Archila v. Kids2, LLC
Plaintiff: Rebecca Archila
Defendant: Kids2, LLC and Kids
Case Number: 1:2024cv00721
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Property Damage/Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE Of Filing - Joint Statement Under Local Rule 23.1(C)(2) by Rebecca Archila (Tribble, James)
March 12, 2024 Filing 16 Joint Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rebecca Archila. (Tribble, James)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until June 18, 2024, to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 03/11/2024. (tht)
March 8, 2024 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kids2, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(Busch, Samantha)
March 8, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Marie Busch on behalf of Kids2, LLC (Busch, Samantha)
March 7, 2024 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Rebecca Archila. Kids2, LLC served on 2/28/2024, answer due 3/20/2024. (Wolf, Alexander)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Gary M. Klinger as counsel of record for Plaintiff as of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 03/04/2024. (tht)
March 1, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE by Rebecca Archila re #5 Letter re:83.1 - Motion to Permit the Withdrawal of Gary Klinger as Plaintiff's Attorney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Proposed Order)(Tribble, James) Modified on 3/2/2024 - add Motion to Withdrawal to reflect efile document (tht).
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission of Kevin Laukaitis Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/28/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
February 28, 2024 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin Laukaitis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13253564).. Attorney Kevin Laukaitis added appearing on behalf of Rebecca Archila. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
February 27, 2024 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin Laukaitis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13253564).by Rebecca Archila. (Tribble, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 27, 2024 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Alexander Wolf Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13250491). Attorney Alexander E. Wolf added appearing on behalf of Rebecca Archila. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission of Alexander Wolf Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/27/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
February 26, 2024 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Alexander Wolf Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13250491).by Rebecca Archila. (Tribble, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/26/2024. (bnp)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Leigh Martin May for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:24-cv-721-LMM. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 2/26/2024. (dob)
February 21, 2024 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Gary M. Klinger. Clerk to follow-up by 3/4/2024. (cpp)
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Kevin Laukaitis. Clerk to follow-up by 3/4/2024. (cpp)
February 21, 2024 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Alexander E. Wolf. Clerk to follow-up by 3/4/2024. (cpp)
February 20, 2024 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kids2, LLC. (pdt)
February 16, 2024 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Rebecca Archila. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13232985) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pdt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archila v. Kids2, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kids2, LLC
Represented By: Samantha M. Gerencir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kids
Represented By: Samantha M. Gerencir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Archila
Represented By: Alexander E. Wolf
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: James Cameron Tribble
Represented By: Kevin Laukaitis
Represented By: Roy E. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?