AgJunction LLC et al v. Kubota Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Novariant, Inc. and AgJunction LLC
Defendant: Kubota Tractor Corporation, Kubota Corporation, Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation, Kubota North America Corporation and Kubota Manufacturing of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00191
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the deadline by which Defendants must answer, move or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended through and including November 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/17/2019. (dgr)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by AgJunction LLC, Novariant, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herman, John)
September 30, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eric D. Hayes and Adam M. Kaufmann re #15 Order on Application for Admission PHV and #16 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (dgr)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Adam M. Kaufmann Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/30/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dgr)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Eric D. Hayes Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/30/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dgr)
September 24, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Eric D. Hayes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8945168). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Eric D. Hayes added appearing on behalf of Kubota Corporation, Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation, Kubota Manufacturing of America, Kubota North America Corporation, Kubota Tractor Corporation (pmb)
September 24, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Adam M. Kaufmann Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8945201). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Adam M. Kaufmann added appearing on behalf of Kubota Corporation, Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation, Kubota Manufacturing of America, Kubota North America Corporation, Kubota Tractor Corporation (pmb)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Defendants Answer due 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/23/2019. (rsg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kubota Corporation, Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation, Kubota Manufacturing of America, Kubota North America Corporation, Kubota Tractor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Achey, Wesley)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kubota Tractor Corporation, Kubota North America Corporation, Kubota Manufacturing of America, Kubota Corporation, Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation. (Achey, Wesley)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Adam M. Kaufmann Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8945201). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Kubota Corporation, Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation, Kubota Manufacturing of America, Kubota North America Corporation, Kubota Tractor Corporation. (Achey, Wesley)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Eric D. Hayes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8945168). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Kubota Corporation, Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation, Kubota Manufacturing of America, Kubota North America Corporation, Kubota Tractor Corporation. (Achey, Wesley)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Cameron Achey on behalf of Kubota Corporation, Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation, Kubota Manufacturing of America, Kubota North America Corporation, Kubota Tractor Corporation (Achey, Wesley)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by AgJunction LLC, Novariant, Inc.. Kubota Corporation served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Herman, John)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by AgJunction LLC, Novariant, Inc.. Kubota North America Corporation served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Herman, John)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by AgJunction LLC, Novariant, Inc.. Kubota Tractor Corporation served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Herman, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (Filed with Complaint Exhibit 1-7.) (rsg)
September 6, 2019 --- Entered in Error --- Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (rsg) Modified on 9/6/2019 AO 120 file with complaint exhibit 1-7(rsg).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story (sk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kubota Corporation, Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation, Kubota Manufacturing of America, Kubota North America Corporation, Kubota Tractor Corporation. (rsg)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by AgJunction LLC, Novariant, Inc.. (rsg)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by AgJunction LLC, Novariant, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN100115279) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C1, #4 Exhibit C2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AgJunction LLC et al v. Kubota Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kubota Tractor Corporation
Represented By: Adam M. Kaufmann
Represented By: Wesley Cameron Achey
Represented By: Eric D. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kubota Corporation
Represented By: Adam M. Kaufmann
Represented By: Wesley Cameron Achey
Represented By: Eric D. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation
Represented By: Adam M. Kaufmann
Represented By: Wesley Cameron Achey
Represented By: Eric D. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kubota North America Corporation
Represented By: Adam M. Kaufmann
Represented By: Wesley Cameron Achey
Represented By: Eric D. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kubota Manufacturing of America
Represented By: Adam M. Kaufmann
Represented By: Wesley Cameron Achey
Represented By: Eric D. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novariant, Inc.
Represented By: Peter M. Jones
Represented By: Carlton R. Jones
Represented By: John C. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AgJunction LLC
Represented By: Peter M. Jones
Represented By: Carlton R. Jones
Represented By: John C. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?