Turner v. Wagsby et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Turner
Defendant: Samantha Wagsby, KB Synergy, Office of Inspector General, Office of the Solicitor and Federal Trade Commission
Case Number: 1:2024cv01164
Filed: March 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrance Turner re #8 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #9 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (pdt)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Service of #8 Final Report and Recommendation by Judge Michael L. Brown. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on this 6th day of May, 2024. (pdt)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Complaint RECOMMENDING that the frivolity cases be DISMISSED for any or all of these reasons: (i) Turner failed to seek leave, in violation of Judge Fish's filing injunction; (ii) the corresponding claims are frivolous, and (iii) Turner violated the undersigned's prior Order. It is FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the District Judge impose a filing restriction to prevent Turner from further harassing the Court with his filings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on this 6th day of May, 2024. (pdt) (pdt)
April 25, 2024 Submission of #6 Order to Show Cause to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (jpk)
April 19, 2024 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Terrance Turner. (pdt)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: With respect to each of his pending cases listed above, the undersigned ORDERS Turner by 4/19/2024 to either: (1) PAY the requisite filing fee; or (2) SHOW GOOD CAUSE in writing why he should be granted leave to proceed with the case. More specifically, unless he pays the corresponding filing fee, for each individual case that Turner wishes to pursue in forma pauperis in this Court he is ORDERED to file the following: An affidavit or unsworn declaration under 28 U.S.C. 1746, in which he must: (a) clearly designate the individual case by case number; (b) attest that the complaint has been filed on his own behalf (not as a legal representative) and in good faith; (c) certify whether he has previously raised claims based on the same set of facts in any other case, and if so, identify such case as well as the presiding court and case status or outcome; and (d) describe any facts or circumstances that might justify the Court's granting leave to continue for example, the case involves novel constitutional claims or imminent danger of physical injury. To be clear, no later than the deadline, Turner MUST either pay the filing fee or file a separate affidavit or declaration for each pending case that he wishes to pursue. Turner is forewarned. For each IFP Case, if Turner does not pay the corresponding filing fee or file a satisfactory affidavit or declaration within the time allowed, the undersigned will deny his pending in forma pauperis application for violating both Judge Fish's filing injunction and this Order. And for each Frivolity Case, if Turner does not take the requisite steps within the time allowed, the undersigned will recommend that such case be dismissed. Finally, Turner is advised that the same rules will be applied to any new cases that he files in this Court in the future- that is, he must either pay the filing fee or submit a satisfactory affidavit or declaration to obtain leave to proceed. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket a copy of this Order in each of Turner's cases included in the caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 4/11/2024. c:Financial Office(kng)
April 11, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrance Turner re #6 Order. (kng)
March 20, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrance Turner re #5 Order. (kng)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (kng)
March 19, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Form Leave by Terrance Turner. (kng)
March 19, 2024 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Terrance Turner. (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #3 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #4 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kng) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this action to the presiding District Judge for a frivolity determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and terminate the referral to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 3/19/2024. (kng)
March 19, 2024 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (pdt)
March 19, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrance Turner re #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (kng)
March 19, 2024 Submission of #3 Complaint, #4 MOTION to Form Leave to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (kng)
March 18, 2024 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terrance Turner. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Motion to Form Leave, #3 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #4 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #5 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #6 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (pdt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Wagsby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Wagsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KB Synergy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Inspector General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Solicitor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Trade Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?