M3 Accounting Services, Inc. v. Dean et al

Plaintiff: M3 Accounting Services, Inc.
Defendant: Darryl J. Landreneau, Wesley Dean, Kaleo Technology, LLC and Black Ops Solutions & Systems, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00246
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Clerks Entry of Default as to Black Ops Solutions & Systems, LLC (dgr)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Defendant Black Ops Solutions & Systems, LLC by M3 Accounting Services, Inc.. (Proctor, Amanda)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Kaleo Technology, LLC and Darryl J. Landreneau Answer due 4/5/2019. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/17/2019. (dgr)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Kaleo Technology, LLC, Darryl J. Landreneau. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparks, John)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by M3 Accounting Services, Inc.. Kaleo Technology, LLC served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Proctor, Amanda)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by M3 Accounting Services, Inc.. Black Ops Solutions & Systems, LLC served on 12/31/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Proctor, Amanda)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by M3 Accounting Services, Inc.. Wesley Dean waiver mailed on 1/4/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Proctor, Amanda)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by M3 Accounting Services, Inc.. Darryl J. Landreneau served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Proctor, Amanda)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Black Ops Solutions & Systems, LLC, Wesley Dean, Kaleo Technology, LLC, Darryl J. Landreneau. (Attachments: #1 Summons Darryl Landreneau, #2 Summons Kaleo Technology, #3 Summons Wesley Dean)(dgr)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by M3 Accounting Services, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8350674) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M3 Accounting Services, Inc. v. Dean et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl J. Landreneau
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaleo Technology, LLC
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Ops Solutions & Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M3 Accounting Services, Inc.
Represented By: Walter Holloway Bush, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda Dawn Proctor
Represented By: Jason Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?