Williams v. Advance Polybag, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Davon Williams
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Delaware), Bunzl USA Holdings LLC and Advance Polybag, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00071
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 17 CROSSCLAIM against Advance Polybag, Inc. filed by Bunzl USA Holdings LLC.(Hardee, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER approving the parties' #13 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The Court grants the parties' request for an eight month discovery period, to concluded on December 30, 2021. As this is twice the time anticipated by the Local Rules for discovery in litigation of this nature, no further extension of discovery will be permitted. Any motions for summary judgment or the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed on or before January 29, 2022. If a motion for summary judgment is filed, the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed within 30 days after this Court's ruling thereon. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/24/2021. (ddm)
May 21, 2021 Filing 15 First Initial Disclosures by Bunzl USA Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Attachment B, #3 Exhibit Attachment C, #4 Exhibit Attachment E)(Hardee, James)
May 20, 2021 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bunzl USA Holdings LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bunzl Distribution USA, LLC for Bunzl USA Holdings LLC. (Hardee, James)
May 19, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Advance Polybag, Inc.. (Stone, Parks)
April 30, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Advance Polybag, Inc. (Stone, Parks) Modified on 5/3/2021 (rjc).
April 21, 2021 Refund in the amount of $402.00 has been processed, effective 4/21/2021 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant Advance Polybag, Inc. is ordered to SHOW CAUSE as to why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction no later than APRIL 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/12/2021. (rjc)
April 9, 2021 Clerks Approval re #7 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
April 8, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons by Advance Polybag, Inc.. (Patel, Darshan)
April 8, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Advance Polybag, Inc..(Patel, Darshan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 2 - 4, 2021, July 5 - 9, 2021, November 25 - December 6, 2021, December 27 - January 4, 2022, by James William Hardee. (Hardee, James)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-10872829. (Stone, Parks)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 5 - April 16, 2021, by Leslie Paige Becknell. (Becknell, Leslie)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:21-cv-71-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 4/5/2021. (dgr)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021. (rsg)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Delaware). (Filed in State Court on 3/23/2021) (rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bunzl USA Holdings LLC. Discovery ends on 8/30/2021. (Filed in State Court on 3/23/2021) (rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Advance Polybag, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-10872856) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Second Original Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Answer of Defendant Bunzl USA Holdings, LLC, #3 Exhibit C Answer of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., #4 Exhibit D Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Advance Polybag, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Delaware)
Represented By: Michael L. Miller
Represented By: Leslie Paige Becknell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bunzl USA Holdings LLC
Represented By: James William Hardee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Polybag, Inc.
Represented By: Darshan H Patel
Represented By: Parks Kalervo Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davon Williams
Represented By: Jody D. Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?