Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Bartkowski et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Not in Its Individual Capacity but Solely as Trustee for BCAT 2014-44T doing business as Christina Trust
Defendant: All Other Occupants, John Bartkowski and Isabel Bartkowski
Case Number: 2:2020cv00181
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Isabel Bartkowski, John Bartkowski re #13 Notice (Other). (rjs)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB re #11 Letter re:83.1 Letter to Clerk (Wardrop, Christopher)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Brent Wardrop. Clerk to follow-up by 9/14/2020. (nmb)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Isabel Bartkowski, John Bartkowski re #10 Notice (Other). (rjs)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 26, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Isabel Bartkowski, John Bartkowski re #9 Order. (rjs)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court extends the date by which Defendants must file objections to the R&R by 45 days. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/26/2020. (rjs)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to #6 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, by Isabel Bartkowski, John Bartkowski. (Attachments: #1 Annex A)(rsg)
August 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Isabel Bartkowski, John Bartkowski re #6 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and re #7 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (rjs)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (found in #6 RR). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 8/19/2020. (rjs)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Service of #6 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 8/19/2020. (rjs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #4 Notice of Removal: The undersigned RECOMMENDS that this action be REMANDED to the Superior Court of Forsyth County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to reclassify the cause of action indicated on the docket to reflect that this case is a removed dispossessory action from state court and not a complaint arising under the Americans with Disabilities Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 8/19/2020. (rjs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Isabel Bartkowski, John Bartkowski. (filed in Forsyth County Magistrate Court 7/17/2019) Discovery ends on 1/19/2021.(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Isabel Bartkowski, John Bartkowski. (Attachments: #1 Dispossessory, #2 Complaint, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 17, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Isabel Bartkowski, John Bartkowski, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB re #3 Order Reassigning Case. (dgr)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:20-cv-181-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/17/2020. (dgr)
August 7, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction. Case Referred to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller in Error. (dgr)
August 7, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (dgr)
August 7, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Isabel Bartkowski, John Bartkowski, and Brent Wardrop re #2 Order. (dgr)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 SIXTH AMENDMENT IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/2020. (dgr)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Isabel Bartkowski and John Bartkowski. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Notice of Removal, #2 Proposed State Court Dispossessory, #3 Proposed Complaint, #4 Proposed Answer, #5 Proposed State Court Proceedings, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Bartkowski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Other Occupants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bartkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabel Bartkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Not in Its Individual Capacity but Solely as Trustee for BCAT 2014-44T doing business as Christina Trust
Represented By: Brent Wardrop
Represented By: Christopher Brent Wardrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?