Adamson v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Michael S. Adamson
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv00268
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Michael S. Adamson. Commissioner, Social Security Administration served on 12/5/2019, answer due 3/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certified mail return receipts)(Hogan, John)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons Attorney General)(dgr)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Michael S. Adamson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Complaint as of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff is to perform service of process in accordance with FED. R. CIV. P. 4(i). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/22/2019. (dgr)
November 21, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (dgr)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael S. Adamson. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 Proposed Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons Commissioner, #4 Proposed Summons US Attorney, #5 Proposed Summons Attorney General, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adamson v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Adamson
Represented By: John Vincent Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?