United of Omaha Life Insurance Company v. Young et al

Plaintiff: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Tia Young and Ivy Young Barnhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00096
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Clerks Entry of Default as to Tia Young. (dgr)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default with Brief In Support by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Pohlmann, Aaron)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Authorized deposit in the amount of $1,000,000.00 plus accrued interest, minus Plaintiffs attorney's fees and costs, payable to the Clerk of this Court as a deposit into the Court's Registry. The Court also finds that Plaintiff is entitled to deduct its attorney's fees and costs from the interpleader funds, and that Defendant Ivy Young Barnhill consents to this award of fees and costs. Therefore, Plaintiffs Motion is hereby GRANTED, and Plaintiff is authorized to deduct $6,346.00 in attorney's fees and costs from the funds to be deposited with the Court. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court accept Plaintiffs check and receive the funds into the registry of this Court. Funds received pursuant to this Order meet the Internal Revenue Service definition of a "Disputed Ownership Fund" (DOF) and must be deposited into the CRIS DOF administered by the Administrative Office of the United States Courts, which will be responsible for meeting all DOF tax requirements. The ultimate disposition of these funds will be determined by Order of this Court in the above-styled action. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 07/09/2019. (rsg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Aaron E. Pohlmann, #2 Text of Proposed Order (Order Authorizing Interpleader Deposit))(Pohlmann, Aaron)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ivy Young Barnhill. Discovery ends on 11/15/2019.(Karrh, Heather) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather K. Karrh on behalf of Ivy Young Barnhill (Karrh, Heather)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. Ivy Young Barnhill served on 5/30/2019. (Pohlmann, Aaron)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. Tia Young served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Pohlmann, Aaron)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (dgr)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ivy Young Barnhill and Tia Young. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ivy Barnhill)(dgr)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8663938) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Aaron Edward Pohlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tia Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivy Young Barnhill
Represented By: Heather K. Karrh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?