Boring et al v. Pattillo Industrial Real Estate et al
Plaintiff: Tod Fox, Cheryl Boring, Brent Greenwood, Ginger Jakins, Philip Brust, Roger Sims, Anthony Renteria, Ernest Jakins, Sarah Sims, Steven Nilsen, David Boring, Emily Mahannah, Jann Clark, Lisa Nilsen, Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc., Gary Mahannah, Thomas Clark and Mary Greenwood
Defendant: MC200, LLC, Gwinnett Industries, Inc., Pattillo Industrial Real Estate, Pattillo Construction Corporation, Stone Mountain Industrial Park, Inc. and Simpson Trucking & Grading, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00076
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Stay Scheduling and Discovery Deadlines. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that Defendants' Motion To Stay Scheduling and Discovery Deadlines is GRANTED and the deadlines set by Rules 16 and 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules 16.1, 16.2 and 26 are STAYED until 30 days after the Court rules on the pending Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction #34 . Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/3/2019. (dgr)
July 2, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Strike #37 Reply to Response to Motion, with Brief In Support by Cheryl Boring, David Boring, Philip Brust, Jann Clark, Thomas Clark, Tod Fox, Brent Greenwood, Mary Greenwood, Ernest Jakins, Ginger Jakins, Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc., Emily Mahannah, Gary Mahannah, Lisa Nilsen, Steven Nilsen, Anthony Renteria, Roger Sims, Sarah Sims. (Sniff, Tyler)
July 2, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Stay Scheduling and Discovery Deadlines by MC200, LLC, Pattillo Industrial Real Estate, Stone Mountain Industrial Park, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parkman, William)
July 1, 2019 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #34 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by MC200, LLC, Pattillo Industrial Real Estate, Stone Mountain Industrial Park, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Parkman, William)
July 1, 2019 Submission of #34 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (rsg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 36 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 07/29/19 through 08/05/19, 12/26/19 through 01/06/20, by Kevin Harrison Hudson. (Hudson, Kevin)
June 17, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Cheryl Boring, David Boring, Philip Brust, Jann Clark, Thomas Clark, Tod Fox, Brent Greenwood, Mary Greenwood, Ernest Jakins, Ginger Jakins, Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc., Emily Mahannah, Gary Mahannah, Lisa Nilsen, Steven Nilsen, Anthony Renteria, Roger Sims, Sarah Sims. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' CWA Notice Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Notice Letter in Purvis Case, #3 Exhibit C - Notice Letter in Carney Case)(Sniff, Tyler)
June 12, 2019 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by MC200, LLC, Pattillo Industrial Real Estate, Stone Mountain Industrial Park, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Parkman, William)
June 10, 2019 Submission of #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (rsg)
June 7, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE Of Filing Document Adopted by Reference in Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Cheryl Boring, David Boring, Philip Brust, Jann Clark, Thomas Clark, Tod Fox, Brent Greenwood, Mary Greenwood, Ernest Jakins, Ginger Jakins, Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc., Emily Mahannah, Gary Mahannah, Lisa Nilsen, Steven Nilsen, Anthony Renteria, Roger Sims, Sarah Sims re #21 Amended Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Clean Water Act Notice Letter)(Sniff, Tyler)
June 6, 2019 Filing 32 Withdrawal of Motion #14 Joint MOTION for More Definite Statement (by Pattillo Industrial Real Estate, Stone Mountain Industrial Park, Inc., MC200, LLC, Gwinnett Industries, Inc., Pattillo Construction Corporation) filed by MC200, LLC, Stone Mountain Industrial Park, Inc., Pattillo Industrial Real Estate filed by MC200, LLC, Pattillo Industrial Real Estate, Stone Mountain Industrial Park, Inc.. (Parkman, William)
June 6, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #30 Notice (Other) filed by Pattillo Construction Corporation REVISED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Salley, Amy)
June 5, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by Pattillo Construction Corporation OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT (Salley, Amy)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court ORDERS that the Motion is GRANTED and the Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint is extended until June 12,2019. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/5/2019. (dgr)
June 4, 2019 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the First Amended Complaint re: #21 Amended Complaint,, by MC200, LLC, Pattillo Industrial Real Estate, Stone Mountain Industrial Park, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parkman, William) Modified on 6/5/2019 to correct motion (dgr).
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Defendant Gwinnett Industries, Inc.'s Unopposed #26 Motion to Withdraw Answer. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 06/03/2019. (dgr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Answer #25 Answer to Complaint by Gwinnett Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaba, Jeffrey)
May 24, 2019 Filing 25 ---WITHDRAWN PER #27 ORDER--- ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Gwinnett Industries, Inc.. Discovery ends on 10/21/2019.(Gaba, Jeffrey) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/3/2019 (dgr).
