County of Fannin v. Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: County of Fannin
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Rodney Davis, Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Just In Time Meds, LLC, Lori Fuller, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Attainmed, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Shelli Liston, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Medicine Center Pharmacy, Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc., Heather Weaver, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Amarc Medical Clinic, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Actavis PLC, Watson Pharma, Inc. and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00220
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 New Civil Action Number in USDC NDOH 1:19-op-45269 (aar)
April 5, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (rsg)
April 5, 2019 Case electronically transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL No. 2804. (rsg)
April 5, 2019 Filing 22 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Case to be transferred to Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL No. 2804. (rsg)
March 6, 2019 Filing 21 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): Tuesday, April 30, 2019, through and including Wednesday, May 8, 2019, and Tuesday, May 28, 2019, through and including Friday, May 31, 2019, and Wednesday, June 12, 2019, through and including Friday, June 14, 2019, and Wednesday, July 3, 2019, through and including Wednesday, July 10, 2019., by Larry David Wolfe. (Wolfe, Larry)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time for McKesson Corporation to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the period in which the McKesson Corporation must answer, object, plead, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and raise Fed. R. Civ. Pro. Rule 12 defenses is extended to 45 days after any ruling by the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/6/2019. (dgr)
February 5, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time For Defendant McKesson Corporation to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order)(Knapp, Halsey)
January 10, 2019 Submission of #14 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
January 10, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Support re #14 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Menk, Jacqueline) Modified on 1/10/2019 to correct text (sk).
January 7, 2019 Submission of #16 MOTION for Oral Argument re #7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Expedite the Ruling , to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 Proposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by County of Fannin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Wolfe, Larry)
December 19, 2018 Submission of #7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Expedite the Ruling, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Oral Argument re #7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Expedite the Ruling by County of Fannin. (Wolfe, Larry)
December 18, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY in Support re #7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Expedite the Ruling filed by County of Fannin. (Wolfe, Larry) Modified on 12/19/2018 (sk).
December 13, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation with Brief In Support by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law ISO, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Menk, Jacqueline) Modified on 12/14/2018 to remove duplicative wording (sk).
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Expedite the Ruling Cardinal Health's Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand and Motion for an Expedited Ruling filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Motion)(Menk, Jacqueline)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants Shelli Liston, Heather Weaver, Lori Fuller, and Rodney Davis's Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Fannin County, Georgia shall have until thirty (30) days after the earlier of either any ruling by this Court on Plaintiff's motion to remand or a decision by the JPML on whether to transfer this case to the MDL to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/07/2018. (rsg)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Fannin County, Georgia shall have until thirty (30) days after the earlier of either any ruling by this Court on Plaintiff's motion to remand or a decision by the JPML on whether to transfer this case to the MDL to file its response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Additionally, the Court will stay the preliminary initial filings under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules for the Northern District of Georgia, including the Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement, the Initial Disclosures, and the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The stay of Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and the stay of the beginning of the discovery period are hereby continued. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/4/2018. (dgr)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc. Motion to Dismiss and to Stay Initial Filings by County of Fannin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Larry)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by County of Fannin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Larry)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the period in which the Moving Defendants must answer, object, plead, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 45 days following the earlier of either any decision on a motion for remand that Plaintiff may file or a final decision by the JPML on whether to transfer the case to In re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL No. 2804 (N.D. Ohio). Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/29/2018. (dgr)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION to Expedite the Ruling with Brief In Support by County of Fannin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anderson County Remand Order, #2 Exhibit B - West Virginia Remand Order, #3 Exhibit C - Greenville County Remand Order, #4 Memorandum In Support of Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand and Motion for an Expedited Ruling)(Wolfe, Larry)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint with Brief In Support by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Helm, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the period in which the AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation and Cardinal Health, Inc. must answer, object, plead, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 45 days after any ruling by the Court on Plaintiff's motion to remand. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/26/2018. (dgr)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER re #3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to Cardinal Health, Inc. and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation . (Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth) Modified on 11/21/2018 to correct docket text (sk).
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cardinal Health, Inc. & AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth) Modified on 11/21/2018 to correct docket text and identify party filers (sk).
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-8284184) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A with Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B part 2, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Fannin v. Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Davis
Represented By: Jennifer A. Mills
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just In Time Meds, LLC
Represented By: Douglas W. Smith
Represented By: Claire Arnett Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Fuller
Represented By: Jennifer A. Mills
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Jennifer Grandoff Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Jacqueline Tandy Menk
Represented By: Cody Sams Wigington
Represented By: Christopher A. Wiech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attainmed, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelli Liston
Represented By: Jennifer A. Mills
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Jennifer Grandoff Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicine Center Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Mazziotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Weaver
Represented By: Jennifer A. Mills
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amarc Medical Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Eileen Elizabeth Hintz Rumfelt
Represented By: Edward McDowell Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Represented By: Cari K. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Fannin
Represented By: Larry David Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?