Home-Owners Insurance Company et al v. TL Williams & Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Home-Owners Insurance Company and Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: TL Williams & Associates, Inc., Meritage Homes of Georgia, Inc. and Candace Au
Case Number: 2:2021cv00264
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Filing 17 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw)
January 25, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #8 Counterclaim by Home-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company.(Howard, Matthew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 17, 2022 Filing 15 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 4, 2022 through and including April 14, 2022; June 17, 2022 through and including June 27, 2022; September 1, 2022 through and including September 12, 2022; November 18, 2022 through and including November 28, 2022; December 23, 2022 through and including January 2, 2023, by Michael C. Kendall. (Kendall, Michael)
January 14, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TL Williams & Associates, Inc..(Sutherland, Teddy)
January 14, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by TL Williams & Associates, Inc..(Sutherland, Teddy) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 9, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Chaka Michael Douglas on behalf of Candace Au (Douglas, Chaka)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; TL Williams & Associates, Inc. Answer due 1/14/2022. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/6/2022. (pdw)
January 6, 2022 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by TL Williams & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order Extending Time)(Sutherland, Teddy)
January 5, 2022 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meritage Homes of Georgia, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Meritage Homes Corporation for Meritage Homes of Georgia, Inc.. (Hobgood, T.)
January 5, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 6/6/2022.), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand by Meritage Homes of Georgia, Inc..(Hobgood, T.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company, Home-Owners Insurance Company. TL Williams & Associates, Inc. served on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Howard, Matthew)
December 22, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company, Home-Owners Insurance Company. Meritage Homes of Georgia, Inc. served on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Howard, Matthew)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company, Home-Owners Insurance Company. Candace Au served on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Howard, Matthew)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:21-CV-264-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/13/2021. (ddm)
December 7, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Company for Home-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company. (Howard, Matthew)
December 7, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Candace Au, Meritage Homes of Georgia, Inc., TL Williams & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Meritage Homes of Georgia, Inc., #2 Summons Candace Au)(rsg)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Owners Insurance Company, Home-Owners Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11439194) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Demand for Arbitration, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Demand for Arbitration, #3 Exhibit C - Defect List, #4 Exhibit D - Reservation of Rights Ltr., #5 Exhibit E - Primary Policy, #6 Exhibit F - Umbrella Policy, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home-Owners Insurance Company et al v. TL Williams & Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Brandon Howard
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Brandon Howard
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TL Williams & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Teddy Lee Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritage Homes of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: T. Tucker Hobgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candace Au
Represented By: Chaka Michael Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?