Continental Casualty Company et al v. Winder Laboratories, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Continental Casualty Company and Valley Forge Insurance Company
Defendant: Winder Laboratories, LLC, Concordia Pharmaceuticals, S.A.R.L. and Steven Pressman
Case Number: 2:2019cv00016
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadlines in the current Scheduling Order will be extended for sixty (60) days. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/4/2020. (dgr)
September 3, 2020 Filing 67 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Maxwell)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: Defendants Motion for Reconsideration #57 is DENIED. The parties are still encouraged to confer in an effort to resolve any remaining dispute regarding the reimbursement issue. Per the Courts October Order #44 , discovery closed August 16, 2020. The parties should consult the Scheduling Order [26, 25] for upcoming deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/1/2020. (dgr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Brewerton-Palmer on behalf of Steven Pressman, Winder Laboratories, LLC (Brewerton-Palmer, Sarah)
August 19, 2020 Submission of #57 MOTION for Reconsideration re #54 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, MOTION for Oral Argument , to District Judge Richard W. Story. (rsg) Modified on 8/19/2020 to identify both events (sk).
August 17, 2020 Filing 63 REPLY BRIEF re #57 MOTION for Reconsideration re #54 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, filed by Steven Pressman, Winder Laboratories, LLC. (Cobb, James)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
August 3, 2020 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION for Reconsideration re #54 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, (Continental Casualty Company's and Valley Forge Insurance Company's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration) filed by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Jones, Maxwell)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration #58 . Plaintiff's shall have through and including August 12, 2020 to respond to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/16/2020. (dgr)
July 16, 2020 Filing 59 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re: #57 MOTION for Reconsideration re #54 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jones, Maxwell)
July 16, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Maxwell R. Jones on behalf of Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company (Jones, Maxwell)
July 15, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Reconsideration re #54 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, with Brief In Support by Steven Pressman, Winder Laboratories, LLC. (Cobb, James)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (dgs) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (adg) (ADI)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: Plaintiffs Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #34 is GRANTED in so much as it seeks the above-described relief. The parties are encouraged to confer in an effort to resolve any remaining dispute regarding the reimbursement issue. If they are unable to resolve the issue, discovery shall proceed according to the Courts October Order #44 . Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/17/2020. (dgr)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (mmc) (ADI)
April 29, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company of Filing in Underlying Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fourth Amended Complaint)(Xiao, Roy)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/16/2020. (rsg)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/13/2019. (dgr)
November 13, 2019 Filing 47 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): February 17, 2020-February 21,2020, April 6, 2020-April 10,2020, June 8, 2020-June 12, 2020, September 21, 2020-September 25,2020, November 23,2020-November 27,2020, December 21,2020-January 8,2021, by James William Cobb. (Cobb, James)
November 4, 2019 Submission of #34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Xiao, Roy) Modified on 11/4/2019 (sk).
October 31, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Consent for Withdrawal of Counsel for Defendants Winder Laboratories, LLC and Steven Pressman by Steven Pressman, Winder Laboratories, LLC (Giller, Richard)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time. The discovery period in this case is extended to sixty days after the Court rules on Plaintiffs Continental Casualty Company and Valley Forge Insurance Company's #34 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. All other deadlines affected by this extension of the discovery period are also extended proportionally. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/21/2019. (rsg)
October 18, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE re #36 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #35 Notice of Filing, filed by Steven Pressman, Winder Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Redactions to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Steven Pressman)(Cobb, James)
October 18, 2019 Filing 42 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery Deadlines with Brief In Support by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion to Extend Discovery by Sixty Days after the Court Rules on Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Consent Motion to Extend Deadlines)(Xiao, Roy) Modified on 10/22/2019 (rsg).
October 18, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Steven Pressman, Winder Laboratories, LLC. (Cobb, James)
October 15, 2019 Filing 40 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): November 11, 2019-November 13,2019, December 4, 2019-December 6, 2019, by James William Cobb. (Cobb, James)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Plaintiffs filed a Motion for Leave to File Under Seal #35 their Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #34 . The Standing Order requires parties to comply with Appendix H to the Local Rules when seeking to file documents under seal. The party seeking to file a document containing material that has been designated for protection is required to file a motion for leave to file under seal. When the documents at issue are ones for which non-movants, such as Winder and Pressman, requested protection, the non movants are required to file a response to the motion establishing good cause for sealing. Winder and Pressman failed to file a response to Plaintiffs' motion. Unless Winder and Pressman show cause, within 14 days of the entry of this order, why the subject documents should be filed under seal, the Clerk shall make the documents available to the public. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/8/2019. (dgr)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The Court hereby ORDERS that the deadline for Defendants Winder Laboratories, LLC and Steven Pressman to respond to Continental Casualty Company and Valley Forge Insurance Company's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is hereby extended up to and including October 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/30/2019. (dgr)
September 27, 2019 Filing 37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings re: #34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Steven Pressman, Winder Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cobb, James)
September 20, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #35 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Xiao, Roy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2019: #2 Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal) (rsg). Modified on 9/20/2019 add document that was originally filed with DE#35 (rsg).
September 20, 2019 Filing 35 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Brief and Exhibits by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company re #34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit J)(Xiao, Roy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2019: #3 Brief in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) (rsg). Modified on 9/20/2019 added document original filed with DE#34(rsg). Modified on 11/13/2019 to remove word provisionally per #48 order (dgr).
