Artesia Big Creek v. Graves
Plaintiff: Artesia Big Creek
Defendant: Chris Graves
Case Number: 2:2021cv00011
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Artesia Big Creek, Chris Graves re #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation and #7 Remand Letter with #6 Order to Magistrate Court. (rsg)
January 25, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (rsg)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 Remand Letter to Magistrate Court of Forsyth County. (rsg)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting the #4 Final Report and Recommendation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the case is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Forsyth County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 01/25/2021. (rsg)
January 20, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Artesia Big Creek and Chris Graves re #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and Order and #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (rsg)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 01/20/2021. (rsg)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Ruled on within the RR) Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 01/20/2021. (rsg)
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal. It is recommended that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Forsyth County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this case to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 1/20/2021. (rsg)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Chris Graves. ` (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/20/2021: #2 Dispossessory) (dgr).
January 19, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (dgr)
January 19, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Chris Graves re #2 Order. (dgr)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NINTH AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER 20-01 IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/2020. (dgr)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Graves. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Artesia Big Creek v. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artesia Big Creek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?