Ariz v. FCA US, LLC.
Plaintiff: Engin Ariz
Defendant: FCA US, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00285
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Michael R. Boorman added as attorney. (Boorman, Michael)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:19-cv-00285-SCJ-JCF. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/16/2019. (rsg)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION by FCA US, LLC.. (Boorman, Michael)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US, LLC fka Chrysler Group LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V., Corporate Parent FCA North America Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent FCA Holdco B.V. for FCA US, LLC.. (rsg)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by FCA US, LLC.. (Filed in State Court on 12/11/19) Discovery ends on 5/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by FCA US, LLC.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9171399) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ariz v. FCA US, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC.
Represented By: Michael R. Boorman
Represented By: Philip Andrew Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Engin Ariz
Represented By: Brandon S. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?