Al Johnson's Swedish Restaurant & Butik, Inc. v. Goats on the Roof at Tiger Mtn Market, LLC Featured Case

Plaintiff Al Johnson's Swedish Restaurant & Butik, Inc. sued Defendant Goats on the Roof at Tiger Mtn Market, LLC for trademark infringement. Plaintiff alleged that Defendant infringed on Plaintiff's Goats on the Roof Trade Dress for restaurant services by opening a grocery store and gift shop in buildings with grass on the roofs and allowing goats to climb on the roofs of its buildings.

Plaintiff: Al Johnson's Swedish Restaurant & Butik, Inc.
Defendant: Goats on the Roof at Tiger Mtn Market, LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv00192
Filed: November 3, 2009
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Rabun
Presiding Judge: OKelley
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2010 Civil Case Terminated. (sk)
March 3, 2010 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING 11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i). (sk)
March 3, 2010 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Al Johnson's Swedish Restaurant & Butik, Inc. (Vanderhoff, Sara)
February 24, 2010 10 Summons Issued as to Goats on the Roof at Tiger Mtn Market, LLC. (vld)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER granting 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, adding Lori S. Meddings. Signed by Judge William C. O'Kelley on 1/4/2010. (dcs)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER granting 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, adding Katrina G. Hull. Signed by Judge William C. O'Kelley on 1/4/2010. (dcs)
December 31, 2009 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Lori S. Meddings Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000002496804), 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Katrina G. Hull Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000002496797). Attorney Katrina G. Hull, Lori S. Meddings added appearing on behalf of Al Johnson's Swedish Restaurant & Butik, Inc. (pb)
December 29, 2009 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Lori S. Meddings Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000002496804)by Al Johnson's Swedish Restaurant & Butik, Inc.. (Vanderhoff, Sara)
December 29, 2009 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Katrina G. Hull Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000002496797)by Al Johnson's Swedish Restaurant & Butik, Inc.. (Vanderhoff, Sara)
December 22, 2009 Submission of 4 Letter re:83.1, 5 Letter re:83.1 for attorney failure to respond to request re PHV application, submitted to District Judge William C. O'Kelley. (sk)
November 3, 2009 5 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements for Katrina G. Hull. Clerk to follow-up by 12/3/2009. (vld)
November 3, 2009 4 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements for Lori S. Meddings. Clerk to follow-up by 12/3/2009. (vld)
November 3, 2009 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Al Johnson's Swedish Restaurant & Butik, Inc. (vld)
November 3, 2009 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Al Johnson's Swedish Restaurant & Butik, Inc. (vld)
November 3, 2009 1 COMPLAINT filed (Filing fee $350, receipt number GAN200000827), filed by Al Johnson's Swedish Restaurant & Butik, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(vld) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al Johnson's Swedish Restaurant & Butik, Inc. v. Goats on the Roof at Tiger Mtn Market, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Johnson's Swedish Restaurant & Butik, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Vanderhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goats on the Roof at Tiger Mtn Market, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?