Carder v. Graco Children's Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kellie Carder, Lisa Francoforte, Leticia Rivera, Silvia Tehomilic, Shannon Hager and Emilio Pensado, Jr.
Defendant: Newell Brands DTC, Inc. and Graco Children's Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00137
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 RETURN of #29 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory F. Coleman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9957333). to attorney for correction regarding local counsel. (nmb)
July 28, 2020 RETURN of #27 APPLICATION for Admission of Patrick M. Wallace Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9947120). to attorney for correction regarding local counsel. (nmb)
July 28, 2020 RETURN of #26 APPLICATION for Admission of Martha A. Geer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9947095). to attorney for correction regarding local counsel. (nmb)
July 27, 2020 Filing 29 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory F. Coleman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9957333).by Kellie Carder, Lisa Francoforte, Shannon Hager, Emilio Pensado, Jr., Leticia Rivera, Silvia Tehomilic. (Soffin, Rachel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 24, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K. Bryson on behalf of Kellie Carder, Lisa Francoforte, Emilio Pensado, Jr., Leticia Rivera, Silvia Tehomilic (Bryson, Daniel)
July 23, 2020 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Admission of Patrick M. Wallace Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9947120).by Kellie Carder, Lisa Francoforte, Emilio Pensado, Jr., Leticia Rivera, Silvia Tehomilic. (Bryson, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 23, 2020 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Admission of Martha A. Geer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9947095).by Kellie Carder, Lisa Francoforte, Shannon Hager, Emilio Pensado, Jr., Leticia Rivera, Silvia Tehomilic. (Bryson, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 14, 2020 Filing 25 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Patrick M. Wallace. Clerk to follow-up by 7/24/2020. (nmb)
July 14, 2020 Filing 24 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Martha A. Geer. Clerk to follow-up by 7/24/2020. (nmb)
July 14, 2020 Filing 23 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Daniel K. Bryson. Clerk to follow-up by 7/24/2020. (nmb)
July 14, 2020 Filing 22 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Gregory F. Coleman. Clerk to follow-up by 7/24/2020. (nmb)
July 14, 2020 Filing 21 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Jonathan Betten Cohen. Clerk to follow-up by 7/24/2020. (nmb)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (dgs) (ADI)
July 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Adler on behalf of Graco Children's Products, Inc., Newell Brands DTC, Inc. (Adler, Jennifer)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Graco Children's Products, Inc. Answer due 8/24/2020; Newell Brands DTC, Inc. Answer due 8/24/2020. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/7/2020. (dgr)
July 7, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint,, by Graco Children's Products, Inc., Newell Brands DTC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Panayotopoulos, Nicholas)
July 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Peter Panayotopoulos on behalf of Graco Children's Products, Inc., Newell Brands DTC, Inc. (Panayotopoulos, Nicholas)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (adg) (ADI)
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Shannon Hager, Emilio Pensado, Jr., Leticia Rivera, Kellie Carder, Silvia Tehomilic, Lisa Francoforte. Newell Brands DTC, Inc. served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. (Soffin, Rachel)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Shannon Hager, Emilio Pensado, Jr., Leticia Rivera, Kellie Carder, Silvia Tehomilic, Lisa Francoforte. Graco Children's Products, Inc. served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. (Soffin, Rachel)
June 23, 2020 Filing 12 Electronic Summons Issued as to Graco Children's Products, Inc. and Newell Brands DTC, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Newell Brands DTC, Inc.)(dgr)
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kellie Carder, Lisa Francoforte, Shannon Hager, Emilio Pensado, Jr., Leticia Rivera, Silvia Tehomilic to Defendant Newell Brands DTC, Inc. (Soffin, Rachel)
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kellie Carder, Lisa Francoforte, Shannon Hager, Emilio Pensado, Jr., Leticia Rivera, Silvia Tehomilic to Defendant Graco Children's Products, Inc. (Soffin, Rachel)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by Kellie Carder, Lisa Francoforte, Shannon Hager, Emilio Pensado, Jr., Leticia Rivera, Silvia Tehomilic. (Soffin, Rachel)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Graco Children's Products, Inc., Newell Brands DTC, Inc.with Jury Demand filed by Kellie Carder, Lisa Francoforte, Leticia Rivera, Silvia Tehomilic, Emilio Pensado, Jr., Shannon Hager. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Amended Complaint - Graco Children's Products Inc, #2 Summons to Amended Complaint - Newell Brands DTC Inc)(Soffin, Rachel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Kellie Carder. Newell Brands DTC, Inc. served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Soffin, Rachel)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Kellie Carder. Graco Children's Products, Inc. served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Soffin, Rachel)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Kellie Carder. (dgr)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Graco Children's Products, Inc. and Newell Brands DTC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Newell Brands DTC, Inc.)(dgr)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 THIRD AMENDMENT IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/2020. (dgr)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kellie Carder. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9759141) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carder v. Graco Children's Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newell Brands DTC, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer A. Adler
Represented By: Nicholas Peter Panayotopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graco Children's Products, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer A. Adler
Represented By: Nicholas Peter Panayotopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Carder
Represented By: Rachel Soffin
Represented By: Harper T. Segui
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Represented By: Patrick M. Wallace
Represented By: Jonathan Betten Cohen
Represented By: Martha A. Geer
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Francoforte
Represented By: Rachel Soffin
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Rivera
Represented By: Rachel Soffin
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Tehomilic
Represented By: Rachel Soffin
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Hager
Represented By: Rachel Soffin
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio Pensado, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel Soffin
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?