Project South: The Institute for the Elimination of Poverty adn Genocide, Inc. v. Couch et al

Plaintiff: Project South: The Institute for the Elimination of Poverty and Genocide, Inc.
Defendant: Gerald Couch and Hall County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 2:2018cv00160
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (dgr)
October 5, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #9 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) (dgr)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal - Joint by Project South: The Institute for the Elimination of Poverty and Genocide, Inc.. (Graubart, Noah)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Upon consideration of #7 Plaintiffs Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that said Motion is GRANTED and that the time for Plaintiff to file its memorandum in support of its previously-pending Motion for Interlocutory Injunction shall be extended by one week through and including October 5, 2018, and that the time for Plaintiff to file its opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #4 shall be extended by one week through and including October 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/02/2018. (dgr)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 Second MOTION for Extension of Time by Project South: The Institute for the Elimination of Poverty and Genocide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Graubart, Noah)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time for plaintiff to file its memorandum re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Time shall be extended by one week through and including September 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/24/2018. (rsg)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Memorandum In Support of Its Motion Pending in State Court by Project South: The Institute for the Elimination of Poverty and Genocide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Graubart, Noah)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Gerald Couch, Hall County Sheriff's Office. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Maine, Dana)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COURT NOTICE Of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
September 7, 2018 Submission of #2 MOTION for Interlocutory Injunction to District Judge Richard W. Story. (dgr)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Interlocutory Injunction by Project South: The Institute for the Elimination of Poverty and Genocide, Inc. (dgr) Modified on 9/7/2018 (dgr).
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Gerald Couch and Hall County Sheriff's Office. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-8131823) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A with Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Project South: The Institute for the Elimination of Poverty adn Genocide, Inc. v. Couch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Project South: The Institute for the Elimination of Poverty and Genocide, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Christina Fish
Represented By: Erin Patrick Alper
Represented By: Noah C. Graubart
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: Priyanka Bhatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Couch
Represented By: William H. Blalock
Represented By: Dana Kristin Maine
Represented By: Wesley Calvin Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: William H. Blalock
Represented By: Dana Kristin Maine
Represented By: Wesley Calvin Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?