Brundidge v. Blackwell et al
Plaintiff: Helena Brundidge
Defendant: Gregg S. Krivo, Blackwell Reality, Tommy Blackwell, McCalla, Raymer, Leibert, Pierce LLC and Select Portfolio Servicing
Case Number: 2:2020cv00048
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:l332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Helena Brundidge re #6 Amended General Order. (rsg)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Helena Brundidge re #5 Order. (rsg)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/16/2020. (rsg)
February 26, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (clk)
February 26, 2020 Submission of #1 Complaint to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (dgr)
February 26, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Helena Brundidge re #4 Order. (dgr)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing is likewise DENIED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to REFER to the Magistrate Judge for pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/26/2020. (dgr)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Of Filing Affidavit in Support of Motion for TRO by Helena Brundidge re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Hearing (dgr)
February 24, 2020 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Hearing, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (rsg)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED, MOTION for Permanent Injunction, by Helena Brundidge. (rsg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2020: #1 State Court Rule Nisi) (rsg).
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Helena Brundidge. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN200005404) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Citizenship, #2 Exhibit Entry of Appearance, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brundidge v. Blackwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg S. Krivo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackwell Reality
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCalla, Raymer, Leibert, Pierce LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Brundidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?