Plaintiff v. Defendant
Plaintiff: Plaintiff
Defendant: Defendant
Case Number: 2:2021mi99999
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 35 2:21-cv-47-RWS (17:0501/820) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Eric Champlin vs. Lightnin' Production Rentals, Inc. dba Lightnin RV Rentals. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10759304. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Form AO121, #7 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Rothman, Joel) Modified on 2/24/2021 (dgr).
February 22, 2021 Filing 34 2:21-cv-46-RWS-JCF (15:1992/480) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Aspen Coursey vs. Collection Services of Athens, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10748316. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew) Modified on 2/24/2021 (dgr).
February 22, 2021 Filing 33 2:21-cv-45-RWS (42:1983cv/440) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Paul Gazzo vs. Georgia Department of Juvenile Justice. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10746082. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Case Initiation Form, #2 Summons Summons to DJJ, #3 Summons Summons to Ashley Charron)(Park, Sean) Modified on 2/22/2021 (dgr).
February 19, 2021 Filing 32 2:21-cv-44-RWS-JCF (42:0405wc/863) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Heather Scoggins vs. Andrew Saul Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10741170. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Commissioner of social security, #3 Summons Summons for Attorney General, #4 Summons Summons for Civil Process Clerk, #5 Affidavit Plaintiff Affidavit and Assignment of EAJA fees)(Adams, Andrew) Modified on 2/19/2021 (dgr).
February 19, 2021 Filing 31 2:21-cv-43-RWS (17:0501/820) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Eric Champlin vs. Mashima Corporation dba Econo Lodge. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BGANDC-10740900. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Form AO121, #8 Certificate of Interested Persons & Corporate Disclosure)(Rothman, Joel) Modified on 2/19/2021 (dgr).
February 18, 2021 Filing 30 2:21-cv-42-RWS-JCF (42:0405wc/863) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint STEPHANIE MARIE VANDIVER vs. ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10734811. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Atty Gen, #3 Summons Defendant, #4 Summons US Atty)(Hogan, John) Modified on 2/18/2021 (dgr).
February 16, 2021 Filing 29 2:21-cv-00041-RWS (28:1446pi/360) Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Stephanie Cauley vs. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10728647. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Pleadings with Key, Part 1), #2 Exhibit A (State Court Pleadings, Part 2), #3 Exhibit A (State Court Pleadings, Part 3), #4 Exhibit A (State Court Pleadings, Part 4), #5 Exhibit B (Plaintiff's Demand and Medicals, redacted, Part 1, Pages 1-264), #6 Exhibit B (Plaintiff's Demand and Medicals, redacted, Part 2, Pages 265-480), #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Deeb, Nicholas) Modified on 2/17/2021 (rsg).
February 16, 2021 Filing 28 2:21-cv-00040-RWS (28:1332pl/367) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Juanita Degenhard vs. Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10727305. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Warshauer, Michael) Modified on 2/17/2021 (rsg).
February 11, 2021 Filing 27 2:21-cv-38-RWS (28:1441mv/350) Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Andrew Toxen vs. Demetrius Levi Edmonson. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10715428. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Superior Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet)(Cole, Brenton) Modified on 2/12/2021 (dgr).
February 11, 2021 Filing 26 2:21-cv-37-RWS (28:1446pi/360) Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Trenesa Tate-Thomas vs. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10711979. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Demand letter, #3 Exhibit B - Pleadings)(Lessinger, Howard) Modified on 2/11/2021 (dgr).
February 8, 2021 Filing 25 2:21-cv-35-RWS (28:1446pi/360) Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Angela Hoskins vs. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10698818. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Email dated 1-11-2021, #3 Exhibit B - Lumbar Procedure Estimate, #4 Exhibit C - GA Brain & Spine Note, #5 Exhibit D - Pleadings)(Rogers, Jennie) Modified on 2/8/2021 (dgr).
February 7, 2021 Filing 24 2:21-cv-34-RWS (28:1332pl/365) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint John Gibb vs. Monsanto Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10697600. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(McCorvey, Derriel) Modified on 2/8/2021 (dgr).
February 5, 2021 Filing 23 2:21-cv-33-RWS (28:1332oc/190) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC vs. RUS-AL (USA), Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10695505. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Credit Sales Contract Security Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment (Credit Sales Contract), #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Authority, #4 Exhibit D - Specification of Assigned Interest, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Assignment, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Kevin Stone, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Summons of Kamalov, #9 Summons Summons of Rus-AL (USA))(Collins, William) Modified on 2/5/2021 (dgr).
February 4, 2021 Filing 22 2:21-cv-032-RWS-JCF (42:0405rs/865) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint BETTY KINNARD vs. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AC DENIAL, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Affidavit IFP, #4 Motion for IFP, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Cates, Patrick) Modified on 2/4/2021 (dgr).
February 2, 2021 Filing 21 2:21-cv-31-RWS (20:1681/448) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint C.W.E. a minor vs. White County School District. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10682901. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Def White County School District, #3 Summons Def Jones)(Parks, James) Modified on 2/2/2021 (dgr).
February 1, 2021 Filing 20 2:21-cv-28-RWS-JCF (42:0405wc/863) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Joseph Shane Wingo vs. Andrew Saul. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #4 Affidavit Form 239)(Edmonson, John) Modified on 2/1/2021 (dgr).