September 20, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Xiao, Roy) Modified on 9/20/2019 Brief is in support of DE#35 per attorney (rsg).
September 19, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Maynard Guinn on behalf of Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company (Guinn, Kathryn)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as counsel in this action for Continental Casualty Company and Valley Forge Insurance Company. Attorney Anthony Wyatt Morris terminated. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/18/2019. (dgr)
July 18, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Withdraw Anthony Wyatt Morris as Attorneyby Continental Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL)(Morris, Anthony)
July 18, 2019 Discovery ends on 11/26/2019. (pursuant to #26 Scheduling Order). (sk)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Protective Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/3/2019. (dgr)
May 30, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company.(Morris, Anthony)
May 29, 2019 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Agreement to be Bound by Protective Order)(Morris, Anthony)
May 16, 2019 Filing 27 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 17, 2019, June 10, 2019 - June 14, 2019, July 5, 2019 - July 8, 2019, July 25, 2019 - July 29, 2019, September 23, 2019 - September 27, 2019, November 25, 2019 - November 29, 2019, December 23, 2019 - January 3, 2020, by James William Cobb. (Cobb, James)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: #25 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The case is assigned to an 8-month discovery track. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/7/2019. (dgr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 25 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Morris, Anthony)
April 26, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Concordia Pharmaceuticals, S.A.R.L.'s Initial Disclosures by Concordia Pharmaceuticals, S.A.R.L..(Holladay, William)
March 28, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants Winder Laboratories, LLC and Steven Pressman's Initial Disclosures by Steven Pressman, Winder Laboratories, LLC.(Cobb, James)
March 28, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company.(Morris, Anthony)
March 13, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Concordia Pharmaceuticals, S.A.R.L..(Holladay, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Steven Pressman and Winder Laboratories, LLC Answers due 3/14/2019. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 02/25/2019. (rsg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Steven Pressman, Winder Laboratories, LLC. Discovery ends on 7/26/2019.(Cobb, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 25, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Steven Pressman, Winder Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cobb, James)
February 25, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard C. Giller and Katherine J. Ellena re #17 Order on Application for Admission PHV and #16 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (dgr)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Application for Admission Katherine J. Ellena Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/25/2019. (dgr)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Richard C. Giller Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/25/2019. (dgr)
February 25, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Katherine J. Ellena Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8460681). Attorney James William Cobb added appearing on behalf of Steven Pressman (jkm)
February 25, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Richard C. Giller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8460638). Attorney James William Cobb added appearing on behalf of Steven Pressman (jkm)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that this Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant Concordia's deadline to file a responsive pleading in this case be extended through March 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/20/2019. (dgr)
February 20, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Katherine J. Ellena Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8460681)by Steven Pressman, Winder Laboratories, LLC. (Cobb, James)
February 20, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Richard C. Giller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8460638)by Steven Pressman, Winder Laboratories, LLC. (Cobb, James)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Concordia Pharmaceuticals, S.A.R.L.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holladay, William)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Steven Pressman and Winder Laboratories, LLC Answers due 2/26/2019. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/12/19. (rsg)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Steven Pressman, Winder Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cobb, James)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James William Cobb on behalf of Steven Pressman, Winder Laboratories, LLC (Cobb, James)
February 7, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #7 Return of Service Executed: Service and Answer Due Date Corrected. (sap)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company. Winder Laboratories, LLC served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Morris, Anthony)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company. Concordia Pharmaceuticals, S.A.R.L. served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Morris, Anthony) Service and Answer Due Date Corrected on 2/7/2019 (sap).
January 25, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Julie Linhart re #6 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (dgr)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Julie Linhart Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/25/2019. (dgr)
January 24, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of JULIE LINHART Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8395936). Attorney Julie Linhart added appearing on behalf of Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company (pmb)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of JULIE LINHART Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8395936)by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Morris, Anthony)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Other Affiliate Continental Casualty Company, Other Affiliate The Continental Corporation for Continental Casualty Company; Corporate Parent American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Other Affiliate Continental Casualty Company, Other Affiliate CNA Financial Corporation (CNA) for Valley Forge Insurance Company by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company.(Morris, Anthony)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Concordia Pharmaceuticals, S.A.R.L., Steven Pressman, and Winder Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Steven Pressman, #2 Summons Winder Lab)(dgr)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Continental Casualty Company and Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8393624) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Casualty Company et al v. Winder Laboratories, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winder Laboratories, LLC
Represented By: Richard C. Giller
Represented By: James William Cobb
Represented By: Katherine J. Ellena
Represented By: Sarah Brewerton-Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concordia Pharmaceuticals, S.A.R.L.
Represented By: William Brian Holladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Pressman
Represented By: Richard C. Giller
Represented By: James William Cobb
Represented By: Katherine J. Ellena
Represented By: Sarah Brewerton-Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Anthony Wyatt Morris
Represented By: Roy Xiao
Represented By: Julie Linhart
Represented By: Kathryn Maynard Guinn
Represented By: Maxwell R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Forge Insurance Company
Represented By: Anthony Wyatt Morris
Represented By: Roy Xiao
Represented By: Julie Linhart
Represented By: Kathryn Maynard Guinn
Represented By: Maxwell R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?