Millennium Bank v. White Oaks Lanier, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Millennium Bank
Defendant: White Oaks Lanier, LLC, Gryphon Senior Living Group, LLC, Douglas Cameron and Adam Zussman
Case Number: 2:2023cv00062
Filed: April 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal - Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting the parties' #16 Second Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines and Enter Consent Order. (See Order for new dates and deadlines.) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 06/02/2023. (ddm)
June 2, 2023 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines by Millennium Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Second Motion to Extend Deadlines)(Alexander, Paul)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Defendants' Third Motion for an Order Allowing Defendants until June 2, 2023 to Respond to Plaintiff's Receivership Motion. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/18/2023. (ddm)
May 17, 2023 Filing 14 Third MOTION for an Order Allowing Defendants until June 2, 2023 to Respond to Plaintiff's Receivership Motion #2 filed by Douglas Cameron, Gryphon Senior Living Group, LLC, White Oaks Lanier, LLC, Adam Zussman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order A-Proposed Order)(Glover, Glenn) Modified on 5/18/2023 to remove capitalization within text (ddm).
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting the #12 Second Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants To Respond To Plaintiff's Receivership. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Receivership Motion is extended until May 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/05/2023. (ddm)
May 5, 2023 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff's Receivership Motion re: #2 MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Hearing by Douglas Cameron, Gryphon Senior Living Group, LLC, White Oaks Lanier, LLC, Adam Zussman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Glover, Glenn)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting the parties' #10 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines and and Enter Consent Order. (See Order for new deadlines.) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/05/2023. (ddm)
May 5, 2023 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time and Enter Consent Order by Millennium Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alexander, Paul)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Allow Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Receivership Motion. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Receivership Motion is extended until May 5, 2023. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 04/26/2023. (ddm)
April 26, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time File Response re: #2 MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Hearing Until May 5, 2023 by Douglas Cameron, Gryphon Senior Living Group, LLC, White Oaks Lanier, LLC, Adam Zussman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Motion for an Order Allowing Defendants Until May 5, 2023 to Respond to Plaintiff's Receivership Motion)(Glover, Glenn)
April 21, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL COMPLAINT by Douglas Cameron, Gryphon Senior Living Group, LLC, White Oaks Lanier, LLC, Adam Zussman. Discovery ends on 9/18/2023.(Glover, Glenn) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting the #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants White Oaks Lanier, LLC, Gryphon Senior Living Group, L.L.C, Douglas Cameron and Adam Zussman shall have until April 21, 2023 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 04/18/2023. (ddm)
April 17, 2023 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #2 MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Hearing DEFENDANTS LIMITED PRELIMINARY RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S RECEIVERSHIP MOTION and PROPOSED ORDER filed by Douglas Cameron, Gryphon Senior Living Group, LLC, White Oaks Lanier, LLC, Adam Zussman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Glover, Glenn)
April 17, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Douglas Cameron, Gryphon Senior Living Group, LLC, White Oaks Lanier, LLC, Adam Zussman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Glover, Glenn)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COURT NOTICE OF FILING: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
April 10, 2023 Submission of #2 MOTION for Appointment of Receiver and Injunctive Relief and Request for Expedited Hearing, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (ddm)
April 9, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Receiver and Injunctive Relief and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Millennium Bank. (Filed in Superior Court of Forsyth County on 03/30/2023.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(ddm)
April 9, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with COMPLAINT, filed by Gryphon Senior Living Group, LLC, Douglas Cameron, Adam Zussman, White Oaks Lanier, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12515615) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millennium Bank v. White Oaks Lanier, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millennium Bank
Represented By: Michael Paul Kohler
Represented By: Paul M. Alexander
Represented By: William Anderson DuPre, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Oaks Lanier, LLC
Represented By: Beth E. Rogers
Represented By: Glenn E. Glover
Represented By: James Franklin Failey Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gryphon Senior Living Group, LLC
Represented By: Beth E. Rogers
Represented By: Glenn E. Glover
Represented By: James Franklin Failey Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Cameron
Represented By: Beth E. Rogers
Represented By: Glenn E. Glover
Represented By: James Franklin Failey Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Zussman
Represented By: Beth E. Rogers
Represented By: Glenn E. Glover
Represented By: James Franklin Failey Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?