The United States of America v. Brown
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Defendant: Jeffrey T. Brown
Case Number: 2:2018cv00148
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Contract: Defaulted Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The United States of America. Jeffrey T. Brown waiver mailed on 9/5/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Williams, Melaine)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Court Notice of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jeffrey T. Brown. (dgr)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Attachment A to Exhibit 1, #3 Attachment B to Exhibit 1, #4 Attachment C to Exhibit 1, #5 Attachment D to Exhibit 1, #6 Attachment E to Exhibit 1, #7 Attachment F to Exhibit 1, #8 Attachment G to Exhibit 1, #9 Attachment H to Exhibit 1, #10 Attachment I to Exhibit 1, #11 Attachment J to Exhibit 1, #12 Attachment K to Exhibit 1, #13 Attachment L to Exhibit 1, #14 Attachment M to Exhibit 1, #15 Attachment N to Exhibit 1, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Represented By: Melaine A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey T. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?