May 23, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 Joint MOTION for More Definite Statement (by Pattillo Industrial Real Estate, Stone Mountain Industrial Park, Inc., MC200, LLC, Gwinnett Industries, Inc., Pattillo Construction Corporation) AND PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO DENY MOTION AS MOOT filed by Cheryl Boring, David Boring, Philip Brust, Jann Clark, Thomas Clark, Tod Fox, Brent Greenwood, Mary Greenwood, Ernest Jakins, Ginger Jakins, Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc., Emily Mahannah, Gary Mahannah, Lisa Nilsen, Steven Nilsen, Anthony Renteria, Roger Sims, Sarah Sims. (Sniff, Tyler)
May 23, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cheryl Boring, David Boring, Philip Brust, Jann Clark, Thomas Clark, Tod Fox, Brent Greenwood, Mary Greenwood, Ernest Jakins, Ginger Jakins, Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc., Emily Mahannah, Gary Mahannah, Lisa Nilsen, Steven Nilsen, Anthony Renteria, Roger Sims, Sarah Sims. (Sniff, Tyler)
May 23, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by Cheryl Boring, David Boring, Philip Brust, Jann Clark, Thomas Clark, Tod Fox, Brent Greenwood, Mary Greenwood, Ernest Jakins, Ginger Jakins, Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc., Emily Mahannah, Gary Mahannah, Lisa Nilsen, Steven Nilsen, Anthony Renteria, Roger Sims, Sarah Sims. (Sniff, Tyler)
May 22, 2019 Filing 21 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Steven Nilsen, Gary Mahannah, David Boring, Tod Fox, Sarah Sims, Roger Sims, Emily Mahannah, Brent Greenwood, Ernest Jakins, Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc., Cheryl Boring, Thomas Clark, Anthony Renteria, Jann Clark, Philip Brust, Ginger Jakins, Lisa Nilsen, Mary Greenwood.(Sniff, Tyler) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Stay. The Court ORDERS that the Joint Motion To Stay Scheduling and Discovery Deadlines is GRANTED and the deadlines set by Rules 16 and 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules 16.1, 16.2 and 26 are STAYED until July 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/17/2019. (dgr)
May 16, 2019 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed by Steven Nilsen, Gary Mahannah, David Boring, Tod Fox, Sarah Sims, Roger Sims, Emily Mahannah, Brent Greenwood, Ernest Jakins, Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc., Cheryl Boring, Thomas Clark, Anthony Renteria, Jann Clark, Philip Brust, Ginger Jakins, Lisa Nilsen, Mary Greenwood. Simpson Trucking & Grading, Inc. served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Sniff, Tyler)
May 15, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Stay Scheduling and Discovery Deadlines by MC200, LLC, Pattillo Industrial Real Estate, Stone Mountain Industrial Park, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parkman, William)
May 10, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Persons by Gwinnett Industries, Inc.. (Hatcher, Todd)
May 10, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Persons by MC200, LLC, Pattillo Industrial Real Estate, Stone Mountain Industrial Park, Inc.. (Parkman, William)
May 10, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Simpson Trucking & Grading, Inc. by Simpson Trucking & Grading, Inc..(Marsh, C.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for More Definite Statement (by Pattillo Industrial Real Estate, Stone Mountain Industrial Park, Inc., MC200, LLC, Gwinnett Industries, Inc., Pattillo Construction Corporation) with Brief In Support by MC200, LLC, Pattillo Industrial Real Estate, Stone Mountain Industrial Park, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Parkman, William)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for Insufficient Service of Process, Or, In the Alternative, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT with Brief In Support by Simpson Trucking & Grading, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Marsh, C.) Modified on 5/10/2019 to correct docket text (sk).
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by Pattillo Construction Corporation. (Hudson, Kevin)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Pattillo Construction Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hudson, Kevin) Modified on 5/10/2019 to remove duplicative wording (sk).
