Sandoval v. S.E.L. Development, Inc.
Plaintiff: Victor Sandoval
Defendant: Southeast Landscapes, Inc. and S.E.L. Development, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00154
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 OFFER OF JUDGMENT filed by S.E.L. Development, Inc.. (Hetzel, Russell)
September 10, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Persons by S.E.L. Development, Inc.. (Hetzel, Russell)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 09/10/2019. (rsg)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER approving the #11 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 1/6/2020. Defendant shall file the Certificate of Interested Persons required by LR 3.3, NDGa. no later than seven days from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 09/10/2019. (rsg)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: In the #11 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan the parties indicate that Defendant Southeast Landscapes, Inc. is not a legal entity amendable to suit and that the correct name of the defendant is S.E.L. Development, Inc. The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to correct Defendants name in this action to reflect S.E.L. Development, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 09/10/2019. (rsg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RULE 5.4 by Southeast Landscapes, Inc..(Hetzel, Russell)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Victor Sandoval.(Kertscher, Douglas)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Victor Sandoval. (Kertscher, Douglas)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Victor Sandoval.(Kertscher, Douglas)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by Victor Sandoval. (Kertscher, Douglas)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lauren Calvert on behalf of Victor Sandoval (Calvert, Jennifer)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Victor Sandoval.(Kertscher, Douglas)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): August 29, 2019 and August 30, 2019; September 2 and September 3, 2019; November 27, 2019; November 29, 2019; December 23, 2019; December 26, 2019 and December 27, 2019; December 30 and December 31, 2019 by Russell Zane Hetzel. (Hetzel, Russell) Modified on 8/19/2019 (dgr).
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Southeast Landscapes, Inc. (Hetzel, Russell)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Southeast Landscapes, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Verification)(Hetzel, Russell) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Victor Sandoval. Southeast Landscapes, Inc. served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Kertscher, Douglas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Southeast Landscapes, Inc. (dgr)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Victor Sandoval. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8805618) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoval v. S.E.L. Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Sandoval
Represented By: Douglas R. Kertscher
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Landscapes, Inc.
Represented By: Russell Zane Hetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.E.L. Development, Inc.
Represented By: Russell Zane Hetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?