Gandhi v. United States Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Plaintiff: Urvin Dineshbhai Gandhi
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud and Shineka Scott Miller
Case Number: 2:2021cv00201
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Shineka Scott Miller, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Ross, Aaron)
November 9, 2021 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #25 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party is to bear his, her, or its own costs. (ddm)
November 9, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have up to and including December 3, 2021, to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint [Doc. 1]. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/4/21. (rsg)
November 3, 2021 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time re: #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Shineka Scott Miller, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A: Proposed Order)(Ross, Aaron) Modified on 11/4/2021 (rsg).
November 3, 2021 Filing 22 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Aaron Joshua Ross replacing attorney Vickie LeDuc. (Ross, Aaron)
October 1, 2021 Filing 21 Court's Notice Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw)
September 30, 2021 Filing 20 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to James O. Hacking, III. Clerk to follow-up by 10/12/2021. (cdg)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:21-cv-00201-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/20/21. (rsg)
September 20, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Vickie LeDuc US Attorney Office re #19 Order Reassigning Case. (rsg)
September 14, 2021 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:21-cv-01858. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Transfer and for Extension of Time; transferring case to the Northern District of Georgia; directing Defendants to file their answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 30 days after this action is docketed in the transferee district. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/13/2021. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/14/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT by Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Shineka Scott Miller, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security(LeDuc, Vickie) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/14/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Urvin Dineshbhai Gandhi re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case and Extend Time, #1 Complaint, Consent to transfer (Hacking, James) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/14/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Urvin Dineshbhai Gandhi. Alejandro N. Mayorkas served on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021; Shineka Scott Miller served on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021; Tracy Renaud served on 8/3/2021, answer due 10/4/2021; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 8/3/2021, answer due 10/4/2021; United States Department of Homeland Security served on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hacking, James) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/14/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 13 Status Conference held on 9/1/2021 before Judge Peter J. Messitte. (Court Reporter: Linda Marshall - via Zoom) (tds, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/7/2021 (tds, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from Maryland on 9/14/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re: Due date for joint status report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/2/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/14/2021.]
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 List of Visa Cases) (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/14/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 List of Visa Cases)(dass, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/14/2021.]
August 6, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case and Extend Time by Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Shineka Scott Miller, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LeDuc, Vickie) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/14/2021.]
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 8/5/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/14/2021.]
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Shineka Scott Miller, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (LeDuc, Vickie) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/14/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 7/27/2021. (jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/14/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Urvin Dineshbhai Gandhi or counsel for Urvin Dineshbhai Gandhi are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/10/2021. (jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/14/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 60 days as to Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Shineka Scott Miller, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/14/2021.]
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Alejandro Mayorkas, Shineka Scott Miller, Tracy Renaud, United States Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9400195.), filed by Urvin Dineshhbhai Gandhi . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Hacking, James) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/14/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gandhi v. United States Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Urvin Dineshbhai Gandhi
Represented By: James O. Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Represented By: Aaron Joshua Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Represented By: Aaron Joshua Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro N. Mayorkas
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Represented By: Aaron Joshua Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Represented By: Aaron Joshua Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shineka Scott Miller
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Represented By: Aaron Joshua Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?