Maloney et al v. Tallulah River Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Everette D. Maloney and Stephanie J Maloney
Defendant: Tallulah River Co., Inc., Randolph Jackson, Patricia Jackson, Dana Pacciotti, Torri Gayle, River Falls At The Gorge, Inc., Tallulah River Resort, Shea Smith, Tallulah River Company, Windy Sky Rentals, LLC and Robert Gayle
Case Number: 2:2020cv00191
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Everette D. Maloney, Stephanie J Maloney. (Huestis, Robert) Modified on 10/13/2020 (rjs).
October 9, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Everette D. Maloney, Stephanie J Maloney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Huestis, Robert) Modified on 10/13/2020 (rjs).
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs may file a Response Brief to the Motion to Dismiss containing no more than 35 pages. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/7/2020. (rjs)
October 7, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Everette D. Maloney, Stephanie J Maloney. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huestis, Robert)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 28, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Hurt, Jr on behalf of Robert Gayle, Torri Gayle, Windy Sky Rentals, LLC (Hurt, James)
September 25, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Tallulah River Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Cox, James)
September 25, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by River Falls At The Gorge, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Partin, Ranse)
September 25, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION Joint Statement Regarding Class Communications by Everette D. Maloney, Stephanie J Maloney. (Huestis, Robert) Modified on 9/28/2020 to correct from all caps used (rjs).
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Persons by Patricia Jackson. (Partin, Ranse)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. All Defendants shall have up to and until September 25, 2020, to file timely responsive pleadings in this action. No other deadlines shall be altered by the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/11/2020. (tcc)
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Persons by Everette D. Maloney, Stephanie J Maloney. (Huestis, Robert)
September 10, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Randolph Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partin, Ranse)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 31, 2020 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 8/31/2020 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
August 26, 2020 Clerks Approval re #14 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-10046370. (Huestis, Robert)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Everette D. Maloney, Stephanie J Maloney. Windy Sky Rentals, LLC served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Huestis, Robert)
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Everette D. Maloney, Stephanie J Maloney. Torri Gayle served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Huestis, Robert)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Everette D. Maloney, Stephanie J Maloney. Tallulah River Co., Inc. served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Huestis, Robert)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Everette D. Maloney, Stephanie J Maloney. Shea Smith served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Huestis, Robert)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Everette D. Maloney, Stephanie J Maloney. Robert Gayle served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Huestis, Robert)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Everette D. Maloney, Stephanie J Maloney. River Falls At The Gorge, Inc. served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Huestis, Robert)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Everette D. Maloney, Stephanie J Maloney. Randolph Jackson served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Huestis, Robert)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Everette D. Maloney, Stephanie J Maloney. Patricia Jackson served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Huestis, Robert)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Everette D. Maloney, Stephanie J Maloney. Dana Pacciotti served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Huestis, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:20-cv-191-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/24/2020. (dgr)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Robert Gayle, Torri Gayle, Patricia Jackson, Randolph Jackson, Dana Pacciotti, River Falls At The Gorge, Inc., Shea Smith, Tallulah River Co., Inc., Windy Sky Rentals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Torri Gayle, #2 Summons Randolph Jackson, #3 Summons Patricia Jackson, #4 Summons Dana Paciotti, #5 Summons Shea Smith, #6 Summons Robert Gayle, #7 Summons River Falls, #8 Summons Tallulah River Co)(rsg)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (rsg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Everette D. Maloney, Stephanie J Maloney. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number CGANDC-10046370) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit D-1, #5 Exhibit E-1, #6 Exhibit F-1, #7 Exhibit G-1, #8 Exhibit H-1, #9 Exhibit I-1, #10 Exhibit J-1, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maloney et al v. Tallulah River Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tallulah River Co., Inc.
Represented By: James Thomas Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph Jackson
Represented By: Ranse M. Partin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Pacciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torri Gayle
Represented By: James W. Hurt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River Falls At The Gorge, Inc.
Represented By: Ranse M. Partin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tallulah River Resort
Represented By: James Thomas Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shea Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tallulah River Company
Represented By: James Thomas Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windy Sky Rentals, LLC
Represented By: James W. Hurt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gayle
Represented By: James W. Hurt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everette D. Maloney
Represented By: Robert Stanley Huestis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie J Maloney
Represented By: Robert Stanley Huestis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?