Brown et al v. Oconee Federal Financial Corp. et al
Plaintiff: April M. Brown and Kenneth A. Brown
Defendant: Sanders, Ranck, & Skilling, P.C., ESQ. Brian C. Ranck and Oconee Federal Financial Corp. doing business as Oconee Federal Savings and Loan Association
Case Number: 2:2020cv00208
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to April M. Brown re #7 Notice (Other). Return to Sender. Not Deliverable As Addressed. Unable to Forward. (tcc)
October 15, 2020 Submission of #6 MOTION for Judgment to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits re #6 MOTION for Judgment by April M. Brown, Kenneth A. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Motion, #2 Index of Exhibits (Partial), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G (No H), #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(rsg)
September 29, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to April M. Brown, Kenneth A. Brown re #7 Notice (Other). (rjs)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Judgment by April M. Brown, Kenneth A. Brown. (rsg)
September 8, 2020 Submission of #5 Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (dgr)
September 8, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to April M. Brown, Kenneth A. Brown re #4 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (dgr)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth A. Brown, April M. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to submit this action to the District Judge for review of Plaintiffs' Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 9/8/2020. (dgr)
September 8, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to April M. Brown and Kenneth A. Brown re #3 Order Reassigning Case. (dgr)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:20-cv-208-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/8/2020. (dgr)
September 4, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (dgr)
September 4, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to April M. Brown, Kenneth A. Brown re #2 General Order. (dgr)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 SEVENTH AMENDMENT IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgr)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by April M. Brown, Kenneth A. Brown. (Attachments: #1 State Court Filings, #2 Exhibits, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Oconee Federal Financial Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanders, Ranck, & Skilling, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESQ. Brian C. Ranck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oconee Federal Financial Corp. doing business as Oconee Federal Savings and Loan Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?