United States of America v. Pennington et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: View Over Clayton, LLC, Health First LLC, Penndevco, LLC, Charles R. Pennington and Penndevco, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00082
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Filing 14 Court's Notice of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TOTHE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw)
June 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike #11 Answer to Complaint with Brief In Support by United States of America. (Weisberg, Andrew)
June 1, 2021 Submission of #10 MOTION For Manual Filing, to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (ddm)
May 25, 2021 Filing 12 Defendants ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand by Penndevco, LLC, Penndevco, Inc..(Russell, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 11, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Health First LLC, Charles R. Pennington, View Over Clayton, LLC. Discovery ends on 10/8/2021.(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION For Manual Filing by Health First LLC, Charles R. Pennington, View Over Clayton, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(rsg)
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Erik Kennedy on behalf of Charles R. Pennington, Health First LLC, View Over Clayton, LLC. (rsg)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Penndevco, Inc. and Penndevco, LLC Answers due 5/26/2021. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/11/2021. (rjc)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time Answer COMPLAINT by Penndevco, Inc., Penndevco, LLC. (Russell, Robert) Modified on 5/10/2021 (rsg).
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Bruce Russell, Sr on behalf of Penndevco, Inc., Penndevco, LLC (Russell, Robert)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by United States of America. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of James O. Wright Regarding Service on Defendant Charles Pennington, #2 Exhibit Declaration of James O. Wright Regarding Service on Carlie Pennington, as Registered Agent of Defendant Health First, LLC, #3 Exhibit Declaration of James O. Wright Regarding Service on Carlie Pennington, as Registered Agent of Defendant Penndevco, Inc., #4 Exhibit Declaration of James O. Wright Regarding Service on Carlie Pennington, as Registered Agent of Defendant Penndevco, LLC, #5 Exhibit Declaration of James O. Wright Regarding Service on Carlie Pennington, as Registered Agent of Defendant View Over Clayton, LLC)(Weisberg, Andrew)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:21-cv-82-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 4/12/2021. (dgr)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Health First LLC, Penndevco, Inc., Penndevco, LLC, Charles R. Pennington, View Over Clayton, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Health First, #2 Summons Penndevco Inc., #3 Summons Penndevco LLC, #4 Summons View Over Clayton LLC)(dgr)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER 20-01 IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/2021. (dgr)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Pennington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: View Over Clayton, LLC
Represented By: Donald Erik Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health First LLC
Represented By: Donald Erik Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penndevco, LLC
Represented By: Robert Bruce Russell, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles R. Pennington
Represented By: Donald Erik Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penndevco, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Bruce Russell, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?