Newsom et al v. City of Jonesboro, Georgia et al
Plaintiff: Godreque Newsom and Daryll Triplett
Defendant: City of Jonesboro, Georgia and Donya L. Sartor
Case Number: 1:2024cv01084
Filed: March 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2024 Filing 16 Amended Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by City of Jonesboro, Georgia. (Daughdril, Kirsten)
May 2, 2024 Filing 15 Clerk's Notation re: #12 and #13 ; no conflicts identified. Approved by Judge Grimberg.(dnb)
May 2, 2024 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by City of Jonesboro, Georgia. (Daughdril, Kirsten)
May 1, 2024 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Godreque Newsom, Daryll Triplett. (Legare, Cheryl)
May 1, 2024 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by Donya L. Sartor. (Whitlock, Kathryn)
April 29, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Douglas Bennett on behalf of City of Jonesboro, Georgia (Bennett, John)
April 26, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Donya L. Sartor.(Whitlock, Kathryn) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 25, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by City of Jonesboro, Georgia. Discovery ends on 9/23/2024.(Daughdril, Kirsten) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 17, 2024 Filing 8 The Motion to extend time #7 is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended through and including April 26, 2024. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 4/17/2024. (dnb)
April 12, 2024 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint re: #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by City of Jonesboro, Georgia, Donya L. Sartor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Daughdril, Kirsten) Modified on 4/15/2024 (ajw). Modified on 4/17/2024 (dnb).
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 3/21/2024. (tas)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 3/18/2024. (tas)
March 16, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE by City of Jonesboro, Georgia, Donya L. Sartor of Acceptance of Service and Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline (Pearson, Todd)
March 12, 2024 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Donya L. Sartor. (bmr)
March 12, 2024 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to City of Jonesboro, Georgia. (bmr)
March 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Daryll Triplett, Godreque Newsom. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13285541) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newsom et al v. City of Jonesboro, Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Godreque Newsom
Represented By: Cheryl Barnes Legare
Represented By: Lisa Catherine Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryll Triplett
Represented By: Cheryl Barnes Legare
Represented By: Lisa Catherine Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Jonesboro, Georgia
Represented By: John Douglas Bennett
Represented By: Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donya L. Sartor
Represented By: Kathryn S. Whitlock
Represented By: Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?