John Mills, LLC et al v. Finley et al
Plaintiff: John Mills, LLC and Kyle Motola
Defendant: Asher's Attic, LLC, Christopher Glen Finley and Pamela Michelle Finley
Case Number: 2:2019cv00275
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 14 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 1 through March 10, 2020, April 3 through April 13, 2020, June 29 through July 10, 2020, September 2 through September 11, 2020, November 23 through December 7, 2020, December 21 through January 12, 2021, by David M. Lilenfeld. (Lilenfeld, David)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed with Brief In Support by Asher's Attic, LLC, Christopher Glen Finley, Pamela Michelle Finley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Stewart, Steven)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant should answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before January 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/14/2020. (dgr)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C Stewart on behalf of Asher's Attic, LLC, Christopher Glen Finley, Pamela Michelle Finley (Stewart, Steven)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time File Answer to Complaint re: #1 Complaint, filed by Asher's Attic, LLC, Christopher Glen Finley, Pamela Michelle Finley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stewart, Steven) Modified on 1/14/2020 to correct event (dgr).
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by John Mills, LLC, Kyle Motola. (Lilenfeld, David)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (dgr)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Kyle Motola, John Mills, LLC. Pamela Michelle Finley served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Lilenfeld, David)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Kyle Motola, John Mills, LLC. Christopher Glen Finley served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Lilenfeld, David)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Kyle Motola, John Mills, LLC. Asher's Attic, LLC served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Lilenfeld, David)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Lilenfeld, David)
November 27, 2019 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (dgr)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Asher's Attic, LLC, Christopher Glen Finley, Pamela Michelle Finley. (Attachments: #1 Summons Christopher Finley, #2 Summons Pamela Finley)(dgr)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kyle Motola, John Mills, LLC. Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9133359. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Mills, LLC et al v. Finley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mills, LLC
Represented By: David M. Lilenfeld
Represented By: Brian Charles Huskey
Represented By: Robin L. Gentry
Represented By: Kennington Groff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Motola
Represented By: David M. Lilenfeld
Represented By: Brian Charles Huskey
Represented By: Robin L. Gentry
Represented By: Kennington Groff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asher's Attic, LLC
Represented By: Steven C Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Glen Finley
Represented By: Steven C Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Michelle Finley
Represented By: Steven C Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?