Central Mutual Insurance Company v. Knockum et al
Plaintiff: Central Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Brandon Knockum, Knockum Realty, LLC, Rockethouse Design & Build, LLC, Rockethouse Management, LLC, Dennis Tidwell and Laurie Tidwell
Case Number: 1:2024cv00720
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2024 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockethouse Design & Build, LLC, Rockethouse Management, LLC, Dennis Tidwell, Laurie Tidwell. (Taube, Gregory)
April 15, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Rockethouse Design & Build, LLC, Rockethouse Management, LLC, Dennis Tidwell, Laurie Tidwell.(Taube, Gregory) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Rockethouse Design & Build, LLC Answer due 4/15/2024; Rockethouse Management, LLC Answer due 4/15/2024; Dennis Tidwell Answer due 4/15/2024; Laurie Tidwell Answer due 4/15/2024. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 4/11/2024. (dmb)
April 11, 2024 Filing 13 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/6-9/24, by John David Hipes. (Hipes, John) Modified docket text on 4/12/2024 (dmb).
April 8, 2024 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Rockethouse Design & Build, LLC, Rockethouse Management, LLC, Dennis Tidwell, Laurie Tidwell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taube, Gregory)
March 29, 2024 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Central Mutual Insurance Company. Laurie Tidwell served on 3/8/2024, answer due 3/29/2024. (Corbitt, Canon)
March 29, 2024 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Central Mutual Insurance Company. Dennis Tidwell served on 3/8/2024, answer due 3/29/2024. (Corbitt, Canon)
March 29, 2024 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Central Mutual Insurance Company. Rockethouse Management, LLC served on 3/8/2024, answer due 3/29/2024. (Corbitt, Canon)
March 29, 2024 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Central Mutual Insurance Company. Rockethouse Design & Build, LLC served on 3/8/2024, answer due 3/29/2024. (Corbitt, Canon)
March 26, 2024 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Central Mutual Insurance Company. Knockum Realty, LLC served on 3/18/2024, answer due 4/8/2024. (Corbitt, Canon)
March 19, 2024 Filing 6 Knockum Respondents ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Brandon Knockum. Discovery ends on 8/16/2024.(Hipes, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 4, 2024 Filing 5 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Canon T. Corbitt replacing attorney Caroline Sims. (Corbitt, Canon)
March 4, 2024 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Central Mutual Insurance Company. Brandon Knockum served on 3/1/2024, answer due 3/22/2024. (Sims, Caroline)
February 26, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Of Filing Replacement Full Exhibit I to Declaratory Judgment Complaint by Central Mutual Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,,, (Sims, Caroline)
February 20, 2024 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jkb)
February 16, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Declaratory Judgment with Jury Demand filed by Central Mutual Insurance Company. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13232963) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B- Declaration Pages, #3 Exhibit C - Construction Contract, #4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Occupancy, #5 Exhibit E - Residential Inspection Report, #6 Exhibit F - Demand Letter, #7 Exhibit G - Demand for Arbitration, #8 Exhibit H - Demand for Arbitration filing form, #9 Exhibit I - Complaint filed in Fulton Superior Court, #10 Exhibit J - Voluntary Dismissal, #11 Exhibit K - Amended Statement of Claim, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Mutual Insurance Company v. Knockum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Caroline Sims
Represented By: Melissa Lottie Bailey
Represented By: Canon T. Corbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Knockum
Represented By: John David Hipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knockum Realty, LLC
Represented By: John David Hipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockethouse Design & Build, LLC
Represented By: Gregory M. Taube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockethouse Management, LLC
Represented By: Gregory M. Taube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Tidwell
Represented By: Gregory M. Taube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Tidwell
Represented By: Gregory M. Taube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?