santiago
Case Number: 1:2024cv00691
Filed: February 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: J Elizabeth McBath
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Plaintiffs' #8 Verified Motion for Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order, is DENIED; Plaintiffs' #9 Second Verified Motion for Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order, is DENIED; Plaintiffs' #10 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, is DENIED; and Plaintiffs' #11 Motion to Change Venue, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 3/26/2024. (kng)
March 26, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Donna Marie Smith, Ernest Welch Smith re #12 Order. (kng)
March 25, 2024 Submission of #8 MOTION for Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order; #9 MOTION for Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order; #10 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and #11 MOTION to Change Venue to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (jpk)
March 12, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Change Venue by Donna Marie Smith, Ernest Welch Smith. (kng)
March 12, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donna Marie Smith, Ernest Welch Smith. (kng)
March 12, 2024 Filing 9 Second Verified MOTION for Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Donna Marie Smith, Ernest Welch Smith. (kng)
March 7, 2024 Filing 8 Verified MOTION for Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Donna Marie Smith, Ernest Welch Smith. (kng)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING #4 MOTION to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 3/5/2024. (kng)
March 5, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Donna Marie Smith, Ernest Welch Smith re #7 Order. (kng)
March 1, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE to Pro Se Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 3/1/2024. (kng)
March 1, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Donna Marie Smith, Ernest Welch Smith re #6 Notice to Pro Se Plaintiffs. (kng)
February 29, 2024 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ernest Welch Smith, Donna Marie Smith, State of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kng) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 29, 2024 Filing Fee Paid: $ 405.00, receipt number 100009884. (kng)
February 29, 2024 Submission of #3 Complaint, #4 MOTION to Seal #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (kng)
February 28, 2024 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER for Temporary and Emergency Injunction. (kng)
February 28, 2024 Filing 4 (Construed by clerk as) MOTION to Seal #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Donna Marie Smith, Ernest Welch Smith. (kng)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Plaintiffs' #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED, and Plaintiffs are ORDERED to pay the full filing fee within 21 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is ADVISED that failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned after 22 days or upon payment of the filing fee, whichever is earlier. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 2/21/2024. c:Financial Office(jbu)
February 21, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Donna Marie Smith, Ernest Welch Smith re #2 Order. (jbu)
February 16, 2024 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (pdt)
February 15, 2024 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donna Marie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (pdt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Georgia et al v. Wyndham Vacation (Resorts) Ownership, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Welch Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation (Resorts) Ownership, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaritaville Vacation Club by Wyndham, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts Puerto Rico, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travel + Leisure, Clubs & Rental, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Manzella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sujaily Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?