February 1, 2021 Filing 19 2:21-cv-27-RWS-JCF (42:0405ww/863) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Courtney Ainsworth Grey vs. Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10675991. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Comerford, Ida) Modified on 2/1/2021 (dgr).
January 28, 2021 Filing 18 2:21-cv-26-RWS-JCF (15:1692/480) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Richard Lassiter vs. Independence Capital Recovery, LLC,. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10666289. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew) Modified on 1/29/2021 (dgr).
January 28, 2021 Filing 17 2:21-cv-00025-RWS-JCF (42:1981ra/442) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ORLANDO JONES vs. BESCO STEEL SUPPLY OF GEORGIA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10663856. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Roberts, Victor) Modified on 1/28/2021 (rsg).
January 22, 2021 Filing 16 2:21-cv-23-RWS-JCF (29:2601/751) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint KEVIN GROBE vs. QUANTUM RESTAURANTS, LLC d/b/a LITTLE CAESARS. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10637476. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martoccio, Gary) Modified on 1/22/2021 (dgr).
January 21, 2021 Filing 15 2:21-cv-21-RWS (28:1332pi/367) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Dara Dyer vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10634400. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Cooper Companies, #3 Summons Coopersurgical, #4 Summons Teva Pharm. USA, #5 Summons Teva Woman's Health)(Hammers, Robert) Modified on 1/22/2021 (dgr).
January 21, 2021 Filing 14 2:21-cv-20-RWS (28:1332oc/190) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tuni Gap Enterprises, LLC vs. MarineMax East, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10633309. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - MarineMax East, Inc., #3 Summons Summons - Sea Ray, Inc., a division of Brunswick Corporation)(Black, David) Modified on 1/22/2021 (dgr).
January 21, 2021 Filing 13 2:21-cv-19-RWS-JCF (42:0405wc/863) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JULIE MARIE CARTER vs. ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion to File IFP, #3 IFP Application, #4 Summons Atty Gen, #5 Summons Defendant, #6 Summons US Atty)(Hogan, John) Modified on 1/21/2021 (dgr).
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 2:21-cv-14-RWS (28:1332ri/470) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Robert A. Thomsen vs. Randolph Jackson. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10621269. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Patricia Jackson, #3 Summons Randolph Jackson, #4 Summons Shea Jackson Smith, #5 Exhibit A 1994 Covenants)(Huestis, Robert) Modified on 1/20/2021 (dgr).
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 2:21-cv-13-RWS (29:0201fl/710) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Javier Ramirez vs. OSleeper Manufacturing Co.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10620998. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Named Plaintiff Consent Form - Javier Ramirez)(Thomas, Brandon) Modified on 1/20/2021 (dgr).
January 18, 2021 Filing 10 2:21-cv-00012-RWS-JCF (15:1692/480) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Victoria Seymour vs. Collection Services of Athens, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10615745. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew) Modified on 1/19/2021 (rsg).
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 2:21-cv-10-RWS-JCF (15:1692/480) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jimmy Randolph Jackson, Jr. vs. Title Max, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10606688. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Paxton, Misty) Modified on 1/15/2021 (dgr).
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 2:21-cv-00009-RWS (42:12101/446) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JANIS SHUMWAY vs. WS CE RESORT OWNER LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10603856. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 1/14/2021 (rsg).
January 12, 2021 Filing 7 2:21-cv-008-RWS-JCF (42:0405wc/863) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Donald R. Ward vs. Andrew Saul. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10593181. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Atty Gen, #3 Summons Northern District, #4 Summons Region IV)(Jarvis, Jennifer) Modified on 1/12/2021 (dgr).
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 2:21-cv-7-RWS (28:1332oc/190) Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC vs. Infab Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10590501. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of K. Moody-Grant, #2 Exhibit 2: Forsyth State Court documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Horst, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/12/2021 (dgr).
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 2:21-cv-00006-RWS (28:1446/110) Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Joseph Barfield vs. Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10583999. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Interested Persons, #5 Exhibit Jurisdictional Statement)(Weiner, Denise) Modified on 1/11/2021 (rsg).
January 6, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-0092 CC CMS 442 29:0626. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ron Smith vs. KPS Global, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BGANDC-10573924. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Case Initiation Form, #2 Summons Summons)(Weinstein, Michael) SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THE DEFENDANT IS NOT NAMED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 2:21-cv-4-RWS-JCF (42:0405wc/863) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ABIGAIL LYNN EMMERT vs. ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion to File IFP, #3 IFP Application, #4 Summons Atty Gen, #5 Summons Defendant, #6 Summons US Atty)(Hogan, John) Modified on 1/6/2021 (dgr).
January 3, 2021 Filing 2 2:21-cv-2-RWS-JCF (42:0405wc/863) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint LATAYEA NICOLE CUTHBERTSON vs. ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion to File IFP, #3 IFP Application, #4 Summons Atty Gen, #5 Summons Defendant, #6 Summons US Atty)(Hogan, John) Modified on 1/4/2021 (dgr).
January 3, 2021 Filing 1 2:21-cv-1-RWS-JCF (42:0405wc/863) Case Initiating Documents-Complaint SHAWNA SHARLENE CHARLES vs. ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion to File IFP, #3 IFP Application, #4 Summons DEFENDANT, #5 Summons US Atty, #6 Summons Attorney General)(Hogan, John) Modified on 1/4/2021 (dgr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plaintiff v. Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?