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Steven Nilsen, Gary Mahannah, David Boring, Tod Fox, Sarah Sims, Roger Sims, Emily Mahannah, Brent Greenwood, Ernest Jakins, Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc., Cheryl Boring, Thomas Clark, Anthony Renteria, Jann Clark, Philip Brust, Ginger Jakins, Lisa Nilsen, Mary Greenwood. Gwinnett Industries, Inc. served on 4/19/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. (Sniff, Tyler)
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Steven Nilsen, Gary Mahannah, David Boring, Tod Fox, Sarah Sims, Roger Sims, Emily Mahannah, Brent Greenwood, Ernest Jakins, Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc., Cheryl Boring, Thomas Clark, Anthony Renteria, Jann Clark, Philip Brust, Ginger Jakins, Lisa Nilsen, Mary Greenwood. MC200, LLC served on 4/19/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. (Sniff, Tyler)
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Steven Nilsen, Gary Mahannah, David Boring, Tod Fox, Sarah Sims, Roger Sims, Emily Mahannah, Brent Greenwood, Ernest Jakins, Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc., Cheryl Boring, Thomas Clark, Anthony Renteria, Jann Clark, Philip Brust, Ginger Jakins, Lisa Nilsen, Mary Greenwood. Stone Mountain Industrial Park, Inc. served on 4/19/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. (Sniff, Tyler)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Steven Nilsen, Gary Mahannah, David Boring, Tod Fox, Sarah Sims, Roger Sims, Emily Mahannah, Brent Greenwood, Ernest Jakins, Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc., Cheryl Boring, Thomas Clark, Anthony Renteria, Jann Clark, Philip Brust, Ginger Jakins, Lisa Nilsen, Mary Greenwood. Pattillo Construction Corporation served on 4/19/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. (Sniff, Tyler)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Steven Nilsen, Gary Mahannah, David Boring, Tod Fox, Sarah Sims, Roger Sims, Emily Mahannah, Brent Greenwood, Ernest Jakins, Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc., Cheryl Boring, Thomas Clark, Anthony Renteria, Jann Clark, Philip Brust, Ginger Jakins, Lisa Nilsen, Mary Greenwood. Pattillo Industrial Real Estate served on 4/19/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. (Sniff, Tyler)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Steven Nilsen, Gary Mahannah, David Boring, Tod Fox, Sarah Sims, Roger Sims, Emily Mahannah, Brent Greenwood, Ernest Jakins, Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc., Cheryl Boring, Thomas Clark, Anthony Renteria, Jann Clark, Philip Brust, Ginger Jakins, Lisa Nilsen, Mary Greenwood. Simpson Trucking & Grading, Inc. served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Sniff, Tyler)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Cheryl Boring, David Boring, Philip Brust, Jann Clark, Thomas Clark, Tod Fox, Brent Greenwood, Mary Greenwood, Ernest Jakins, Ginger Jakins, Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc., Emily Mahannah, Gary Mahannah, Lisa Nilsen, Steven Nilsen, Anthony Renteria, Roger Sims, Sarah Sims. (Sniff, Tyler)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Gwinnett Industries, Inc., MC200, LLC, Pattillo Construction Corporation, Pattillo Industrial Real Estate, Simpson Trucking & Grading, Inc., Stone Mountain Industrial Park, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Pattillo Industrial Real Estate, #2 Summons Gwinnett Industries, Inc., #3 Summons MC200, LLC, #4 Summons Stone Mountain Industrial Park, Inc., #5 Summons Simpson Trucking & Grading, Inc.)(rsg)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by David Boring, Cheryl Boring, Steven Nilsen, Lisa Nilsen, Gary Mahannah, Emily Mahannah, Tod Fox, Roger Sims, Sarah Sims, Brent Greenwood, Mary Greenwood, Ernest Jakins, Ginger Jakins, Thomas Clark, Jann Clark, Anthony Renteria, Philip Brust, Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8596614) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Clean Water Act Notice Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boring et al v. Pattillo Industrial Real Estate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tod Fox
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Boring
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Greenwood
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger Jakins
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Brust
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Sims
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Renteria
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Jakins
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Sims
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Nilsen
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Boring
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Mahannah
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jann Clark
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Nilsen
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson Shores Property Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Mahannah
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Clark
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Greenwood
Represented By: Bricker Scott Daughtry
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Sniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MC200, LLC
Represented By: William Richard Wildman
Represented By: Amanda Irene Rose Powell
Represented By: William Henry Parkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwinnett Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Nicholas Gaba, Jr.
Represented By: Todd Emory Hatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pattillo Industrial Real Estate
Represented By: William Richard Wildman
Represented By: Amanda Irene Rose Powell
Represented By: William Henry Parkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pattillo Construction Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Harrison Hudson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Salley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone Mountain Industrial Park, Inc.
Represented By: William Richard Wildman
Represented By: Amanda Irene Rose Powell
Represented By: William Henry Parkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simpson Trucking & Grading, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Alexandre
Represented By: David Anthony Smith
Represented By: C. Bradford Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?