Millwood v. Unknown Defendant
Plaintiff: Jason Clayton Millwood
Defendant: Unknown Defendant
Case Number: 2:2018cv00183
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jason Clayton Millwood re #5 Order, 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form, and a financial affidavit. (dgr)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED to either comply with the Courts previous order within 21 days by completing, signing and returning the forms accompanying this order or show cause why this action should not be dismissed. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send to Plaintiff a 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form and a financial affidavit, along with a copy of this order, and to resubmit this matter to the undersigned upon receipt of Plaintiffs response or when the 21-day period for the response expires. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/14/2018. (dgr)
November 9, 2018 Submission of #3 Order for IFP or Fees, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (rsg)
October 25, 2018 Submission of #4 Amended Complaint,, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (clk)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Unknown Defendant filed by Jason Clayton Millwood.(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 10, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jason Clayton Millwood re #3 Order, 42 U.S.C. 1983 Form, and Affidavit and Authorization Form. (dgr)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that within 28 days Plaintiff must either submit the full filing and administrative fees of $400.00 or sign and return a financial affidavit seeking leave to proceed IFP. Because Plaintiff has not completed the standard civil rights complaint form, he is ORDERED to submit an amended complaint, also within 28 days. The Clerk is DIRECTED to forward to Plaintiff a prisoner financial affidavit and a 42 U.S.C. 1983 civil complaint form, together with a copy of this order, and to resubmit this matter to the Magistrate Judge upon receipt of the fees or affidavit, or when the 28-day period noted above expires. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 10/10/2018. (dgr)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE Of Filing Letter by Jason Clayton Millwood (dgr)
October 5, 2018 Submission of #1 Complaint to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller for IFP and Frivolity Review. (dgr)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jason Clayton Millwood.(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millwood v. Unknown Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Clayton Millwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?